Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/05/2019 at 08:31:03 (UTC).

JE SUIS INC VS JACK SAPARZADEH

Case Summary

On 07/08/2015 JE SUIS INC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against JACK SAPARZADEH. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are GAIL FEUER and EDWARD B. MORETON. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****7368

  • Filing Date:

    07/08/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

GAIL FEUER

EDWARD B. MORETON

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Petitioners

JE SUIS INC.

KEVIN CO.

Defendants and Respondents

DOES 1 TO 50

FABRIC PLANET

SAPARZADEH JACK

SAPARZADEH JACOB

HOORFAR DANIEL

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

JEN LAW FIRM A PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION

Defendant and Respondent Attorney

UKEJE ELOCHE P. ESQ.

 

Court Documents

Minute Order

1/8/2018: Minute Order

Minute Order

5/21/2018: Minute Order

NOTICE OF CONTINUED APPEARANCE AND EXAMINATION OF JUDGMENT DEBTOR JACK SAPARZADEH

8/8/2018: NOTICE OF CONTINUED APPEARANCE AND EXAMINATION OF JUDGMENT DEBTOR JACK SAPARZADEH

NOTICE OF CONTINUED APPEARANCE AND EXAMINATION OF JUDGMENT DEBTOR JACK SAPARZADEH

9/4/2018: NOTICE OF CONTINUED APPEARANCE AND EXAMINATION OF JUDGMENT DEBTOR JACK SAPARZADEH

Minute Order

9/26/2018: Minute Order

Minute Order

10/17/2018: Minute Order

Minute Order

11/28/2018: Minute Order

Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

4/12/2019: Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

NOTICE OF DEMURRER AND DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT; ETC.

9/8/2015: NOTICE OF DEMURRER AND DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT; ETC.

Minute Order

8/10/2016: Minute Order

STIPULATION TO DISMISS CASE WITH THE COURT RETAINING JURISDICTION ETC.

9/30/2016: STIPULATION TO DISMISS CASE WITH THE COURT RETAINING JURISDICTION ETC.

NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO ENFORCE SETTLEMENT AND ENTER JUDGMENT; ETC.

11/9/2016: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO ENFORCE SETTLEMENT AND ENTER JUDGMENT; ETC.

NOTICE OF RULING AND ORDER RE: MOTION TO ENFORCE SETTLEMENT AND ETC.

12/16/2016: NOTICE OF RULING AND ORDER RE: MOTION TO ENFORCE SETTLEMENT AND ETC.

NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR ASSIGNMENT ORDER; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES; DECLARATION OF JERRY JEN, ESQ.; [PROPOSED] ASSIGNMENT ORDER

5/31/2017: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR ASSIGNMENT ORDER; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES; DECLARATION OF JERRY JEN, ESQ.; [PROPOSED] ASSIGNMENT ORDER

Minute Order

7/6/2017: Minute Order

MEMO OF COSTS AFTER JUDGEMENT, ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF CREDIT AND DECLARATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST

9/15/2017: MEMO OF COSTS AFTER JUDGEMENT, ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF CREDIT AND DECLARATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST

SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY

12/18/2017: SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY

DECLARATION OF JACK SAPARZADEH IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR AN ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: CONTEMPT

12/18/2017: DECLARATION OF JACK SAPARZADEH IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR AN ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: CONTEMPT

67 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/17/2019
  • at 09:30 AM in Department 44, Edward B. Moreton, Presiding; Hearing on Motion to Amend Judgment - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Party

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 44, Edward B. Moreton, Presiding; Hearing on Application for Order for Appearance and Examination - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Party

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2019
  • at 09:30 AM in Department 44, Edward B. Moreton, Presiding; Hearing on Motion to Amend Judgment - Not Held - Rescheduled by Party

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2019
  • Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information; Filed by Jen Law Firm, A Professional Corporation (Attorney)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2018
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 44, Edward B. Moreton, Presiding; Hearing on Application for Order for Appearance and Examination - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Party

