This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/01/2018 at 17:35:40 (UTC).

JAVIER GARCIA VS WEST COAST PREMIER BUILDERS LLC ET AL

Case Summary

On 01/29/2016 JAVIER GARCIA filed a Labor - Wrongful Termination lawsuit against WEST COAST PREMIER BUILDERS LLC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are HOLLY E. KENDIG and ERNEST HIROSHIGE. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****8639

  • Filing Date:

    01/29/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Wrongful Termination

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

HOLLY E. KENDIG

ERNEST HIROSHIGE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

GARCIA JAVIER

Defendants and Respondents

KALIFORNIA BUSINESS STAFFING INC.

STUDIO ROCA INC.

KBS STAFFING INC.

PERSONNEL STAFFING GROUP LLC

DOES 1 TO 100

WEST COAST PREMIER BUILDERS LLC

KBS STAFFING

AMEN PAL (DOE 1)

ANTHONY ELWART (DOE 3)

RICHARD ORTIZ (DOE 2)

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

LAW OFFICE OF DONALD A. HILLAND

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES FOR: (1) UNPAID OVERTIME WAGES; ETC

1/29/2016: COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES FOR: (1) UNPAID OVERTIME WAGES; ETC

ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER (SUPERIOR COURT)

2/2/2016: ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER (SUPERIOR COURT)

PEREMPTORY CHALLENGE TO JUDICIAL OFFICER (CODE CIV. PROC., ? 170.6)

2/3/2016: PEREMPTORY CHALLENGE TO JUDICIAL OFFICER (CODE CIV. PROC., ? 170.6)

NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; ETC.

2/5/2016: NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; ETC.

PEREMPTORY CHALLENGE TO JUDICIAL OFFICER (CODE CIV. PROC., ? 170.6)

2/17/2016: PEREMPTORY CHALLENGE TO JUDICIAL OFFICER (CODE CIV. PROC., ? 170.6)

NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE; PROOF OF SERVICE

2/23/2016: NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE; PROOF OF SERVICE

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

3/22/2016: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

4/21/2016: NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE CASE

6/1/2016: NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE CASE

NOTICE RE: CONTINUANCE OF HEARING

9/22/2016: NOTICE RE: CONTINUANCE OF HEARING

Minute Order

11/4/2016: Minute Order

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT

11/16/2016: REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT

AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT

3/13/2017: AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT

AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT

3/13/2017: AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT

AMENDED SUMMONS TO AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT

3/13/2017: AMENDED SUMMONS TO AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT

3/13/2017: REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT

NOTICE OF BANKRUPTCY; PROOF OF SERVICE

3/13/2017: NOTICE OF BANKRUPTCY; PROOF OF SERVICE

Minute Order

4/14/2017: Minute Order

27 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/15/2017
  • at 09:00 am in Department 54, Ernest Hiroshige, Presiding; Non-Appearance (Case Review) - Hearing prev advanced & vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2017
  • at 09:00 am in Department 54, Ernest Hiroshige, Presiding; OSC-Failure to File Req Ent of Def - Case Dismissed/Disposed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2017
  • Request and Entry of Dismissal (ENTIRE ACTION WITHOUT PREJUDICE ); Filed by Attorney for Pltf/Petnr

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2017
  • at 09:00 am in Department 54, Ernest Hiroshige, Presiding; OSC-Failure to File Req Ent of Def - OSC held and continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2017
  • Declaration (of donal a. h8illand; proof of service ); Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2017
  • Notice (OF BANKRUPTCY STATUS HEARING ); Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2017
  • at 09:00 am in Department 54, Ernest Hiroshige, Presiding; OSC-Failure to File Req Ent of Def - OSC held and continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2017
  • Statement of Damages (STUDIO ROCA INC. ); Filed by Attorney for Pltf/Petnr

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2017
  • Request to Enter Default (REJECT FOR STUDIO-9.13.17.18.24. 29.30 NEED NAME OF AGENT ON COMP & SUMMONS AND STATEMENT OF DAMAGES DATE OF MAILING ITEM 6B CANNOT BE DATED BEFORE ITEM 3. ); Filed by Attorney for Pltf/Petnr

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2017
  • Statement of Damages; Filed by Attorney for Pltf/Petnr

    Read MoreRead Less
16 More Docket Entries
  • 02/23/2016
  • Notice; Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2016
  • Notice-Case Management Conference; Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2016
  • at 08:30 am in Department 42, Holly E. Kendig, Presiding; Affidavit of Prejudice - Court makes order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2016
  • Affidavit of Prejudice--Peremptory; Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2016
  • Summons Filed; Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2016
  • Notice-Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2016
  • Affidavit of Prejudice--Peremptory (170.6 ); Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2016
  • Order-Court Fee Waiver; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2016
  • Request-Waive Court Fees; Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2016
  • Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less