Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 03/07/2016 at 10:08:31 (UTC).

JANET SIONI VS PROVIDENCE TARZANA MEDICAL, ET AL

Case Summary

On 03/02/2012 JANET SIONI filed a Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice lawsuit against PROVIDENCE TARZANA MEDICAL. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Van Nuys Courthouse East located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are AMY D. HOGUE, RUSSELL STEVEN KUSSMAN and DANIEL J. BUCKLEY. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****6521

  • Filing Date:

    03/02/2012

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Van Nuys Courthouse East

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

AMY D. HOGUE

RUSSELL STEVEN KUSSMAN

DANIEL J. BUCKLEY

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SIONI JANET

Defendants

AMISUB OF CALIFORNIA INC.

BREWSTER M.D. G. SCOTT

DOES 1 TO 100

EMERGENCY MEDICAL ASSOCIATES

ENCINO TARZANA REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER

MOY M.D. KENNETH

PROVIDENCE HEALTH SYSTEM SOUTHER

PROVIDENCE TARZANA MEDICAL CENTER

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ETEHAD SIMON P.

Defendant Attorneys

VIGIL CARMEN

STAR LINDA

 

Court Documents

Minute Order

5/22/2013: Minute Order

DEFENDANT PROVIDENCE TARZANA MEDICAL CENTEWS EX PI4RTE APPLICATION FOR JUDICIAL

5/22/2013: DEFENDANT PROVIDENCE TARZANA MEDICAL CENTEWS EX PI4RTE APPLICATION FOR JUDICIAL

NOTICE OF RULING

5/23/2013: NOTICE OF RULING

DEFENDANT KENNETH MOY, M.D.?S NOTICE OF LODGING DOCUMENTS AND RECORDS

7/5/2013: DEFENDANT KENNETH MOY, M.D.?S NOTICE OF LODGING DOCUMENTS AND RECORDS

DEFENDANT G. SCOTT BREWSTER, M.D.?S NOTICE OF LODGING DOCUMENTS AND RECORDS

7/5/2013: DEFENDANT G. SCOTT BREWSTER, M.D.?S NOTICE OF LODGING DOCUMENTS AND RECORDS

DECLARATION OF HAROLD W. WILKIE, M.D., JR. IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT G. SCOTT BREWSTER, M.D.?S MOTION?FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

7/5/2013: DECLARATION OF HAROLD W. WILKIE, M.D., JR. IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT G. SCOTT BREWSTER, M.D.?S MOTION?FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

DECLARATION OF HAROLD W. WILKIE, M.D., JR. IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT KENNETH MOY, M.D.?S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

7/5/2013: DECLARATION OF HAROLD W. WILKIE, M.D., JR. IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT KENNETH MOY, M.D.?S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

COMPACT DISC CONTAINING EVIDENCE IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT ON BEHALF OF G. SCOTT BREWSTER, M.D.

7/5/2013: COMPACT DISC CONTAINING EVIDENCE IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT ON BEHALF OF G. SCOTT BREWSTER, M.D.

EXHIBITS IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT KENNETH MOY, M.D.?S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT; DECLARATION OF MICHELE E. WESTHOFF, ESQ.

7/5/2013: EXHIBITS IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT KENNETH MOY, M.D.?S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT; DECLARATION OF MICHELE E. WESTHOFF, ESQ.

DEFENDANT G. SCOTT BREWSTER, M.D.?S SEPARATE STATEMENT OF UNDISPUTED MATERIAL FACTS IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FO SUMMARY JUDGMENT

7/5/2013: DEFENDANT G. SCOTT BREWSTER, M.D.?S SEPARATE STATEMENT OF UNDISPUTED MATERIAL FACTS IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FO SUMMARY JUDGMENT

EXHIBITS IN SUPPORT OE DEFENDANT G. SCOTT BREWSTER, M.D.?S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT; DECLARATIION OF MICHELE E. WESTHOFF, ESQ.

7/5/2013: EXHIBITS IN SUPPORT OE DEFENDANT G. SCOTT BREWSTER, M.D.?S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT; DECLARATIION OF MICHELE E. WESTHOFF, ESQ.

