Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 04/06/2019 at 03:38:29 (UTC).

JAMES VAUGHN, ET-AL VS DORIS OCEGUERA, ET-AL

Case Summary

On 12/12/2012 JAMES VAUGHN, ET-AL filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against DORIS OCEGUERA, ET-AL. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are CHARLES F. PALMER, HALM, HOWARD L., RAFAEL A. ONGKEKO, PATRICK T. MADDEN, SAMANTHA P. JESSNER, HOWARD L. HALM and GAIL FEUER. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****2509

  • Filing Date:

    12/12/2012

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

CHARLES F. PALMER

HALM, HOWARD L.

RAFAEL A. ONGKEKO

PATRICK T. MADDEN

SAMANTHA P. JESSNER

HOWARD L. HALM

GAIL FEUER

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Cross Defendants

JAMES VAUGHN

VAUGHN JAMES

ROSE HILLARY

CHRISTENSEN F. LEE

Plaintiff, Petitioner and Cross Defendant

VAUGHN JAMES

Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

DORIS OCEGUERA

JOSHUA OCEGUERA

OCEGUERA DORIS

OCEGUERA JOSHUA

Defendant, Respondent and Cross Plaintiff

OCEGUERA DORIS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

KLEIN RICHARD S.

RICHARD S. KLEIN

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorneys

EARLY MASLACH & HARTSUYKER

WILSON MARCELLA I.

Cross Defendant Attorney

LAW OFFICES OF STEVEN D. LEVINE

 

Court Documents

PROOF OF SERVICE OF NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT TO PI COURT AND ORDER FOR PLAINTIFF TO GIVE NOTICE

3/22/2013: PROOF OF SERVICE OF NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT TO PI COURT AND ORDER FOR PLAINTIFF TO GIVE NOTICE

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM NAME

12/11/2013: NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM NAME

ORDER GRANTING EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER TO COMPEL JAMES VAUGHN TO SUBMIT TO A PHYSICAL EXAMINATION

5/15/2014: ORDER GRANTING EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER TO COMPEL JAMES VAUGHN TO SUBMIT TO A PHYSICAL EXAMINATION

PLAINTIFFS? TRIAL BRIEF

7/16/2014: PLAINTIFFS? TRIAL BRIEF

Minute Order

7/22/2014: Minute Order

PI TRIAL TRANSFER ORDER

11/17/2014: PI TRIAL TRANSFER ORDER

AFFIDAVIT QF PREJUDICE PEREMPTORY CHALLENGE TO JUDICIAL OFFICER

11/17/2014: AFFIDAVIT QF PREJUDICE PEREMPTORY CHALLENGE TO JUDICIAL OFFICER

ORDER AND STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL, FSC [AND REATED MOTION/DISCOVERY DATES] PERSONAL INJURY COURTS ONLY

4/1/2015: ORDER AND STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL, FSC [AND REATED MOTION/DISCOVERY DATES] PERSONAL INJURY COURTS ONLY

Minute Order

4/2/2015: Minute Order

ORDER APPOINTING COURT APPROVED REPORTER AS OFFICIAL REPORTER PRO TEMPORE

4/7/2015: ORDER APPOINTING COURT APPROVED REPORTER AS OFFICIAL REPORTER PRO TEMPORE

Minute Order

4/9/2015: Minute Order

JURY REQUEST OR QUESTION

4/13/2015: JURY REQUEST OR QUESTION

Unknown

4/13/2015: Unknown

Unknown

4/13/2015: Unknown

SPECIAL VERDICT

4/13/2015: SPECIAL VERDICT

NOTICE OF COURT RULING RE CONTINUANCE OF DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO STRIKE OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE TO TAX PLAINTIFFS' MEMORANDUM OF COSTS

6/25/2015: NOTICE OF COURT RULING RE CONTINUANCE OF DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO STRIKE OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE TO TAX PLAINTIFFS' MEMORANDUM OF COSTS

Minute Order

10/15/2015: Minute Order

COURT ORDER ON COSTS

12/11/2015: COURT ORDER ON COSTS

71 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/11/2015
  • COURT ORDER ON COSTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2015
  • Order; Filed by Defendant/Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2015
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 33; Status Conference - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2015
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2015
  • at 10:00 AM in Department 33; Court Order (Court Order; Court makes order) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2015
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2015
  • Notice; Filed by DORIS OCEGUERA (Legacy Party); JOSHUA OCEGUERA (Legacy Party)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2015
  • Notice (OF COURT RULING RE DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO TAX COSTS AND (PROPOSED) ORDER RE ENTRY OF JUDGMENT FOR DEFENDANT ON COSTS ); Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2015
  • NOTICE OF COURT RULING RE DEFENDNT'S MOTION TO TAX COSTS AND [PROPOSED] ORDER RE ENTRY OF JUDGMENT FOR DEFENDANT ON COSTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2015
  • OBJECTION TO PLAINTIFFS' OBJECTION TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO STRIKE OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE TO TAX COSTS AS TO ITEMS 5.B. (WAIVED COSTS) AND 11 (PHOTOCOPIES)

    Read MoreRead Less
218 More Docket Entries
  • 01/09/2013
  • Rtn of Service of Summons & Compl (AS TO DORIS OCEGUERA ); Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2013
  • Rtn of Service of Summons & Compl (AS TO JOSHUA OCEGUERA ); Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2013
  • Rtn of Service of Summons & Compl; Filed by JAMES VAUGHN (Legacy Party); HILLARY ROSE (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2013
  • Rtn of Service of Summons & Compl; Filed by JAMES VAUGHN (Legacy Party); HILLARY ROSE (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2012
  • Notice-Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2012
  • Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2012
  • Summons; Filed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2012
  • Complaint filed-Summons Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2012
  • Summons Filed; Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2012
  • Complaint filed-Summons Issued; Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer WILSON MARCELLA IRENE ESQ.