This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/30/2021 at 02:21:27 (UTC).

JASON ALASCIO PIRES VS TOOTH & NAIL LLC ET AL

Case Summary

On 11/08/2013 JASON ALASCIO PIRES filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against TOOTH NAIL LLC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is KEVIN C. BRAZILE. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****7107

  • Filing Date:

    11/08/2013

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

KEVIN C. BRAZILE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

PIRES JASON ALASCIO

Defendants and Respondents

MORNINGSTAR FILMS LLC

SACHAR JONATHAN

TOOTH & NAIL LLC

DOES 1-50

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

ROSENFELD MEYER & SUSMAN LLP

 

Court Documents

SUMMONS -

11/8/2013: SUMMONS -

COMPLAINT FOR: 1. BREACH OF CONTRACT

11/8/2013: COMPLAINT FOR: 1. BREACH OF CONTRACT

ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING

2/4/2014: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING

NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

2/4/2014: NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

Minute Order -

3/26/2014: Minute Order -

Minute Order -

6/19/2014: Minute Order -

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/19/2017
  • DocketPaper file imaged and destroyed; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2014
  • Docketat 08:30 am in Department 20, Kevin C. Brazile, Presiding; Order to Show Cause (FAILURE TO APPEAR FOR PLAINTIFF;) - Case Dismissed/Disposed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2014
  • Docketat 08:30 am in Department 20, Kevin C. Brazile, Presiding; Conference-Case Management (AND; OSC RE: P.O.S.) - Completed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2014
  • DocketNotice-Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2014
  • DocketOSC-Failure to File Proof of Serv; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2013
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Tooth & Nail, LLC is a litigant