This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 03/06/2016 at 14:39:37 (UTC).

JARED SIGLER VS. DENNIS RAYMOND RICHARD, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 11/08/2012 JARED SIGLER filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against DENNIS RAYMOND RICHARD. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Torrance Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are RAFAEL A. ONGKEKO and LAURA C. ELLISON. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****8108

  • Filing Date:

    11/08/2012

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Torrance Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

RAFAEL A. ONGKEKO

LAURA C. ELLISON

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SIGLER JARED

Defendants

RICHMOND DENNIS RAYMOND

RICHMOND MARGARET

RICHARD MARGARET

DOES 1 THROUGH 50

RICHARD DENNIS RAYMOND

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

FIERBERG IRA M.

Defendant Attorney

WEBB SHARON K.

 

Court Documents

CIVIL DEPOSIT

4/11/2013: CIVIL DEPOSIT

NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT

4/11/2013: NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT

Minute Order

4/17/2013: Minute Order

NOTICE OF RULING RE FSC AND TRIAL DATES

4/23/2013: NOTICE OF RULING RE FSC AND TRIAL DATES

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

10/3/2013: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

10/18/2013: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/18/2013
  • Request for Entry of Dismissal (WITH PREJUDICE ENTIRE ACTION OF ALL PARTIES AND ALL CAUSES OF ACTION ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2013
  • Request for Entry of Dismissal ( W/PREJ ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2013
  • Notice of Ruling (RE FSC AND TRIAL DATES ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2013
  • Notice (OF CASE REASSIGNMENT ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2013
  • Receipt (CIVIL DEPOSIT RE JURY FEES $150.00 ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2013
  • Statement-Case Management Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2013
  • Receipt - General (CIVIL DEPOSIT- JURY FEES POSTED ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2013
  • Demand for Jury Trial Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2013
  • Statement-Case Management Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2013
  • Answer to Complaint Filed (ANSWERING PARTIES: DENNIS RAYMOND RICHARD AND MARGARET RICHARD ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 04/02/2013
  • Declaration (OF SUBSTITUTION OF SERVICE ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2013
  • Notice of Case Reassignment & Ord Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2013
  • Rtn of Service of Summons & Compl (PARTY SERVED: MARGARET RICHARD ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2013
  • Summons Filed ((AMENDED) ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2013
  • Amendment to Complaint (INCORRECT NAME: DENNIS RAYMOND RICHMOND . CORRECT NAME: DENNIS RAYMOND RICHARD ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2013
  • Amendment to Complaint (INCORRECT NAME: MARGARET RICHMOND TRUE NAME: MARGARET RICHARD ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2012
  • OSC-RE Other (Miscellaneous) Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2012
  • Summons Filed Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2012
  • Notice-Case Management Conference Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2012
  • Complaint Filed

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.