This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/21/2019 at 08:03:42 (UTC).

JE SEON OH ET AL VS TARA VILLAGE HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION ET A

Case Summary

On 06/24/2015 JE SEON OH filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against TARA VILLAGE HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION ET A. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Van Nuys Courthouse East located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are DAVID SOTELO and HUEY P. COTTON. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****6122

  • Filing Date:

    06/24/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Van Nuys Courthouse East

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

DAVID SOTELO

HUEY P. COTTON

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Petitioners

OH ESTHER

OH JE SEON

OH JORDAN

OH JOSHUA

Defendants, Respondents and Cross Defendants

COMMUNITY PROPERTY MANAGEMENT

DOES 1 THROUGH 25

INVESTMENT MANAGEMENT COMPANY LLC

TARA VILLAGE HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION

COMMUNITY PROPERTY MANAGEMENT COMPANY LLC

MOES 1 TO 50

Defendant, Respondent and Cross Plaintiff

TARA VILLAGE HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorneys

FLETCHER LOYST PATRICK

FLETCHER LOYST P. ESQ.

Defendant and Respondent Attorneys

LEE TED MATTHEW

ZIMMERMAN BRIAN FREDRICK

ZIMMERMAN & KAHANOWITCH

LEE TED M. ESQ.

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES; DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL 1) NEGLIGENCE; ETC

6/24/2015: COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES; DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL 1) NEGLIGENCE; ETC

SUMMONS

6/24/2015: SUMMONS

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

7/22/2015: PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

NOTICE OF DEMURRER AND DEMURRER OF IN VESTMENT MANAGEMENT COMPANY LLC TO PLAINTIFFS' COMPLAINT

8/14/2015: NOTICE OF DEMURRER AND DEMURRER OF IN VESTMENT MANAGEMENT COMPANY LLC TO PLAINTIFFS' COMPLAINT

Unknown

8/14/2015: Unknown

CROSS-COMPLAINT OF INVESTMENT MANAGEMENT COMPANY, LLC, FOR 1) NEGLIGENCE 2) IMPLIED INDEMNITY; EQUITABLE APPORTIONMENT 3) TOTAL EQUITABLE INDEMNITY

8/14/2015: CROSS-COMPLAINT OF INVESTMENT MANAGEMENT COMPANY, LLC, FOR 1) NEGLIGENCE 2) IMPLIED INDEMNITY; EQUITABLE APPORTIONMENT 3) TOTAL EQUITABLE INDEMNITY

INVESTMENT MANAGEMENT COMPANY LLC'S NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF THE COMPLAINT

8/14/2015: INVESTMENT MANAGEMENT COMPANY LLC'S NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF THE COMPLAINT

NOTICE OF LODGMENT IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT TARA VILLAGE HOA'S MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF PLAINTIFFS' COMPLAINT

8/25/2015: NOTICE OF LODGMENT IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT TARA VILLAGE HOA'S MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF PLAINTIFFS' COMPLAINT

DEFENDANT TARA VILLAGE HOA'S MOTION TO STRIKE IRRELEVANT, FALSE, AND IMPROPER MATTERS FROM PLAINTIFFS JE SEON OH, ESTHER OH, JORDAN OH, AND JOSHUA OH'S COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES; ETC.

8/25/2015: DEFENDANT TARA VILLAGE HOA'S MOTION TO STRIKE IRRELEVANT, FALSE, AND IMPROPER MATTERS FROM PLAINTIFFS JE SEON OH, ESTHER OH, JORDAN OH, AND JOSHUA OH'S COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES; ETC.

DEFENDANT TARA VILLAGE HOA'S NOTICE OF DEMURRER AND DEMURRER TO THE SECOND THROUGH SEVENTH CAUSES OF ACTION IN PLAINTIFFS JE SEON OH, ESTHER OH, JORDAN OH, AND JOSHUA OH'S COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES; ETC.

8/25/2015: DEFENDANT TARA VILLAGE HOA'S NOTICE OF DEMURRER AND DEMURRER TO THE SECOND THROUGH SEVENTH CAUSES OF ACTION IN PLAINTIFFS JE SEON OH, ESTHER OH, JORDAN OH, AND JOSHUA OH'S COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES; ETC.

NOTICE OF LODGMENT IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT TARA VILLAGE HOA'S DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFFS' COMPLAINT

8/25/2015: NOTICE OF LODGMENT IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT TARA VILLAGE HOA'S DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFFS' COMPLAINT

FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES; ETC.

10/23/2015: FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES; ETC.

Minute Order

11/5/2015: Minute Order

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/26/2017
  • at 08:30 AM in Department A; (OSC-Failure to File Request for Dism; Advanced-Another date & vacated) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2017
  • Request-Dismissal-Partial; Filed by TARA VILLAGE HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION (Legacy Party)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2017
  • (Request-Dismissal); Filed by JE SEON OH (Plaintiff); ESTHER OH (Plaintiff); JORDAN OH (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2017
  • Request-Dismissal-Partial; Filed by Investment Management Company, LLC (Legacy Party)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2017
  • Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by Investment Management Company, LLC (Legacy Party)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2017
  • at 08:30 AM in Department A; Unknown Event Type - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2017
  • at 08:30 AM in Department A; Status Conference - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2016
  • Order Approving Compromise of Disputed Claim or Pending Action or Disposition of Proceeds of Judgment for Minor or Person With a Disability (Miscellaneous); Filed by ESTHER OH (Plaintiff); JORDAN OH (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2016
  • Order Approving Compromise of Disputed Claim or Pending Action or Disposition of Proceeds of Judgment for Minor or Person With a Disability (Miscellaneous); Filed by ESTHER OH (Plaintiff); JOSHUA OH (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2016
  • Order; Filed by TARA VILLAGE HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION (Legacy Party); COMMUNITY PROPERTY MANAGEMENT COMPANY,LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
71 More Docket Entries
  • 07/22/2015
  • Proof-Service/Summons; Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2015
  • Proof-Service/Summons; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2015
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2015
  • Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2015
  • COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES; DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL 1) NEGLIGENCE; ETC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2015
  • Complaint; Filed by JE SEON OH (Plaintiff); ESTHER OH (Plaintiff); JORDAN OH (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2015
  • Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by null

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2015
  • Summons-Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2015
  • SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2015
  • Complaint; Filed by JE SEON OH (Plaintiff); ESTHER OH (Plaintiff); JORDAN OH (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less