This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/16/2018 at 07:11:18 (UTC).

JASON H LANDVER VS MELISSA B LANDVER

Case Summary

On 04/22/2014 JASON H LANDVER filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against MELISSA B LANDVER. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****0427

  • Filing Date:

    04/22/2014

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

LANVER JASON H.

Respondent

LANDVER MELISSA B.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

GINZBURG ALEXANDER ROMAN

BARQUET SBN-280162 KATERINE I.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/14/2014
  • Notice - Withdrawal of Attorney of Record (By Petitioner )

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/07/2014
  • Judgment

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/07/2014
  • Notice - Entry of Judgment

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/18/2014
  • Declaration - Default FL170

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/18/2014
  • Declaration - Service of Preliminary Dec. of Disclosure (- On Behalf of: Respondent: Landver, Melissa ); Filed by Respondent

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/18/2014
  • Appearance, Stipulations and Waivers

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/18/2014
  • Stipulation - Waiver of Final Declaration of Disclosure

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/18/2014
  • Declaration - Service of Preliminary Dec. of Disclosure (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Lanver, Jason ); Filed by Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/25/2014
  • Judgment Package Received - Stipulated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/08/2014
  • Substitution of Attorney (By Respondent )

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/02/2014
  • Response (- Filed and Entered on 2014-05-02 )

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/02/2014
  • Proof of Service - Mail (- On Behalf of: Respondent: Landver, Melissa ); Filed by Respondent

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/02/2014
  • Milestone 2 Completed (Entered Date: 05-08-14 )

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/22/2014
  • Summons (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Lanver, Jason ); Filed by Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/22/2014
  • Petition (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Lanver, Jason ); Filed by Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less