This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/13/2021 at 21:31:44 (UTC).

JASETTE H MCKINNEY VS THE ROSSLYN LOFTS HOUSING PARTNERS LP

Case Summary

On 08/01/2016 JASETTE H MCKINNEY filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against THE ROSSLYN LOFTS HOUSING PARTNERS LP. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are SERENA R. MURILLO, MARK A. BORENSTEIN and GEORGINA T. RIZK. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****9179

  • Filing Date:

    08/01/2016

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

SERENA R. MURILLO

MARK A. BORENSTEIN

GEORGINA T. RIZK

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

MCKINNEY JASETTE H.

Defendants and Respondents

ROSSLYN COMMERCIAL LLC

ROSSLYN PARTNERS LLC

DOES 1 TO 50

ROSSLYN LOFTS HOUSING PARTNERS LP THE

LOGAN PROPERTY MANAGEMENT INC.

Defendant, Cross Plaintiff and Respondent

LOGAN PROPERTY MANAGEMENT INC.

Cross Defendant

ROES 1 THROUGH 100 INCLUSIVE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorneys

LAW OFFICES OF RON A. ROSEN JANFAZA

JANFAZA RON A.

JANFAZA RON A. ESQ.

Defendant Attorneys

BERKE DANIEL ROBERT

BERKE DANIEL ROBERT ESQ.

LEE TED MATTHEW ESQ.

 

Court Documents

Informal Discovery Conference Form for Personal Injury Courts - INFORMAL DISCOVERY CONFERENCE FORM FOR PERSONAL INJURY COURTS (HELD AND RESOLVED)

4/12/2019: Informal Discovery Conference Form for Personal Injury Courts - INFORMAL DISCOVERY CONFERENCE FORM FOR PERSONAL INJURY COURTS (HELD AND RESOLVED)

Motion to Compel - MOTION TO COMPEL DEPOSITION

7/3/2019: Motion to Compel - MOTION TO COMPEL DEPOSITION

Motion to Continue Trial Date

7/3/2019: Motion to Continue Trial Date

Opposition - OPPOSITION OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO COMPEL PLAINTIFF'S DEPOSITION

7/23/2019: Opposition - OPPOSITION OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO COMPEL PLAINTIFF'S DEPOSITION

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON DEFENDANT/CROSS-COMPLAINANT THE ROSSLYN LOFTS HOUS...)

8/5/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON DEFENDANT/CROSS-COMPLAINANT THE ROSSLYN LOFTS HOUS...)

Notice of Ruling

8/6/2019: Notice of Ruling

Demand for Jury Trial

8/30/2019: Demand for Jury Trial

Summons - SUMMONS CROSS-COMPLAINT

8/30/2019: Summons - SUMMONS CROSS-COMPLAINT

Cross-Complaint

8/30/2019: Cross-Complaint

Answer

8/30/2019: Answer

Informal Discovery Conference Form for Personal Injury Courts

11/15/2019: Informal Discovery Conference Form for Personal Injury Courts

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (INFORMAL DISCOVERY CONFERENCE (IDC))

11/15/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (INFORMAL DISCOVERY CONFERENCE (IDC))

Motion to Compel - MOTION TO COMPEL THE DEPOSITION OF DEVIONE MCKINNEY; REQUEST FOR SANCTIONS; AND DECLARATION OF DANIEL R. BERKE, ESQ. IN SUPPORT THEREOF

1/7/2020: Motion to Compel - MOTION TO COMPEL THE DEPOSITION OF DEVIONE MCKINNEY; REQUEST FOR SANCTIONS; AND DECLARATION OF DANIEL R. BERKE, ESQ. IN SUPPORT THEREOF

Ex Parte Application - EX PARTE APPLICATION TO (1) ADVANCE HEARING ON MOTION TO COMPEL DEPOSITION OF DEVIONE MCKINNEY AND (2) TO CONTINUE TRIAL AND ALL RELATED DATES

1/24/2020: Ex Parte Application - EX PARTE APPLICATION TO (1) ADVANCE HEARING ON MOTION TO COMPEL DEPOSITION OF DEVIONE MCKINNEY AND (2) TO CONTINUE TRIAL AND ALL RELATED DATES

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON EX PARTE APPLICATION TO (1) ADVANCE HEARING ON MOT...)

1/24/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON EX PARTE APPLICATION TO (1) ADVANCE HEARING ON MOT...)

