This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 04/04/2016 at 15:11:52 (UTC).

JAMES GASTELO ET AL VS BOOKFIELD PROPERTIES MANAGEMENT INC

Case Summary

On 12/29/2014 JAMES GASTELO filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against BOOKFIELD PROPERTIES MANAGEMENT INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Santa Monica Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are LISA HART COLE and TERESA A. BEAUDET. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****8040

  • Filing Date:

    12/29/2014

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Santa Monica Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

LISA HART COLE

TERESA A. BEAUDET

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Petitioners

GASTELO CYNTHIA

GASTELO JAMES

Defendants and Respondents

BROOKFIELD LOS ANGELES BUILDERS INC.

BROOKFIELD PROPERTIES MANAGEMENT INC.

DOES 1 THROUGH 20

BROOKFIELD PROPERTIES MANAGEMENT (CA)INC.

BROOKFIELD PROPERTIES MANAGEMENT LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorneys

MOVROYDIS ESQ. ARON C.

MORAN LAW

Defendant and Respondent Attorneys

WOOD SMITH HENNING & BERMAN LLP

ETKIN ALLISON

WOOD SMITH HENNING & BERMAN

 

Court Documents

SUMMONS

12/29/2014: SUMMONS

COMPLAINT FOR: 1. NEGLIGENCE; ETC

12/29/2014: COMPLAINT FOR: 1. NEGLIGENCE; ETC

AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT

1/2/2015: AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT

AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT

1/2/2015: AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

1/20/2015: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

1/20/2015: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

1/20/2015: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

1/23/2015: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

DEFENDANT BROOKFIELD LOS ANGELES BUILDERS INC.'S NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF PLAINTIFFS' COMPLAINT; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES; [PROPOSED] ORDER

3/24/2015: DEFENDANT BROOKFIELD LOS ANGELES BUILDERS INC.'S NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF PLAINTIFFS' COMPLAINT; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES; [PROPOSED] ORDER

DEFENDANT BROOKFIELD LOS ANGELES BUILDERS INC.'S NOTICE OF DEMURRER AND DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFFS THIRD CAUSE OF ACTION FOR WILLFUL MISCONDUCT; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES; [PROPOSED] ORDER

3/24/2015: DEFENDANT BROOKFIELD LOS ANGELES BUILDERS INC.'S NOTICE OF DEMURRER AND DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFFS THIRD CAUSE OF ACTION FOR WILLFUL MISCONDUCT; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES; [PROPOSED] ORDER

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

4/20/2015: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

4/20/2015: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

PLAINTIFF JIM GASTELO'S COMBINED OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT'S DEMURRER OF PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT AND MOTION TO STRIKE

5/4/2015: PLAINTIFF JIM GASTELO'S COMBINED OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT'S DEMURRER OF PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT AND MOTION TO STRIKE

DEFENDANT BROOKFIELD LOS ANGELES BUILDERS INC.'S REPLY TO PLAINTIFFS OPPOSITION TO ITS DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFFS THIRD CAUSE OF ACTION FOR WILLFUL MISCONDUCT AND ITS MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF PLAINTIF

5/13/2015: DEFENDANT BROOKFIELD LOS ANGELES BUILDERS INC.'S REPLY TO PLAINTIFFS OPPOSITION TO ITS DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFFS THIRD CAUSE OF ACTION FOR WILLFUL MISCONDUCT AND ITS MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF PLAINTIF

ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE TO IC COURT AND VACATING ALL FUTURE DATES CALENDARED IN PERSONAL INJURY HUB COURT (INCLUDING MAY 20, 2015 HEARING DATE)

5/20/2015: ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE TO IC COURT AND VACATING ALL FUTURE DATES CALENDARED IN PERSONAL INJURY HUB COURT (INCLUDING MAY 20, 2015 HEARING DATE)

Proof of Service

5/20/2015: Proof of Service

Minute Order

5/20/2015: Minute Order

NOTICE OF RULING RE DEFENDANT'S DEMURRER AND MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT

6/2/2015: NOTICE OF RULING RE DEFENDANT'S DEMURRER AND MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/16/2016
  • Answer to Complaint Filed Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2016
  • Motion (for leave to file opposition and for continuance of hearing ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2016
  • Notice (of non opposition ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2016
  • Receipt (jury fees ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2016
  • Notice (of posting jury fees ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2016
  • Stip & Order-use CSR ((OFFICIAL REPORTER PRO TEMPORE: TRACY WILLIAMS, LICENSE #10139) ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2016
  • Statement-Case Management Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2016
  • Notice of Ruling Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2015
  • Miscellaneous-Other (SEPARATE STATEMENT IN SUPPORT OF PLTFS. MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSES TO FORM & SPECIAL INTERROGATORIES, SET ONE, FROM DEFT. BROOKFIELD LOS ANGELES BUILDERS INC.) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2015
  • Motion to Compel (FURTHER RESPONSES TO FORM & SPECIAL INTERROGATORIES, SET ONE, FROM DEFENDANT BROOKFIELD LOS ANGELES BUILDERS; ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
13 More Docket Entries
  • 04/20/2015
  • Partial Dismissal (w/o Prejudice) (BROOKFIELD PROPERTIES MANAGEMENT (CA) INC., ONLY ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2015
  • Motion to Strike Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2015
  • Demurrer (3rd cause of action ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2015
  • Motion to Strike Filed by Attorney for Defendant/Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2015
  • Demurrer Filed by Attorney for Defendant/Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2015
  • Proof-Service/Summons Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2015
  • Proof-Service/Summons Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2015
  • Amendment to Complaint Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2014
  • Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2014
  • Complaint Filed

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.