This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 02/28/2016 at 20:23:03 (UTC).

JEFFREY LUBELL VS. 800 LINDA FLORA ET. AL.

Case Summary

On 10/09/2009 JEFFREY LUBELL filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against 800 LINDA FLORA. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Santa Monica Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are LISA HART COLE, JOHN H. REID, GERALD ROSENBERG and JOHN L. SEGAL. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****5221

  • Filing Date:

    10/09/2009

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

LISA HART COLE

JOHN H. REID

GERALD ROSENBERG

JOHN L. SEGAL

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

JEFFREY LUBELL LIVING TRUST

Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

PLASTERING INC.

M&M SHEET METAL & RAIN GUTTER INC.

A.P. CONSTRUCTION INC.

TUCKER DEAN E.

YETI ENTERPRISES

GC AQUASCAPES

MIKE PEARSON CONSTRUCTION INC.

BAY AREA TREE PRESERVATION/BAY CITY TREES

ALLEN KENOYER GLASS INC.

REFERENCE DESIGNS INC.

DECKRITE WATERPROOFING CO.

BREAMER PAINTING

MAJESTIC WOODWORKS INC.

MARIO'S PAINTING

BROTHERS SHEET METAL

C&H CUSTOM SECURITY SYSTEMS INC.

ADR LANDSCAPING

IRONHORSE CONSTRUCTION

Cross Defendant

PARAMOUNT PRE-CAST DESIGN

75 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant and Plaintiff Attorneys

BONETATI KINCAID & KINCAID INC.

BROWNWOOD CHAZEN & CANNON

FITZGIBBON THOMAS N.

KENNICK & ASSOCIATES

PEGAN KEVIN

PFEIFFER THIGPEN FITZGIBBON & ZIONTZ LLP

SOBLE MARC S.

Defendant and Cross Defendant Attorneys

PEGAN KEVIN

DASOVICH & ASSOCIATES. CAROLINE L.

FIERMAN-CRIBBS STACY

GHORMLEY & ASSOCIATES

HANEY BUCHANAN & PATTERSON

HORTON OBERRECHT KIRKPATRICK & MARTHA

LETOFSKY & MCCLAIN

MENANNO MARIO

MENEKSHE LAW FIRM

SCOTT L. GHORMLEY

SKANE WILCOX

STRUCK BERT W.

WEISSMAN ANDREW N.

Other Attorneys

R2 LAW GROUP

30 More Attorneys Available

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/06/2014
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal (W/PREJ ENTIRE ACTION ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2014
  • DocketMiscellaneous-Other (DESIGNATION OF EXPERT WITNESSES BY PLAINTIFF JEFFREY LUBELL, TRUSTEE UNDER THE JDEFFREY LUBELL LIVING LIVING TRUST DATED 4/30/07; DECLARATION OF PAUL N. SORREL IN SUPPORT THEREOF) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2013
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Dismissal & P&S Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2013
  • DocketNotice Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2013
  • DocketPartial Dismissal (with Prejudice) (AS TO CROSS-COMPLAINT FILED BY J.F. PRIETO ENGINEERING CONSTRUCTION ON 11/17/10 ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2013
  • DocketPartial Dismissal (with Prejudice) (AS TO CROSS-COMPLAINT FILED BY MARCO BAUTISTA CONSTRUCTION ON 10/18/10 ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2013
  • DocketNotice ( NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL AND PROOF OF SERVICE ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2013
  • DocketPartial Dismissal (with Prejudice) (AS TO FIRST AMENDED CROSS- COMPLAINT FILED ON 6/15/2010 BY CROSS-COMPLAINANTS, 800 LINDA FLORA, LLC, EQUITY DEVELOPERS, INC AND MICHAEL F. AULERT ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2013
  • DocketStipulation and Order (STIPULATION BETWEEN PLF AND THE DEVELOPER DEFTS FOR ASSIGNMENT OF CLAIMS ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2013
  • DocketPartial Dismissal (W/PREJ AS TO ALL DEFTS EXCEPT ACTION ROOFING INC. ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
448 More Docket Entries
  • 01/27/2010
  • DocketNotice of Ruling Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2010
  • DocketStatement-Case Management Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2009
  • DocketAnswer to Complaint Filed Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2009
  • DocketCross-complaint filed Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2009
  • DocketSummons Filed Filed by Attorney for Cross-Complainant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2009
  • DocketNotice (OF ORDER ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2009
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons & Com Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2009
  • DocketNotice of Ruling Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2009
  • DocketFirst Amended Complaint Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2009
  • DocketComplaint Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where THE PLASTERING COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where M&M SHEET METAL & RAIN GUTTER is a litigant