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2018
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 44, Edward B. Moreton, Presiding; Hearing on Application for Order for Appearance and Examination - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2018
  • Minute Order ((Hearing on Application for Order for Appearance and Examinati...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2018
  • Other - (NOTICE OF CONTINUED APPEARANCE AND EXAMINATION OF JUDGMENT DEBTOR JACK SAPARZADEH); Filed by Je Suis, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2018
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 44, Edward B. Moreton, Presiding; Hearing on Application for Order for Appearance and Examination - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2018
  • Minute Order ((Hearing on Application for Order for Appearance and Examination)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
141 More Docket Entries
  • 09/29/2015
  • FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR: 1. BREACH OF CONTRACT; AND 2. FOR MONEY DUE ON AN OPEN BOOK ACCOUNT; AND 3. FOR MONEY DUE ON AN ACCOUNT STATED; AND 4. GOODS SOLD AND RECEIVED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2015
  • NOTICE OF DEMURRER AND DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT; ETC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2015
  • Demurrer; Filed by Jack Saparzadeh (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2015
  • PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2015
  • Proof-Service/Summons; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2015
  • NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2015
  • Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2015
  • SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2015
  • Complaint; Filed by Je Suis, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2015
  • COMPLAINT FOR: 1. BREACH OF CONTRACT; ETC

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: BC587368    Hearing Date: August 06, 2020    Dept: 78

Superior Court of California

County of Los Angeles

Department 78

JE SUIS, INC. d/b/a KEVIN CO.;

Plaintiff,

vs.

JACK SAPARZADEH, et al.,

Defendants.

Case No.:

BC587368

Hearing Date:

August 6, 2020

[TENTATIVE] RULING RE:

Plaintiff/judgment creditor je suis, inc.’s Motion to Amend the Judgment to Add Non-Party Alter Ego makelifeyourart inc. as Judgment Debtor.

Plaintiff Je Suis, Inc.’s Motion to Amend the Judgment to Add Non-Party Makelifeyourart Inc. as Judgment Debtor is GRANTED.

FACTUAL BACKGROUND

This is an action for breach of contract. The First Amended Complaint (“FAC”) alleges as follows. Plaintiff Je Suis, Inc. (“Je Suis”) entered into an agreement with Defendant Jack Saparzadeh a/k/a Jacob Saparazadeh d/b/a Fabric Planet (“Fabric Planet”) on July 16, 2013 where Je Suis would provide to Fabric Planet on credit wholesale textile and fabric products, and Fabric Planet would promptly remit payment. (FAC ¶ 14.) Fabric Planet placed and received various orders from July 2013 – December 2013, but only made sporadic partial payments on the outstanding balance. (FAC ¶¶15-18.) in May 2015, the parties memorialized the outstanding amount in writing, but Fabric Planet breached the agreement on June 6, 2015 by failing to make payment. (FAC ¶¶ 19-20.)

PROCEDURAL BACKGROUND

Je Suis filed the Complaint on July 8, 2015, alleging four causes of action:

  1. Breach of contract

  2. For money due on an open book account

  3. For money due on an account stated

  4. For goods sold and received

On September 29, 2015, Je Suis filed the FAC, alleging the same causes of action.

On March 1, 2016, this Court overruled Fabric Planet’s demurrer to the FAC.

On August 23, 2016, the parties filed a Notice of Settlement of the Entire Case.

On December 13, 2016, the Court entered judgment on stipulation against Saparzadeh/Fabric Planet in the total amount of $41,929.10.

On March 3, 2020, Je Suis filed the present motion to amend the judgment.

No Opposition has been filed.

DISCUSSION

  1. MOTION TO AMEND JUDGMENT

    Code of Civil Procedure § 187 provides:

    “When jurisdiction is, by the Constitution or this Code, or by any other statute, conferred on a Court or judicial officer, all the means necessary to carry it into effect are also given; and in the exercise of this jurisdiction, if the course of proceeding be not specifically pointed out by this Code or the statute, any suitable process or mode of proceeding may be adopted which may appear most conformable to the spirit of this code.”

    “Code of Civil Procedure section 187 authorizes a trial court to amend a judgment to add judgment debtors. The court may exercise its authority to impose liability upon an alter ego who had control of the litigation, and was therefore represented in it. The addition of a new party as judgment debtor stems from the concept of the alter ego doctrine, which is that an identity exists between the new party and the original party, whose participation in the trial leading to the judgment represented the newly added party. Therefore amending a judgment to add an alter ego does not add a new defendant but instead inserts the correct name of the real defendant. In order to see that justice is done, great liberality is encouraged in the allowance of amendments brought pursuant to Code of Civil Procedure section 187. (Misik v. D'Arco (2011) 197 Cal.App.4th 1065, 1072–1073, internal quotation marks and citations omitted.)

