This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/23/2019 at 08:01:39 (UTC).

JANE DOE VS ROBERT DEAN LEE ET AL

Case Summary

On 10/13/2016 JANE DOE filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against ROBERT DEAN LEE. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are AMY D. HOGUE, DEIRDRE HILL and MICHELLE WILLIAMS COURT. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****7135

  • Filing Date:

    10/13/2016

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

AMY D. HOGUE

DEIRDRE HILL

MICHELLE WILLIAMS COURT

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Minor

DOE JANE

Defendants and Respondents

LEE GLORIA D.

LEE ROBERT DEAN

DOES 1-30

Guardian Ad Litem

T.B.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Minor Attorneys

PACHULSKI STANG ZIEHL & JONES

MONES PAUL ESQ.

PAUL MONES ESQ.

Defendant and Respondent Attorneys

SAFARIAN HARRY A. ESQ.

STRAUSS LAWRENCE S.

STRAUSS LAWRENCE S. ESQ.

NOH JONATHAN D.

 

Court Documents

Minute Order

10/17/2016: Minute Order

Unknown

4/18/2017: Unknown

Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (C.C.P., ? 170.6)

5/8/2017: Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (C.C.P., ? 170.6)

Case Management Statement

7/10/2017: Case Management Statement

Unknown

8/18/2017: Unknown

Notice of Ruling

3/7/2018: Notice of Ruling

Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

8/14/2018: Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

Proof of Service

8/20/2018: Proof of Service

Order

10/10/2018: Order

Ex Parte Application

10/10/2018: Ex Parte Application

Minute Order

10/10/2018: Minute Order

APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM -CIVIL EX PARTE

10/13/2016: APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM -CIVIL EX PARTE

SPECIALLY APPEARING NAMED DEFENDANT GLORIA D. LEE'S OPPOSITION TO EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR TRO AND ETC.

10/17/2016: SPECIALLY APPEARING NAMED DEFENDANT GLORIA D. LEE'S OPPOSITION TO EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR TRO AND ETC.

NOTICE REGARDING DENIAL OF TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER

10/19/2016: NOTICE REGARDING DENIAL OF TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER

NOTICE OF REJECTION-APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM

10/24/2016: NOTICE OF REJECTION-APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM

FIRST AMENDED SUMMONS

11/18/2016: FIRST AMENDED SUMMONS

SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES AND INJUNCTIVE RELIEF: 1. BATTERY; 2. ASSAULT; 3. SEXUAL BATTERY; 4. FALSE IMPRISONMENT; 5. INTENTIONAL INFLICTION OF EMOTIONAL DISTRESS; 6. NEGLIGENCE; 7. NEGLIGE

2/28/2017: SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES AND INJUNCTIVE RELIEF: 1. BATTERY; 2. ASSAULT; 3. SEXUAL BATTERY; 4. FALSE IMPRISONMENT; 5. INTENTIONAL INFLICTION OF EMOTIONAL DISTRESS; 6. NEGLIGENCE; 7. NEGLIGE

ORDER TRANSFERRING PERSONAL INJURY (P1) CASE TO INDEPENDENT CALENDAR (IC) COURT

4/18/2017: ORDER TRANSFERRING PERSONAL INJURY (P1) CASE TO INDEPENDENT CALENDAR (IC) COURT

44 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/20/2019
  • at 10:00 AM in Department B, Deirdre Hill, Presiding; Jury Trial - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2019
  • Notice of Ruling; Filed by Gloria D. Lee (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department B, Deirdre Hill, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2019
  • Minute Order ( (Final Status Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/24/2018
  • Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2018
  • at 10:00 AM in Department B, Deirdre Hill, Presiding; Jury Trial - Not Held - Continued - Party's Motion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2018
  • at 08:30 AM in Department B, Deirdre Hill, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Continued - Party's Motion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2018
  • at 08:30 AM in Department B, Deirdre Hill, Presiding; Ex-Parte Proceedings