INDEX OF EXHIBITS AND EXHIBITS IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF?S OPPOSITION TO KENNETH L. MOY, M.D.?S AND G. SCOTT BREWSTER, M.D.?S MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

8/30/2013: INDEX OF EXHIBITS AND EXHIBITS IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF?S OPPOSITION TO KENNETH L. MOY, M.D.?S AND G. SCOTT BREWSTER, M.D.?S MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF?S OPPOSITION TO G. SCOTT BREWSTER, M.D.?S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

8/30/2013: MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF?S OPPOSITION TO G. SCOTT BREWSTER, M.D.?S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

DEFENDANT G. SCOTT BREWSTER, M.D.S REPLY TO PLAINTIFF?S OPPOSITION TO DR. BREWSTER?S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

9/13/2013: DEFENDANT G. SCOTT BREWSTER, M.D.S REPLY TO PLAINTIFF?S OPPOSITION TO DR. BREWSTER?S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

DEFENDANT KENNETH MOY, M.D.?S REPLY TO PLAINTIFFS OPPOSITION TO DR. MOY?S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

9/13/2013: DEFENDANT KENNETH MOY, M.D.?S REPLY TO PLAINTIFFS OPPOSITION TO DR. MOY?S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

DEFENDANT G. SCOTT BREWSTER, M.D.?S OBJECTIONS TO EVIDENCE SUBMITTED BY PLAINTIFF LN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT?S 1OTION FOR STJMMARY JUDGMENT

9/13/2013: DEFENDANT G. SCOTT BREWSTER, M.D.?S OBJECTIONS TO EVIDENCE SUBMITTED BY PLAINTIFF LN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT?S 1OTION FOR STJMMARY JUDGMENT

DEFENDANT KENNETH MOY, M.D.?S OBJECTIONS TO EVIDENCE SUBMITTED BY PLAINTIFF IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT?S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

9/13/2013: DEFENDANT KENNETH MOY, M.D.?S OBJECTIONS TO EVIDENCE SUBMITTED BY PLAINTIFF IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT?S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

Minute Order

9/18/2013: Minute Order

23 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/19/2013
  • Notice-Entry-Dismissal (AND PROOF OF SERVICE; ) Filed by Attorney-Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2013
  • Request for Dismissal (Entire Action W/Prej.; ) Filed by Plaintiff in Pro Per

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2013
  • Reply/Response Filed by Attorney for Deft/Respnt

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2013
  • Response Filed by Attorney for Pltf/Petnr

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2013
  • Points and Authorities Filed by Attorney for Pltf/Petnr

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2013
  • Proof of Service (PP) Filed by Attorney for Pltf/Petnr

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2013
  • List of Exhibits Filed by Attorney for Pltf/Petnr

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2013
  • Declaration (PP) (of Harold W. Wilkie, M.D.,Jr.; ) Filed by Attorney for Deft/Respnt

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2013
  • Request for Judicial Notice Filed by Attorney for Deft/Respnt

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2013
  • Misc-Other (PP) (Conpact Disc Containing Evidence; ) Filed by Attorney for Deft/Respnt

    Read MoreRead Less
38 More Docket Entries
  • 07/09/2012
  • Order-Court Fee Waiver After Hrg Filed by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2012
  • Request-Waive Addl Court Fees Filed by Plaintiff in Pro Per

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2012
  • Order-Court Fee Waiver (hearing set ) Filed by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2012
  • Order-Court Fee Waiver Filed by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2012
  • Request-Waive Addl Court Fees Filed by Plaintiff in Pro Per

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2012
  • Complaint Filed by Plaintiff in Pro Per

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2012
  • Order-Court Fee Waiver Filed by Plaintiff in Pro Per

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2012
  • Summons Filed Filed by Plaintiff in Pro Per

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2012
  • Request-Waive Court Fees Filed by Plaintiff in Pro Per

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2012
  • Notice-Case Management Conference Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Encino-Tarzana Regional Medical Center is a litigant

Latest cases where EMERGENCY MEDICAL ASSOCIATES OF TAMPA BAY, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where PROVIDENCE TARZANA MEDICAL CENTER is a litigant

Latest cases where PROVIDENCE HEALTH SYSTEM-SOUTHERN is a litigant