This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 04/25/2019 at 12:57:52 (UTC).

JAMES KWON ET AL VS HEBARAGI & LEMI BUS INC

Case Summary

On 01/15/2016 JAMES KWON filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against HEBARAGI LEMI BUS INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is TERRY A. GREEN. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****7220

  • Filing Date:

    01/15/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

TERRY A. GREEN

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Petitioners

KWON JAMES

KIM JONG HWAN

BACK YEUN

Defendants and Respondents

HEBARAGI & LEMUS BUS INC.

DOES 1 TO 20

HANATOUR USA INC.

HANA TOUR INC.

OH EUNICE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorneys

LAW OFFICES OF PETER BECK APLC

LEICHTER ARYEH ESQ.

Defendant and Respondent Attorneys

KIM ELLIOTT ESQ.

JUNG CHARLES H. ESQ.

NASSIRI & JUNG LLP

 

Court Documents

DEFENDANTS' AMENDED MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 1 DECLARATION OF ANDREW R. KISLIK IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS' AMENDED MOTION IN LIMENE NO. 1

12/27/2017: DEFENDANTS' AMENDED MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 1 DECLARATION OF ANDREW R. KISLIK IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS' AMENDED MOTION IN LIMENE NO. 1

PLAINTWF JONG HWAN KIM'S REPLY TO OPPOSITION OF DEFENDANT TO FOR AN ORDER QUASHING SUBPOENA DUCES TECUM BY DEFENDANTS.

2/7/2018: PLAINTWF JONG HWAN KIM'S REPLY TO OPPOSITION OF DEFENDANT TO FOR AN ORDER QUASHING SUBPOENA DUCES TECUM BY DEFENDANTS.

PLAINTIFF JAMES KWON'S REPLY TO OPPOSITION OF DEFENDANT TO FOR AN ORDER QUASHING SUBPOENA DUCES TECUM BY DEFENDANTS.

2/7/2018: PLAINTIFF JAMES KWON'S REPLY TO OPPOSITION OF DEFENDANT TO FOR AN ORDER QUASHING SUBPOENA DUCES TECUM BY DEFENDANTS.

NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE CASE

2/13/2018: NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE CASE

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

5/2/2018: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

SUMMONS

1/15/2016: SUMMONS

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

2/10/2016: PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

NOTICE RE: CONTINUANCE OF HEARING

5/2/2016: NOTICE RE: CONTINUANCE OF HEARING

NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND DEMURRER HEARING DATES

5/9/2016: NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND DEMURRER HEARING DATES

Unknown

6/13/2016: Unknown

AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT

7/27/2016: AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT

Minute Order

1/11/2017: Minute Order

DEFENDANT HANATOUR USA, INC.'S OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT

5/15/2017: DEFENDANT HANATOUR USA, INC.'S OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT

REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT HANATOUR USA, INC.'S OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE [SECOND] AMENDED COMPLAINT

5/15/2017: REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT HANATOUR USA, INC.'S OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE [SECOND] AMENDED COMPLAINT

DECLARATION OF ELLIOTT KIM IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT HANATOUR USA, INC.'S OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE [SECOND] AMENDED COMPLAINT

5/15/2017: DECLARATION OF ELLIOTT KIM IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT HANATOUR USA, INC.'S OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE [SECOND] AMENDED COMPLAINT

PLAINTIFFS' REPLY TO HANA TOUR'S OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT THEREOF; DECLARATION OF PETER BECK.

5/19/2017: PLAINTIFFS' REPLY TO HANA TOUR'S OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT THEREOF; DECLARATION OF PETER BECK.

Proof of Service

10/10/2017: Proof of Service

Minute Order

12/5/2017: Minute Order

51 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/13/2018
  • at 08:45 AM in Department 14; (OSC RE Dismissal; Order of Dismissal) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2018
  • NOTICE OF MOTION FOR JUDGMENT NOTWITHSTANDING THE VERDICT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2018
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2018
  • Request for Dismissal; Filed by James Kwon (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2018
  • PLAINTIFF S PROPOSED JOINT JURY INSTRUCTIONS WITH DISPOSITION TABLE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2018
  • at 10:00 AM in Department 14; Jury Trial (Jury Trial; Vacated) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2018
  • at 08:45 AM in Department 14; (MOTION-QUASH; Off Calendar) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2018
  • at 08:45 AM in Department 14; Final Status Conference (Final Status Conference; Off Calendar) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2018
  • Notice of Settlement; Filed by James Kwon (Plaintiff); Yeun Back (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2018
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
123 More Docket Entries
  • 03/09/2016
  • Demurrer; Filed by Hebaragi & Lemus Bus, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2016
  • Request for Judicial Notice; Filed by Hebaragi & Lemus Bus, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2016
  • DEFENDANT HEBARAGI & LEMI BUS, INC.'S NOTICE OF HEARING ON DEMURRER AND DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFFS' COMPLAINT; ETC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2016
  • Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2016
  • NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2016
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2016
  • Proof-Service/Summons; Filed by James Kwon (Plaintiff); Yeun Back (Plaintiff); Jong Hwan Kim (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2016
  • Complaint; Filed by James Kwon (Plaintiff); Yeun Back (Plaintiff); Jong Hwan Kim (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2016
  • SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2016
  • COMPLAINT FOR UNPAID WAGES

    Read MoreRead Less