This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/09/2019 at 23:14:59 (UTC).

JANE DOE CB VS IRWINDALE POLICE DEPARTMENT ET AL

Case Summary

On 04/10/2015 JANE DOE CB filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against IRWINDALE POLICE DEPARTMENT. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Pomona Courthouse South located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are DAVID SOTELO and OKI, DAN THOMAS. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****8440

  • Filing Date:

    04/10/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Pomona Courthouse South

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

DAVID SOTELO

OKI, DAN THOMAS

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Petitioners

CB JANE DOE

DOE CB JANE

Defendants and Respondents

CAMERANO DANIEL

DOES 1 THROUGH 100

IRWINDALE POLICE DEPARTMENT

IRWINDALE THE CITY OF

LEARNING FOR LIFE INC.

LEARNING FOR LIFE INC

CITY OF IRWINDALE THE

DEPARTMENT IRWINDALE POLICE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorneys

LAW OFFICES OF ANTHONY DE MARCO

FINNEGAN MICHAEL G.

DEMARCO ESQ. ANTHONY M.

JEFF ANDERSON & ASSOCIATES PA

Defendant and Respondent Attorneys

GROSSBERG SCOTT J.

GROSSBERG SCOTT J. ESQ.

PARVIN CURTIS D.

SEDWICK LLP

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT FOR: 1. DAMAGES; ETC

4/10/2015: COMPLAINT FOR: 1. DAMAGES; ETC

SUMMONS

4/10/2015: SUMMONS

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

4/24/2015: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

4/27/2015: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

4/28/2015: PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

4/28/2015: PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE BY CITY OF IRWINDALE IN SUPPORT OF DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT

5/18/2015: REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE BY CITY OF IRWINDALE IN SUPPORT OF DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT

NOTICE OF DEMURRER AND DEMURRER BY DEFENDANT CITY OF IRWINDALE TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES AND DECLARATION OF SCOTT J. GROSSBERG IN SUPPORT THEREOF

5/18/2015: NOTICE OF DEMURRER AND DEMURRER BY DEFENDANT CITY OF IRWINDALE TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES AND DECLARATION OF SCOTT J. GROSSBERG IN SUPPORT THEREOF

PLAINTIFF JANE DOE CB STATEMENT OF DAMAGES [PURSUANT TO CCP ? 425.11)

6/18/2015: PLAINTIFF JANE DOE CB STATEMENT OF DAMAGES [PURSUANT TO CCP ? 425.11)

NOTICE OF DEMURRER AND DEMURRER BY DEFENDANT LEARNING FOR LIFE TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT

6/23/2015: NOTICE OF DEMURRER AND DEMURRER BY DEFENDANT LEARNING FOR LIFE TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT

NOTICE OF CHANGE IN DEPARTMENT RE: HEARING ON DEMURRER BY DEFENDANT CITY OF IRWINDALE TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT

9/23/2015: NOTICE OF CHANGE IN DEPARTMENT RE: HEARING ON DEMURRER BY DEFENDANT CITY OF IRWINDALE TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT

PLAINTIFF JANE DOE CB'S OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT LEARNING FOR LIFE, INC.'S DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT

10/8/2015: PLAINTIFF JANE DOE CB'S OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT LEARNING FOR LIFE, INC.'S DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT

DEFENDANT LEARNING FOR LIFE'S REPLY TO PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION TO DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT

10/15/2015: DEFENDANT LEARNING FOR LIFE'S REPLY TO PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION TO DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT

NOTICE OF RULING

10/20/2015: NOTICE OF RULING

Minute Order

10/22/2015: Minute Order

ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE TO IC COURT AND VACATING ALL FUTURE DATES ECT

10/22/2015: ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE TO IC COURT AND VACATING ALL FUTURE DATES ECT

ANSWER OF DEFENDANT CITY OF IRWINDALE TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT

9/1/2016: ANSWER OF DEFENDANT CITY OF IRWINDALE TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT

DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL BY CITY OF IRWINDALE

9/1/2016: DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL BY CITY OF IRWINDALE

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/05/2017
  • Notice; Filed by LEARNING FOR LIFE, INC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2017
  • Judgment; Filed by LEARNING FOR LIFE, INC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2017
  • at 08:31 AM in Department J; Non-Appearance Case Review (Non Appearance (Case Review); Matter Placed Off Calendar) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2017
  • Partial Dismissal (with Prejudice); Filed by DOE CB, JANE (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2017
  • at 08:30 AM in Department J; Jury Trial (Jury Trial; Matter Placed Off Calendar) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2017
  • at 08:30 AM in Department J; Final Status Conference (Final Status Conference; Matter Placed Off Calendar) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2017
  • Notice; Filed by CITY OF IRWINDALE, THE (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2017
  • at 08:30 AM in Department J; Court Order - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2017
  • Notice of Settlement; Filed by CITY OF IRWINDALE, THE (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2017
  • Notice; Filed by LEARNING FOR LIFE, INC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
129 More Docket Entries
  • 04/27/2015
  • Rtn of Service of Summons & Compl; Filed by DOE CB, JANE (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2015
  • Rtn of Service of Summons & Compl; Filed by DOE CB, JANE (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2015
  • Proof-Service/Summons; Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2015
  • Proof-Service/Summons; Filed by Jane Doe CB (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2015
  • PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2015
  • COMPLAINT FOR: 1. DAMAGES; ETC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2015
  • SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2015
  • Complaint; Filed by Jane Doe CB (Plaintiff); DOE CB, JANE (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2015
  • Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2015
  • Summons Issued

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.