This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/23/2019 at 08:35:30 (UTC).

JASON EDWARD ALLEN ET AL VS L A COLISEUM AND SPORTS ARENA ET

Case Summary

On 05/19/2016 JASON EDWARD ALLEN filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against L A COLISEUM AND SPORTS ARENA ET. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****1062

  • Filing Date:

    05/19/2016

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Petitioners

FREE HEATHER

ALLEN JASON EDWARD

Defendants, Respondents and Cross Defendants

DOES 1 THROUGH 100

IMAGINASIAN ENTERTAINMENT INC.

CJ E&M AMERICA INC.

LOS ANGELES COLISEUM AND SPORTS ARENA

M. NET NORTH AMERICA INC.

AVALON TENT & PARTY CORPORATION

IMAGECRAFT PRODUCTIONS INC.

ROES 1 THROUGH 100

Defendants, Respondents and Cross Plaintiffs

CJ E&M AMERICA INC.

LOS ANGELES COLISEUM AND SPORTS ARENA

AVALON TENT & PARTY CORPORATION

IMAGECRAFT PRODUCTIONS INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorneys

LAW OFFICES OF DAVID AZIZI

RAYMOND GHERMAZIAN A PROF. LAW CORP.

GHERMEZIAN RAYMOND

AZIZI DAVID

Defendant Attorneys

MITTSKUS DANIELLE DUBE

KOJIKIAN JACQUELINE ESQ.

CAREY JANE ELIZABETH

Cross Plaintiff Attorney

GOBEL SEVAN

Cross Defendant Attorney

GRGURIC SHERRY LYNN

 

Court Documents

DEFENDANT'S EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL AND DISCOVERY CUTOFF; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES; DECLARATION OF ALEXANDRA R. RAMBIS

1/16/2018: DEFENDANT'S EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL AND DISCOVERY CUTOFF; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES; DECLARATION OF ALEXANDRA R. RAMBIS

DEFENDANT, AVALON TENT & PARTY CORPORATION'S, CROSS-COMPLAINT; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES

5/2/2018: DEFENDANT, AVALON TENT & PARTY CORPORATION'S, CROSS-COMPLAINT; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES

Unknown

6/6/2018: Unknown

IMAGECRAFT PRODUCTIONS, INC.'S ANSWER TO AVALON TENT & PARTY CORPORATION'S CROSS-COMPLAINT

7/20/2018: IMAGECRAFT PRODUCTIONS, INC.'S ANSWER TO AVALON TENT & PARTY CORPORATION'S CROSS-COMPLAINT

DEFENDANT'S SEPARATE STATEMENT IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSES TO DEMAND FOR PRODUCTION, SET ONE

8/22/2018: DEFENDANT'S SEPARATE STATEMENT IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSES TO DEMAND FOR PRODUCTION, SET ONE

PLAINTIFF'S EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER CONTINUING DEFENDANT AVALON TENT & PARTY CORPORATION'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT FOR 30 DAYS MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES; ETC

8/24/2018: PLAINTIFF'S EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER CONTINUING DEFENDANT AVALON TENT & PARTY CORPORATION'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT FOR 30 DAYS MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES; ETC

PLAINTIFFS SEPARATE STATEMENT OF UNDISPUTED MATERIAL FACTS AND REFERENCES TO SUPPORTING EVIDENCE [FILED IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS PPOSITION TO DEFENDANT AVALON'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

9/21/2018: PLAINTIFFS SEPARATE STATEMENT OF UNDISPUTED MATERIAL FACTS AND REFERENCES TO SUPPORTING EVIDENCE [FILED IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS PPOSITION TO DEFENDANT AVALON'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

Request for Judicial Notice

12/7/2018: Request for Judicial Notice

Declaration

12/7/2018: Declaration

Case Management Statement

1/4/2019: Case Management Statement

Memorandum

1/15/2019: Memorandum

Request for Judicial Notice

1/23/2019: Request for Judicial Notice

Opposition

2/1/2019: Opposition

Reply

2/21/2019: Reply

Motion to Tax Costs

4/19/2019: Motion to Tax Costs

Notice of Motion

4/23/2019: Notice of Motion

COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES AND PERSONAL INJURIES BASED ON: 1. NEGLIGENCE; ETC

5/19/2016: COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES AND PERSONAL INJURIES BASED ON: 1. NEGLIGENCE; ETC

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

6/22/2016: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

202 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/23/2019
  • Notice of Motion; Filed by Jason Edward Allen (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2019
  • Motion to Tax Costs; Filed by Jason Edward Allen (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2019
  • Notice ( of Change of Handling Attorney Within Firm); Filed by Avalon Tent & Party Corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2019
  • Memorandum of Costs (Summary); Filed by Imagecraft Productions, Inc. (Cross-Complainant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2019
  • Memorandum of Costs (Summary); Filed by Los Angeles Coliseum and Sports Arena (Defendant); CJ E&M America, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2019
  • Memorandum of Costs (Summary); Filed by Los Angeles Coliseum and Sports Arena (Defendant); CJ E&M America, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2019
  • Notice (OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT UPON GRANT OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT IN FAVOR OF DEFENDANT AND CROSS-DEFENDANT, IMAGECRAFT PRODUCTIONS, INC.); Filed by Imagecraft Productions, Inc. (Cross-Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2019
  • at 2:16 PM in Department 40; Non-Appearance Case Review

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2019
  • Certificate of Mailing for (Minute Order (Non-Appearance Case Review re: "Judgment by Court in favor of...) of 03/19/2019); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2019
  • Minute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review re: "Judgment by Court in favor of...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
411 More Docket Entries
  • 06/02/2016
  • SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2016
  • Summons; Filed by Jason Edward Allen (Plaintiff); Heather Free (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2016
  • Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2016
  • ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER (SUPERIOR COURT)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2016
  • ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER (SUPERIOR COURT)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2016
  • Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2016
  • Request to Waive Court Fees; Filed by Jason Edward Allen (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2016
  • Complaint; Filed by Jason Edward Allen (Plaintiff); Heather Free (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2016
  • COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES AND PERSONAL INJURIES BASED ON: 1. NEGLIGENCE; ETC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2016
  • Request to Waive Court Fees; Filed by Heather Free (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Imagecraft Productions, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer GOBEL SEVAN ESQ.