This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/09/2021 at 22:06:52 (UTC).

JAMES HELTON VS BOONE ELECTRIC INC ET AL

Case Summary

On 06/26/2012 JAMES HELTON filed a Labor - Wrongful Termination lawsuit against BOONE ELECTRIC INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MAUREEN DUFFY-LEWIS. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****7279

  • Filing Date:

    06/26/2012

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Wrongful Termination

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

MAUREEN DUFFY-LEWIS

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

HELTON JAMES

Defendants and Cross Defendants

BOONE ELECTRIC INC.

SIERRA PACIFIC CONSTRUCTION COMPANY INC.

DOES 1 THROUGH 100

FOES 1-100

Defendant and Respondent

DOES 1 THROUGH 100

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff

SIERRA PACIFIC CONSTRUCTION COMPANY INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

GERBER KARL ESQ.

Defendant and Respondent Attorneys

DAUSCHER SCOTT K. ESQ.

WEISSMAN ROBERT A. ESQ.

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorney

WEISSMAN ROBERT A. ESQ.

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL BASED UPON: I. INTENTIONAL INTERFERENCE WITH CONTRACTUAL RELATIONS (AS TO DEFENDANT SIERRA PACIFIC CONSTRUCTION COMPANY ONLY); ETC

6/26/2012: COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL BASED UPON: I. INTENTIONAL INTERFERENCE WITH CONTRACTUAL RELATIONS (AS TO DEFENDANT SIERRA PACIFIC CONSTRUCTION COMPANY ONLY); ETC

NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

6/28/2012: NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

ANSWER OF BOONE ELECTRIC, INC. TO UNVERIFIED COMPLAINT

8/15/2012: ANSWER OF BOONE ELECTRIC, INC. TO UNVERIFIED COMPLAINT

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS & COMPLAINT ON DEFENDANT, SIERRA PACIFIC CONSTRUCTION COMPANY, INC.

9/18/2012: PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS & COMPLAINT ON DEFENDANT, SIERRA PACIFIC CONSTRUCTION COMPANY, INC.

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT -

10/3/2012: CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT -

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT -

10/9/2012: CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT -

Minute Order -

10/18/2012: Minute Order -

CROSS-COMPLAINT FOR: 1. EXPRESS CONTRACTUAL INDEMNITY 2. IMPLIED EQUITABLE INDEMNITY 3. CONTRIBUTION 4. DECLARATORY RELIEF

10/23/2012: CROSS-COMPLAINT FOR: 1. EXPRESS CONTRACTUAL INDEMNITY 2. IMPLIED EQUITABLE INDEMNITY 3. CONTRIBUTION 4. DECLARATORY RELIEF

ANSWER OF BOONE ELECTRIC, INC. TO SIERRA PACIFIC CONSTRUCTORS, INC.?S CROSS-COMPLAINT

1/10/2013: ANSWER OF BOONE ELECTRIC, INC. TO SIERRA PACIFIC CONSTRUCTORS, INC.?S CROSS-COMPLAINT

Minute Order -

2/11/2013: Minute Order -

CIVIL DEPOSIT

5/22/2013: CIVIL DEPOSIT

NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE CASE

10/21/2013: NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE CASE

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL -

10/21/2013: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL -

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL -

11/22/2013: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL -

Minute Order -

12/5/2013: Minute Order -

Minute Order -

1/10/2014: Minute Order -

STIPULATION RE: DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE AND RETENTION OF JURISDICTION TO ENFORCE SETTLEMENT

4/2/2014: STIPULATION RE: DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE AND RETENTION OF JURISDICTION TO ENFORCE SETTLEMENT

ORDER APPROVING DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE AND RETENTION OF JURISDICTION TO ENFORCE SETTLEMENT

4/2/2014: ORDER APPROVING DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE AND RETENTION OF JURISDICTION TO ENFORCE SETTLEMENT

14 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/24/2014
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/24/2014
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/03/2014
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 38; (OSC RE Dismissal; OSC Discharged) -

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/03/2014
  • DocketMinute Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/02/2014
  • DocketSTIPULATION RE: DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE AND RETENTION OF JURISDICTION TO ENFORCE SETTLEMENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/02/2014
  • DocketStipulation

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/02/2014
  • DocketOrder

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/02/2014
  • DocketORDER APPROVING DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE AND RETENTION OF JURISDICTION TO ENFORCE SETTLEMENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/21/2014
  • Docketat 09:30 AM in Department 38; Jury Trial (Jury Trial; Vacated) -

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2014
  • DocketNOTICE OF CONTINUED ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
27 More Docket Entries
  • 09/18/2012
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS & COMPLAINT ON DEFENDANT, SIERRA PACIFIC CONSTRUCTION COMPANY, INC.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/18/2012
  • DocketProof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/15/2012
  • DocketANSWER OF BOONE ELECTRIC, INC. TO UNVERIFIED COMPLAINT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/15/2012
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Boone Electric, Inc. (Legacy Party)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/13/2012
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT; NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT; ADR PACKAGE; AND VOLUNTARY EFFICIENT LITIGATION STIPULATIONS ON BOONE ELECTRIC INC.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/28/2012
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/28/2012
  • DocketNOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/26/2012
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL BASED UPON: I. INTENTIONAL INTERFERENCE WITH CONTRACTUAL RELATIONS (AS TO DEFENDANT SIERRA PACIFIC CONSTRUCTION COMPANY ONLY); ETC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/26/2012
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by James Helton (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/26/2012
  • DocketSUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less