This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 04/25/2019 at 12:37:20 (UTC).

JANINE LOWY VS PETER LOWY

Case Summary

On 01/15/2016 JANINE LOWY filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against PETER LOWY. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is HYMOWITZ, LAURA. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****2723

  • Filing Date:

    01/15/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

HYMOWITZ, LAURA

 

Party Details

Petitioner

LOWY JANINE

Respondent

LOWY PETER

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

MANNIS JOSEPH

Respondent Attorney

WASSER DENNIS MATHEW

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/15/2018
  • Notice - Unavailability of Counsel; Filed by Attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2018
  • at 1:30 PM in Department 2C, Hymowitz, Laura, Presiding; FCCR Conference - Off Calendar - Case Settled

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2018
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2018
  • Declaration - Default FL170; Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2018
  • Appearance, Stipulations and Waivers; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2018
  • Judgment (of disso/stipulated ); Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2018
  • Notice - Entry of Judgment; Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2018
  • Judgment Package Received After Hearing (sent to dept.83 on 06/11/18 ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2018
  • Declaration - Service of Prelim & Final Dec of Disclosure; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2018
  • Notice - FCCR Conference (Notice by LASC )

    Read MoreRead Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 05/11/2017
  • 3rd Notice Sent (Entered Date: 05-11-17 )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2017
  • Notice - Unavailability of Counsel (5/19-6/18/2017 - On Behalf of: Petitioner: Lowy, Janine ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2016
  • Notice - Change of Address (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Lowy, Janine ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2016
  • Response (- On Behalf of: Respondent: Lowy, Peter - Filed and Entered on 2016-05-05 ); Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2016
  • Milestone 2 Completed (Entered Date: 05-12-16 )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2016
  • Request - Enter Default FL165

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2016
  • Notice - Acknowledgment of Receipt (summ/compl - On Behalf of: Petitioner: Lowy, Janine - Signed on 2016-02-04 ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2016
  • Milestone 1 Completed (Entered Date: 02-11-16 )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2016
  • Petition (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Lowy, Janine ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2016
  • Summons (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Lowy, Janine ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.