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2018
  • Order (re: Ex Parte Application to Continue Trial); Filed by T.B. (Legacy Party); Jane Doe (Plaintiff); Gloria D. Lee (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2018
  • Minute Order ((JOINT EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER CONTINUING TRIAL;)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
111 More Docket Entries
  • 10/17/2016
  • NOTICE AND PROOF OF SERVICE OF NOTICE OF PENDENCY OF ACTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2016
  • DECLARATION OF PAUL MONES IN SUPPORT OF EX PARTE MOTION FOR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER AND ETC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2016
  • Minute order entered: 2016-10-17 00:00:00; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2016
  • Ex-Parte Application; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2016
  • Complaint; Filed by Jane Doe (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2016
  • APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM -CIVIL EX PARTE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2016
  • Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2016
  • COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES AND INJUNCTIVE RELIEF: 1. BATTERY; ETC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2016
  • Application ; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2016
  • Application-Miscellaneous (FOR JANE DOE GUARDIAN AD LITEM(COPY) ); Filed by Attorney for Pltf/Petnr

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: BC637135    Hearing Date: March 03, 2020    Dept: SWB

Superior Court of California

County of Los Angeles

Southwest District

Torrance Dept. B

JANE DOE,

Plaintiff,

Case No.:

BC637135

vs.

[Tentative] RULING

ROBERT DEAN LEE, et al.,

Defendants.

Hearing Date: March 3, 2020

Moving Parties: Petitioner Tiphanie Babinet

Responding Party: None

Petition to Approve Compromise of Pending Action of Minor

The court considered the moving papers.

RULING

The court is inclined to grant petitioner’s Petition to Approve Compromise of Pending Action on behalf of minor claimant Jane Doe

Pursuant to California Rules of Court, Rule 7.952(a), petitioner and minor claimant are required to attend the hearing on the petition but the court finds good cause to dispense with the appearance of the minor based on her age and the circumstances.

BACKGROUND

On October 13, 2016, plaintiff Jane Doe, a minor by and through her guardian ad litem, T.B., filed a complaint against Robert Dean Lee and Gloria D. Lee for (1) battery, (2) assault, (3) sexual battery, (4) IIED, (5) negligence, (6) negligent supervision, (7) intentional fraud, and (8) constructive fraud.

Plaintiff alleges that she was eight years old when she was sexually abused by defendant and relative Robert Dean Lee from July 25, 2014 to July 28, 2014, in his home in Manhattan Beach and in his automobile. At the time of the abuse, R. Lee was 79 years old. He was convicted on March 2, 2016 for forced oral copulation of a child ten years or under, four counts of lewd acts with a child, and one count of possession of child pornography. He is serving 27 years to life. Defendant Gloria Lee married R. Lee in 1962 and was his wife at the time R. Lee sexually abused Jane Doe.

Plaintiff further alleges that she revealed the sexual abuse to her mother T.B. and her family in early August 2014. R. Lee was arrested on October 7, 2014. On October 14, 2014, G. Lee filed a petition for dissolution of marriage. On December 5, 2015, the court entered a consensual judgment in the uncontested divorce proceeding. In the judgment, R. Lee transferred substantially off of the community property to G. Lee, including the real property located at 457 28th Street, Manhattan Beach, the adjoining real property at 461 28th Street, the 1990 Ford Aerostar, and funds, assets, and securities in several accounts. On February 29, 2016, defendants executed interspousal deeds for the real properties and conveyed them to G. Lee as her sole and separate property. On the date of the judgment, the real property had a fair market value of $4 million. G. Lee resides at 461 28th Street.

On November 7, 2016, plaintiff filed a FAC.

On December 28, 2017, plaintiff filed a SAC adding causes of action for violations of Uniform Voidable Transactions Act.

DISCUSSION

The court has reviewed the petition and finds the settlement terms to be fair and reasonable. The agreement provides for defendant G. Lee to convey all of her assets to plaintiff upon G. Lee’s death. It allows G. Lee to continue residing in her home and receiving the rent from the adjoining single-family residence. G. Lee’s will provides that plaintiff is her sole heir. As to the trust, G. Lee is the beneficiary and upon her death, plaintiff is the sole beneficiary. As to the two grant deeds, G. Lee conveys the real property to the trust, and the grant deeds will be recorded after the court’s approval of the minor’s compromise. Each of the properties is appraised at $1.8 million. The assignment conveys all of G. Lee’s personal property to the trust. See Exh. 11.

Plaintiff’s attorneys incurred costs of $54,805.80. Plaintiff’s attorneys seek fees in the amount of 33 1/3% from the total amount of monies placed into trust after the sale of the real property plus any residuals placed into trust from other remaining sources including bank accounts and other financial instruments.

The court will retain jurisdiction until such time as all terms and conditions of the settlement are met and to approve the transfer of settlement proceeds into a blocked account.

The court is inclined to grant the petition.