Proof of Personal Service

2/13/2020: Proof of Personal Service

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (HEARING ON MOTION TO COMPEL THE DEPOSITION OF DEVIONE MCKINNE...) OF 02/28/2020

2/28/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (HEARING ON MOTION TO COMPEL THE DEPOSITION OF DEVIONE MCKINNE...) OF 02/28/2020

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO COMPEL THE DEPOSITION OF DEVIONE MCKINNE...)

2/28/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO COMPEL THE DEPOSITION OF DEVIONE MCKINNE...)

67 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/07/2021
  • Hearing10/07/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department 29 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2021
  • Docketat 10:25 AM in Department 29, Serena R. Murillo, Presiding; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order Re Notice of Settlement)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Court Order Re Notice of Settlement) of 08/05/2021); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2021
  • DocketNotice of Settlement; Filed by Logan Property Management, Inc. (Defendant); Rosslyn Lofts Housing Partners, LP, The (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2021
  • DocketStipulation and Order (to Extend and Toll the Time to Dismiss Plaintiff's Case Past 5 Year Rule); Filed by Jasette H. McKinney (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 29, Serena R. Murillo, Presiding; Jury Trial - Not Held - Continued - Party's Motion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2021
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 29, Serena R. Murillo, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Continued - Party's Motion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2021
  • DocketNotice (Notice of Stipulation to Extend and Toll the Time to Dismiss Plaintiff's Case Past 5 Year Rule); Filed by Jasette H. McKinney (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 29, Serena R. Murillo, Presiding; Hearing on Motion for Protective Order (to Prevent Plaintiff and Plaintiff's Counsel From Unnecessarily Obstructing the Deposition of the Court Ordered Deposition of Percipient Witness Devione McKinney; Request for Monetary Sanctions, Jointly and Severally, Against Plaintiff/Plaintiff's Counsel) - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Party

    Read MoreRead Less
132 More Docket Entries
  • 05/09/2018
  • DocketProof-Service/Summons; Filed by Jasette H. McKinney (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2018
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 91; Jury Trial (Jury Trial; Court makes order) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2018
  • DocketMinute order entered: 2018-02-01 00:00:00; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2018
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2018
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 91; Final Status Conference (Final Status Conference; Off Calendar) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2018
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2018
  • DocketMinute order entered: 2018-01-16 00:00:00; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2016
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Jasette H. McKinney (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2016
  • DocketSUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2016
  • DocketCOMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES)

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: BC629179    Hearing Date: July 31, 2020    Dept: 29

Defendants’ Motion to Compel the Deposition of Devionne McKinney; Request for Sanctions, is GRANTED. Cal Code Civ Procedure § 2025.450. The witness is ordered to appear for her deposition within 10 days as duly noticed by Defendants.

On 7/15/19, Defendants served the witness, Devionne McKinney, with a subpoena for her personal appearance at a deposition scheduled for 8/13/19. Motion, Ex. A.

Defendants then served a second subpoena on 10/21/19, for the witness’ appearance at a deposition scheduled for 11/7/19. Motion, Ex. B. The witness did not appear at the 11/7/19 deposition. Motion, Ex. C.

The Court may compel the compliance of a witness to a subpoena for that witnesses’ appearance where the deponent fails to appear. Cal Code Civ Procedure § 1987.1. The Court’s file reflects that Defendants personally served this motion on Ms. McKinney on 6/24/19. The witness has not opposed the motion.

The Court imposes sanctions of $410.00 against Devionne McKinney for her failure to comply with the deposition subpoena for her appearance on 11/7/19 pursuant to Code Civ Procedure § 2020.240 and § 1992.

Moving party is ordered to give notice.

Case Number: BC629179    Hearing Date: February 28, 2020    Dept: 29

McKinney v. The Rosslyn Lofts Housing Partners LP

Defendants’ Motion to Compel the Deposition of Devione McKinney; Request for Sanctions is TAKEN OFF CALENDAR for insufficient notice of the motion.

Defendants personally served the motion on the non -party witness on 2/7/2020. Defendants did not provide 16 court days of notice. Cal Code Civil Procedure § 1005(b). The motion was required to be personally served on 2/4/20 (February 12th and 17th were holidays and not “court” days). Cal Code Civil Procedure § 12b.

Moving party is ordered to give notice.

related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where LOGAN PROPERTY MANAGEMENT INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where THE ROSSLYN LOFTS HOUSING PARTNERS LP. is a litigant