This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 12/29/2020 at 12:48:28 (UTC).

JAMES LEVENSON VS EXPRESS AUTO SHOP ET AL

Case Summary

On 12/30/2011 JAMES LEVENSON filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against EXPRESS AUTO SHOP. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is ROLF M. TREU. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****6004

  • Filing Date:

    12/30/2011

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

ROLF M. TREU

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LEVENSON JAMES

Defendants

EXPRESS AUTO SHOP

SABERI SAM

Not Classified By Court

DILIBERTO MICHAEL R. ESQ.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

GRUZMAN ALEKSANDER

Defendant and Respondent Attorney

GONZALEZ JORGE C. ESQ.

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT FOR: 1) NEGLIGENCE; ETC

12/30/2011: COMPLAINT FOR: 1) NEGLIGENCE; ETC

SUMMONS -

12/30/2011: SUMMONS -

NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

1/3/2012: NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING -

1/3/2012: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING -

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -

2/1/2012: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -

2/1/2012: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -

PROOF OF SERVICE BY FIRST-CLASS MAIL?CIVIL

2/2/2012: PROOF OF SERVICE BY FIRST-CLASS MAIL?CIVIL

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT BY DEFENDANT SAM SAID SABERI DBA EXPRESS AUTO SHOP (ERRONEOUSLY SUED AS EXPRESS AUTO SHOP AND SAM SABERI)

2/2/2012: ANSWER TO COMPLAINT BY DEFENDANT SAM SAID SABERI DBA EXPRESS AUTO SHOP (ERRONEOUSLY SUED AS EXPRESS AUTO SHOP AND SAM SABERI)

Minute Order -

3/2/2012: Minute Order -

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT -

3/20/2012: CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT -

DECLARATIO4 OF JAMES LEVENSON IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF?S REQUEST FOR TRIAL SCHEDULING PREFERENCE AT THE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE (CCP ?36A)

3/27/2012: DECLARATIO4 OF JAMES LEVENSON IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF?S REQUEST FOR TRIAL SCHEDULING PREFERENCE AT THE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE (CCP ?36A)

NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION BY DEFENDANT SAM SAID SABERI DBA EXPRESS AUTO SHOP, FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AS TO THE COMPLAINT OF PLAINTIFF JAMES [EVENSON

3/29/2012: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION BY DEFENDANT SAM SAID SABERI DBA EXPRESS AUTO SHOP, FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AS TO THE COMPLAINT OF PLAINTIFF JAMES [EVENSON

NOTICE OF LOPCMENT IN SUPPORT OF MOTION BY DEFENDANT SAM SAID SABERI DRA EXPRESS AUTO SHOP, FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AS TO THE COMPLAINT OF PLAINTIFF JAMES LEVENSON

3/29/2012: NOTICE OF LOPCMENT IN SUPPORT OF MOTION BY DEFENDANT SAM SAID SABERI DRA EXPRESS AUTO SHOP, FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AS TO THE COMPLAINT OF PLAINTIFF JAMES LEVENSON

DECLARATION OF SAM SAID SABERI IN SUPPORT OF MOTION BY DEFENDANT SAM SAID SABERI DBA EXPRESS AUTO SHOP, FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AS TO THE COMPLAINT OF PLAINTIFF JAMES LEVENSON

3/29/2012: DECLARATION OF SAM SAID SABERI IN SUPPORT OF MOTION BY DEFENDANT SAM SAID SABERI DBA EXPRESS AUTO SHOP, FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AS TO THE COMPLAINT OF PLAINTIFF JAMES LEVENSON

DECLARATION OF JORGE C. GONZALEZ, ESQ., IN SUPPORT OF MOTION BY DEFENDANT SAM SAID SABER! DBA EXPRESS AUTO SHOP, FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AS TO THE COMPLAINT OF PLAINTIFF JAMES LEVENSON

3/29/2012: DECLARATION OF JORGE C. GONZALEZ, ESQ., IN SUPPORT OF MOTION BY DEFENDANT SAM SAID SABER! DBA EXPRESS AUTO SHOP, FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AS TO THE COMPLAINT OF PLAINTIFF JAMES LEVENSON

SEPARATE STATEMENT OF UNDISPUTED MATERIAL FACTS IN SUPPORT OF MOTION BY DEFENDANT SAM SAID SABER! DBA EXPRESS AUTO SHOP, FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AS TO THE COMPLAINT OF PLAINTIFF JAMFS LEVENSON

3/29/2012: SEPARATE STATEMENT OF UNDISPUTED MATERIAL FACTS IN SUPPORT OF MOTION BY DEFENDANT SAM SAID SABER! DBA EXPRESS AUTO SHOP, FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AS TO THE COMPLAINT OF PLAINTIFF JAMFS LEVENSON

MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF MOTION BY DEFENDANT SAM SAID SABERI DBA EXPRESS AUTO SHOP, FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AS TO THE COMPLAINT OF PLAINTIFF JAMES LEVENSON

3/29/2012: MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF MOTION BY DEFENDANT SAM SAID SABERI DBA EXPRESS AUTO SHOP, FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AS TO THE COMPLAINT OF PLAINTIFF JAMES LEVENSON

CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER

4/4/2012: CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER

43 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/17/2012
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 58; (OSC RE Dismissal; Order of Dismissal) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2012
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2012
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2012
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2012
  • Docketat 09:00 AM in Department 58; Jury Trial (Jury Trial; Off Calendar) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2012
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2012
  • DocketNotice of Settlement; Filed by Defendant/Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2012
  • DocketNOTICE OF SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE CASE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2012
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 58; Final Status Conference - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2012
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
64 More Docket Entries
  • 02/01/2012
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2012
  • DocketProof-Service/Summons; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2012
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2012
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2012
  • DocketOSC-Failure to File Proof of Serv; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2012
  • DocketNOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2012
  • DocketORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2011
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR: 1) NEGLIGENCE; ETC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2011
  • DocketSUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2011
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by James Levenson (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less

Complaint Information

Jorge C. Gonzalez. Esq. (CSB No. 222860) Francisco J. Garcia, Esq. (CSB No. 263845)

GONZALEZ & GARCIA

521 Heber Avenue

Calexico. CA 92231

(760)357-1158; Fax (800)789-3502

Attorneys for Defendant Sam Said Saberi dba

FILED SUPERIOR COURT OF CALIFORNIA CROIUON'I'Y OF LOS ANGELES MAR 29 2012

John A ¢, Executive Officer/Clerk BY Deputy e

Express Auto Shop (erroneously sued as Express Auto

Shop. and Sam Saberi)

SUPERIOR COURT OF CALIFORNIA COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES - CENTRAL DISTRICT

JAMES LEVENSON. an individual PlaintifT. V.

EXPRESS AUTO SHOP. an unknown business entity, SAM SABLERI. an individual. and DOES 1-50 inclusive.

Defendants

NOTICE OF LODGMENT IN SUPPORT OF MOTION BY DEFENDANT SAM SAID SABERI DBA EXPRESS AUTO

SHOP, FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AS

TO THE COMPLAINT OF PLAINTIFF JAMES LEVENSON

Hearing Date: July 19. 2012 Hearing Time: 8:30 AM Department: 58

Complaint Iiled: December 30, 2012 Trial Date: None

Notice of Lodgment in Support of MSJ by Defendant Sam Said Saberi - Case No. BC476004

related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer GONZALEZ JORGE CARLOS