This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 04/07/2019 at 17:58:33 (UTC).

JENNIFER CHRISTENSON VS VICTOR ASSOULINE, ET AL

Case Summary

On 09/02/2011 JENNIFER CHRISTENSON filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against VICTOR ASSOULINE,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Van Nuys Courthouse East located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****4755

  • Filing Date:

    09/02/2011

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CHRISTENSON JENNIFER

Defendants

ASSOULINE IRIE

ASSOULINE VICTOR

HAZELTINE INVESTMENTS LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MCMAHON JOHN MICHAEL

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/19/2013
  • DocketDefault Judgment; Filed by Jennifer Christenson (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/10/2013
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department D; (OSC-Order to Show Cause; Judgment-Granted) -

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/10/2013
  • DocketSummary; Filed by Jennifer Christenson (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/10/2013
  • DocketDeclaration-Default/Uncont Judgt.; Filed by Jennifer Christenson (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/07/2013
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department D; (OSC-Order to Show Cause; Continued) -

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/26/2013
  • DocketRequest-Enter Judgment; Filed by Jennifer Christenson (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/21/2013
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department D; (OSC-Order to Show Cause; Continued) -

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/21/2013
  • DocketRequest-Dismissal-Partial; Filed by Jennifer Christenson (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/21/2013
  • DocketNotice-Rejection of Judgm Package; Filed by Jennifer Christenson (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/20/2012
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department D; (OSC-Order to Show Cause; Continued) -

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
19 More Docket Entries
  • 01/30/2012
  • Docketat 09:00 AM in Department Y; Case Management Conference - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/30/2012
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department D; Case Management Conference (Conference-Case Management; Not held-Continued) -

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/18/2012
  • Docketat 09:00 AM in Department Y; Initial Status Conference - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2012
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by Jennifer Christenson (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/08/2011
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/07/2011
  • Docketat 11:30 AM in Department Y; (Affidavit-170.6; Transferred-Other dept-per 170.6 C) -

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/07/2011
  • DocketAffidavit-Prejudice-Peremptory; Filed by Jennifer Christenson (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/02/2011
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Jennifer Christenson (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/02/2011
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by null

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/02/2011
  • DocketSummons-Issued; Filed by Jennifer Christenson (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less