This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 04/09/2016 at 15:41:41 (UTC).

JEFFREY MONROE WENNERSTORM VS RICK LOWELL SANTOS JR.

Case Summary

On 01/31/2013 JEFFREY MONROE WENNERSTORM filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against RICK LOWELL SANTOS JR. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are HALM, HOWARD L. and SAMANTHA P. JESSNER. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****5550

  • Filing Date:

    01/31/2013

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

HALM, HOWARD L.

SAMANTHA P. JESSNER

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

WENNERSTORM JEFFREY MONROE

Defendants

SANTOS JR. RICK LOWELL

DOES 1 TO 10

Intervenor

COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ELLIS ANDREW LAW OFFICES OF

Defendant Attorneys

MARK R. WEINER & ASSOCIATES

EARLY MASLACH & OELZE

Intervenor Attorney

GRANCELL STANDER REUBENS THOMAS & KINSEY

Other Attorneys

ROBERSON STEPHEN D. ESQ.

 

Court Documents

SUMMONS

5/17/2013: SUMMONS

COMPLA1NT-IN4NTERVINTION

5/17/2013: COMPLA1NT-IN4NTERVINTION

MINUTES

6/26/2013: MINUTES

NOTICE OF RULING

7/2/2013: NOTICE OF RULING

ORDER AND STPULATJON TO CONTINUE TRIAL, FSC(AND RELATED MOTION/DISCOVERY DATES)

8/15/2014: ORDER AND STPULATJON TO CONTINUE TRIAL, FSC(AND RELATED MOTION/DISCOVERY DATES)

NOTICE OF RULING F.S.C.

6/16/2015: NOTICE OF RULING F.S.C.

Minute Order

6/24/2015: Minute Order

NOTICE OF RULING RE: OSC

6/25/2015: NOTICE OF RULING RE: OSC

STIPULATION FOR BINDING ARBITRATION AND ORDER

8/13/2015: STIPULATION FOR BINDING ARBITRATION AND ORDER

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS

9/26/2016: NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS

Minute Order

11/7/2016: Minute Order

ORDER RE: MOTION FOR RELIEF FROM DISMISSAL PURSUANT TO CCP SECTION 473

11/8/2016: ORDER RE: MOTION FOR RELIEF FROM DISMISSAL PURSUANT TO CCP SECTION 473

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT OR ORDER

1/5/2017: NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT OR ORDER

REPLY TO PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR ORDER STRIKING AND/OR TAXING PLAINTIFF'S COSTS

3/1/2017: REPLY TO PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR ORDER STRIKING AND/OR TAXING PLAINTIFF'S COSTS

Minute Order

3/17/2017: Minute Order

ORDER RE: MOTION FOR ORDER STRIKING AND/OR TAXING PLA1NTIFF'S COSTS

3/17/2017: ORDER RE: MOTION FOR ORDER STRIKING AND/OR TAXING PLA1NTIFF'S COSTS

NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR ORDER ENTERING SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT AND REQUEST FOR FEES AND COSTS; ETC.

7/14/2017: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR ORDER ENTERING SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT AND REQUEST FOR FEES AND COSTS; ETC.

Minute Order

8/18/2017: Minute Order

36 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/10/2015
  • Substitution of Attorney Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2015
  • Stipulation and Order (FOR BINDING ARBITRATION ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2015
  • Notice of Ruling Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2015
  • Notice of Ruling Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2015
  • Notice of Ruling (F.S.C. ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2014
  • Amended Notice (of lien ) Filed by Attorney for Claimant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2014
  • Stipulation and Order (TO CONT FSC AND TRL DATES (CONT TO 06/12 06/24/2015) ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2014
  • Partial Dismissal (w/o Prejudice) (COMPLAINT-IN-INTERVENTION ONLY ) Filed by Attorney for Intervenor

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2014
  • Notice (and Defendant in Intervention Rick Lowell Santos Jr. ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2014
  • Notice of Lien (IN THE AMOUNT OF $4,033.47 ) Filed by Attorney for Lien Claimant

    Read MoreRead Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 05/23/2013
  • Statement-Case Management (ATTY FOR DEFT: COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2013
  • Summons Filed Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2013
  • Complaint in Intervention (DISMISSED 8/01/14 ) Filed by Atty. for Plain. in Intervention

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2013
  • Notice of Case Reassignment & Ord Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2013
  • Answer to Complaint Filed ( DJT ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2013
  • Statement-Case Management Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2013
  • Rtn of Service of Summons & Compl Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2013
  • Complaint Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2013
  • Summons Issued Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2013
  • Notice-Case Management Conference Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Roberson, Stephen D