This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/04/2019 at 06:24:16 (UTC).

JAMES EL WELL VS GLENDALE ADVENTIST MEDICAL CENTER

Case Summary

On 08/07/2015 JAMES EL WELL filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against GLENDALE ADVENTIST MEDICAL CENTER. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Burbank Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are WILLIAM D. STEWART, DONNA FIELDS GOLDSTEIN and MICHELLE WILLIAMS COURT. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****0705

  • Filing Date:

    08/07/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Burbank Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

WILLIAM D. STEWART

DONNA FIELDS GOLDSTEIN

MICHELLE WILLIAMS COURT

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Petitioners

EL WELL JAMES

ELWELL JAMES

Defendants and Respondents

DOES 1-100

GLENDALE ADVENTIST MEDICAL CENTER

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

LANZONE MORGAN LLP

Defendant and Respondent Attorneys

DIAMOND SCOTT R. ESQ.

DIAMOND & DRAGOJEVIC LLP

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES I. ELDER ABUSE & NEGLECT; ETC

8/7/2015: COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES I. ELDER ABUSE & NEGLECT; ETC

SUMMONS

8/7/2015: SUMMONS

CIVIL DEPOSIT

8/7/2015: CIVIL DEPOSIT

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT ON DEFENDANT GLENDALE ADVENTIST MEDICAL CENTER

8/24/2015: PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT ON DEFENDANT GLENDALE ADVENTIST MEDICAL CENTER

FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES 1. ELDER ABUSE & NEGLECT 2. NEGLIGENCE

10/1/2015: FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES 1. ELDER ABUSE & NEGLECT 2. NEGLIGENCE

DEMURRER OF DEFENDANT, GLENDALE ADVENTIST MEDICAL CENTER, TO PLAINTIFF'S FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES

10/28/2015: DEMURRER OF DEFENDANT, GLENDALE ADVENTIST MEDICAL CENTER, TO PLAINTIFF'S FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES

PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION TO DEMURRER TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANT GLENDALE ADVENTIST MEDICAL CENTER

11/17/2015: PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION TO DEMURRER TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANT GLENDALE ADVENTIST MEDICAL CENTER

Minute Order

11/19/2015: Minute Order

EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER VACATING ALL HEARING DATES AND TRANSFERRING THIS CIVIL ACTION TO AN INDEPENDENT CALENDAR COURT; DECLARATION OF RICHARD F. INGLE

11/19/2015: EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER VACATING ALL HEARING DATES AND TRANSFERRING THIS CIVIL ACTION TO AN INDEPENDENT CALENDAR COURT; DECLARATION OF RICHARD F. INGLE

REPLY OF DEFENDANT, GLENDALE ADVENTIST MEDICAL CENTER, TO PLAINTIFF, JAMES ELWELL'S OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT'S DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFF?S FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT; ETC

11/23/2015: REPLY OF DEFENDANT, GLENDALE ADVENTIST MEDICAL CENTER, TO PLAINTIFF, JAMES ELWELL'S OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT'S DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFF?S FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT; ETC

ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE TO IC COURT AND VACATING ALL FUTURE DATES CALENDARED IN PERSONAL INJURY HUB COURT (INCLUDING 12/02/15 HEARING DATE)

12/2/2015: ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE TO IC COURT AND VACATING ALL FUTURE DATES CALENDARED IN PERSONAL INJURY HUB COURT (INCLUDING 12/02/15 HEARING DATE)

Minute Order

12/2/2015: Minute Order

NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE

1/26/2017: NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/07/2018
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 92; Unknown Event Type - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2017
  • at 08:30 AM in Department A; Unknown Event Type - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2017
  • Request for Dismissal; Filed by James Elwell (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2017
  • at 08:30 AM in Department A; (Order to Show Cause; Advanced to a Previous Date) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2017
  • Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by James Elwell (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2017
  • at 08:30 AM in Department A; Court Order - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2017
  • at 08:30 AM in Department A; Jury Trial (Jury Trial; Advanced to a Previous Date) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2017
  • at 1:03 PM in Department A; Final Status Conference (Final Status Conference; Advanced to a Previous Date) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2017
  • at 08:30 AM in Department A; (Order to Show Cause; Matter continued) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2017
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 21; Mandatory Settlement Conference (MSC)

    Read MoreRead Less
69 More Docket Entries
  • 10/01/2015
  • FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES 1. ELDER ABUSE & NEGLECT 2. NEGLIGENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2015
  • First Amended Complaint; Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2015
  • Proof-Service/Summons; Filed by James El Well (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2015
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT ON DEFENDANT GLENDALE ADVENTIST MEDICAL CENTER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2015
  • Proof-Service/Summons; Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2015
  • SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2015
  • Complaint; Filed by James Elwell (Plaintiff); James El Well (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2015
  • Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2015
  • COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES I. ELDER ABUSE & NEGLECT; ETC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2015
  • CIVIL DEPOSIT

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.