This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/06/2021 at 11:08:20 (UTC).

JANUS CORPORATION VS ANDREW ELLIOT CONSTRUCTION INC ET AL

Case Summary

On 02/09/2012 JANUS CORPORATION filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against ANDREW ELLIOT CONSTRUCTION INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are ELIZABETH ALLEN WHITE and DEIRDRE HILL. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****8830

  • Filing Date:

    02/09/2012

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

ELIZABETH ALLEN WHITE

DEIRDRE HILL

 

Party Details

Petitioner and Plaintiff

JANUS CORPORATION

Defendants and Respondents

AMERICAN CONTRACTORS INDEMNITY COMPANY

ANDREW ELLIOT CONSTRUCTION INC.

ATLANTIC PEARL INVESTMENTS

DEUTSCHE BANK

DEUTSCHE BANK TRUST CO AMERICAS

MORNING VIEW HOTELS

TROST ANDREW WARREN

TROST KRISTINE ELAINE

DOES 1 THROUGH 100

MORNING VIEW HOTELS- BEVERLY HILLS LLC

MORNING VIEW HOTELS-BH I LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner and Plaintiff Attorney

HANNAH HALLIE D.

 

Court Documents

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL -

11/1/2012: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL -

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL -

11/1/2012: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL -

Minute Order -

9/25/2012: Minute Order -

ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING

7/18/2012: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING

NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

7/18/2012: NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

Minute Order -

7/18/2012: Minute Order -

Minute Order -

7/13/2012: Minute Order -

NOTICE OF COURT ORDER RESETTING TIME ON CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

7/3/2012: NOTICE OF COURT ORDER RESETTING TIME ON CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT -

7/3/2012: CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT -

Minute Order -

6/26/2012: Minute Order -

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL -

4/12/2012: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL -

NOTICE OF STAY OF PROCEEDINGS

3/19/2012: NOTICE OF STAY OF PROCEEDINGS

UN LITMITED CIVIL DAMAGES EXCEED $25,000

2/29/2012: UN LITMITED CIVIL DAMAGES EXCEED $25,000

NOTICE OF RELATED CASE

2/16/2012: NOTICE OF RELATED CASE

NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

2/16/2012: NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

COMPLAINT FOR: I) BREACH OF CONTRACT; ETC

2/9/2012: COMPLAINT FOR: I) BREACH OF CONTRACT; ETC

SUMMONS -

2/9/2012: SUMMONS -

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/01/2012
  • DocketPartial Dismissal (with Prejudice); Filed by Janus Corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2012
  • DocketPartial Dismissal (with Prejudice); Filed by Janus Corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2012
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2012
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2012
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 49; (Order to Show Cause; Vacated) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2012
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 49; Court Order - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2012
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2012
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 49; Case Management Conference - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2012
  • Docketat 1:30 PM in Department 48; Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2012
  • DocketNOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
15 More Docket Entries
  • 03/19/2012
  • DocketNotice of Stay of Proceedings (Bankruptcy); Filed by Janus Corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/29/2012
  • DocketNotice; Filed by Janus Corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/29/2012
  • DocketUN LITMITED CIVIL DAMAGES EXCEED $25,000

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2012
  • DocketNOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2012
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2012
  • DocketNotice; Filed by Janus Corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2012
  • DocketNOTICE OF RELATED CASE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2012
  • DocketSUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2012
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR: I) BREACH OF CONTRACT; ETC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2012
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Janus Corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where MORNING VIEW HOTELS- BEVERLY HILLS LIMILTED LIABILITY COMPAN DBA MR. C BE is a litigant

Latest cases where JANUS CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where ATLANTIC PEARL INVESTMENTS INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where DEUTSCHE BANK is a litigant