    “The first requirement for disregarding the corporate entity under the alter ego doctrine—whether there is sufficient unity of interest and ownership that the separate personalities of the individual and the corporation no longer exist—encompasses a series of factors. Among the many factors to be considered in applying the doctrine are one individual's ownership of all stock in a corporation; use of the same office or business location; commingling of funds and other assets of the individual and the corporation; an individual holding out that he is personally liable for debts of the corporation; identical directors and officers; failure to maintain minutes or adequate corporate records; disregard of corporate formalities; absence of corporate assets and inadequate capitalization; and the use of a corporation as a mere shell, instrumentality or conduit for the business of an individual.” (Id. at p. 1073.)

    “The second requirement for application of the alter ego doctrine is a finding that the facts are such that adherence to the fiction of the separate existence of the corporation would sanction a fraud or promote injustice.” (Ibid.)

    “[S]ection 187 applies only if the parties to be added as judgment debtors had control of the underlying litigation and were virtually represented.” (Greenspan v. LADT, LLC (2010) 191 Cal.App.4th 486, 517.)

    Je Suis sttes that Makelifeyourart Inc. is a successor entity and/or alter ego of the judgment debtor, Fabric Planet. (Motion at p. 5.) They have provided evidence that Makelifeyourart Inc. operates at the same address as Fabric Planet, is the same exact business as Fabric Planet, and is the “ostensible successor of Judgment Debtor.” (Motion at p. 5.) They present evidence that Makelifeyourart is owned by Saparzadah as listed on the California Secretary of State website. (Jen Decl., Exh. C.)

    Here, Makelifeyourart, Inc. did not exist at the time of the original judgment and thus could not have been an alter ego of Saparzadeh at the time of the action and could not have controlled the underlying litigation. (Minton v. Cavaney (1961) 56 Cal.2d 576, 581 [“Cavaney was not a party to the action against the corporation, and the judgment in that action is therefore not binding upon him unless he controlled the litigation leading to the judgment”].)

    However, a plaintiff may invoke Section 187 to seek the inclusion of a judgment debtor on a “successor corporation” theory. (McClellan v. Northridge Park Townhome Owners Ass'n, Inc. (2001) 89 Cal.App.4th 746, 753.)The general rule is ‘where one corporation sells or transfers all of its assets to another corporation, the latter is not liable for the debts and liabilities of the former unless (1) the purchaser expressly or impliedly agrees to such assumption, (2) the transaction amounts to a consolidation or merger of the two corporations, (3) the purchasing corporation is merely a continuation of the selling corporation, or (4) the transaction is entered into fraudulently to escape liability for debts.’” (Id.)

    “The general rule of successor liability is that a corporation that purchases all of the assets of another corporation is not liable for the former corporation's liabilities unless, among other theories, the purchasing corporation is a mere continuation of the selling corporation. […] To be a mere continuation, California courts require evidence of one or both of the following factual elements: (1) a lack of adequate consideration for acquisition of the former corporation's assets to be made available to creditors, or (2) one or more persons were officers, directors, or shareholders of both corporations.” (Katzir's Floor and Home Design, Inc. v. M-MLS.com (2004) 394 F.3d 1143, 1150.)

    Here, the Court finds that Je Suis has produced evidence demonstrating that Makelifeyourart Inc. is a continuation of Fabric Planet and another alter ego for Defendant Saparzadeh. Saparzadah is listed with the Secretary of State as the CEO, Secretary, and CFO for Makelifeyourart, Inc., which is located at the same location as Fabric Planet was previously located, in the same industry, and formed in June 2017, about six months after the judgment was entered against Saparazadeh dba Fabric Planet. (Jen Decl., Exh. C.)

    Accordingly, Je Suis’s Motion to Amend the Judgment to Add Non-Party Makelifeyourart Inc. as Judgment Debtor is GRANTED.

    Plaintiff to give notice.

    DATED: August 6, 2020

    ________________________________

Hon. Robert S. Draper

Judge of the Superior Court

related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where JE SUIS INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where Kevin is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer UKEJE ELOCHE PHILIP