This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/09/2019 at 22:01:41 (UTC).

JANE DOE 1 ET AL VS RAYMOND SHERMAN JR ET AL

Case Summary

On 01/09/2015 JANE DOE 1 filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against RAYMOND SHERMAN JR. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are LISA HART COLE, DANIEL S. MURPHY, NANCY L. NEWMAN, BOBBI TILLMON and H. JAY FORD III. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****8641

  • Filing Date:

    01/09/2015

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

LISA HART COLE

DANIEL S. MURPHY

NANCY L. NEWMAN

BOBBI TILLMON

H. JAY FORD III

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Petitioners

DOE 1 JANE

DOE 2 JANE

JANE DOE

DOE JANE

Defendants and Respondents

ALLEN EVERETT ONEAL

DOES 1 THROUGH 50

HAMMOCK TROY MARSAY

NORDSTROM INC.

PASSCO COMPANIES LLC

SHERMAN RAYMOND JR.

SHERMAN RAYMOND

PASSCO HUGHES PROMENADE HLLC

GLOBAL SECURITY CONCEPTS

AMERIPARK

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff

PASSCO HUGHES PROMENADE HLLC

Defendant and Cross Defendant

GLOBAL SECURITY CONCEPTS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorneys

GIRARDI FIRM LLP THE

GIRARDI MATTHEW

WEATHERFORD NATALIE

TAYLOR & RING

Defendant and Respondent Attorneys

BEHAR JEFFREY S.

LEONARD EDWARD R. ESQ.

BEHAR JEFFREY S. ESQ.

BREMER WHYTE BROWN & O'MEARA

LEWIS BRISBOIS BISGAARD & SMITH LLP

FORD WALKER HAGGERTY & BEHAR

LITCHFIELD CAVO LLP

PAPE KARA A.

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorneys

LEWIS BRISBOIS BISGAARD & SMITH LLP

FORD WALKER HAGGERTY & BEHAR

Cross Defendant Attorney

BREMER KEITH G.

 

Court Documents

Notice of Ruling

2/5/2018: Notice of Ruling

Legacy Document

1/12/2018: Legacy Document

Substitution of Attorney

2/28/2018: Substitution of Attorney

Legacy Document

1/12/2018: Legacy Document

PASSCO HUGHES PROMENADE HLLC'S REPLY TO OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF PLAINTIFFS' FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

11/9/2015: PASSCO HUGHES PROMENADE HLLC'S REPLY TO OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF PLAINTIFFS' FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

Minute Order

12/15/2017: Minute Order

Notice of Ruling

1/10/2018: Notice of Ruling

Legacy Document

1/9/2018: Legacy Document

Legacy Document

12/12/2017: Legacy Document

Legacy Document

12/8/2017: Legacy Document

Cross-Complaint

12/8/2017: Cross-Complaint

Legacy Document

1/12/2018: Legacy Document

Minute Order

1/24/2018: Minute Order

Minute Order

1/17/2018: Minute Order

ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE TO IC COURT AND VACATING ALL FUTURE DATES CALENDARED IN PERSONAL INJURY HUB COURT

11/17/2015: ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE TO IC COURT AND VACATING ALL FUTURE DATES CALENDARED IN PERSONAL INJURY HUB COURT

Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

8/21/2018: Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

8/21/2018: Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

Legacy Document

9/18/2018: Legacy Document

75 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/03/2018
  • at 08:30 AM in Department O; Order to Show Cause Re: (Pursuant to Settlement) - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2018
  • Notice (of case reassignment to Dept O); Filed by Jane Doe (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2018
  • Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2018
  • Request for Dismissal; Filed by Doe 1, Jane (Plaintiff); Doe 2, Jane (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2018
  • at 08:31 AM in Department O; (Osc Re Dismissal) - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2018
  • Minute Order ((Osc Re Dismissal Pursuant to Settlement)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2018
  • Request for Dismissal (with prejudice as to all parties and causes of action related to Case No. BC568717.); Filed by Doe, 1, Jane (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2018
  • Partial Dismissal (WITH PREJUDICE AS TO CASE NO. BC568717. (NOTICE OF REJECTION SENT) ); Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2018
  • Notice (RE: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL AS TO CASE BC568717 ); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2018
  • Partial Dismissal; Filed by Jane Doe (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
443 More Docket Entries
  • 07/28/2015
  • Motion to Strike (portions of FAC ); Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2015
  • DEFENDANT, PASSCO HUGHES PROMENADE HLLC'S NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF PLAINTIFFS' FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2015
  • Request for Dismissal; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2015
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2015
  • FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES FOR: 1) ASSAULT & BATTERY; 2) FALSE IMPRISONMENT/ARREST; 3) INTENTIONAL INFLICTION OF EMOTIONAL DISTRESS; 4) NEGLIGENCE; 5) NEGLIGENT HIRING, TRAINING SUPERVISION AND/OR RETENTION; AND 6) PREMISES LIABILITY.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2015
  • First Amended Complaint; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2015
  • Complaint; Filed by Doe 1, Jane (Plaintiff); Doe, 1, Jane (Plaintiff); Doe 2, Jane (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2015
  • Complaint Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2015
  • COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES FOR: 1) ASSAULT & BATTERY; ETC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2015
  • SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.