This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/04/2020 at 07:30:05 (UTC).

JAMES D DAILEY VS STUEVE BROTHERS FARMS LLC

Case Summary

On 09/13/2016 JAMES D DAILEY filed an Other lawsuit against STUEVE BROTHERS FARMS LLC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****4561

  • Filing Date:

    09/13/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

DAILY JAMES D.

Defendant and Respondent

STUEVE BROTHERS FARMS LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorneys

MATTHEWS ARTURO E. JR. ESQ.

COHN RICHARD A. ESQ.

 

Court Documents

ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE WHY ORDER FOR SALE OF DWELLING SHOULD NOT BE ISSUED [C.C.P. ?7O4.71O ? 704.850]

9/1/2016: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE WHY ORDER FOR SALE OF DWELLING SHOULD NOT BE ISSUED [C.C.P. ?7O4.71O ? 704.850]

APPLLICATION FOR ORDER FOR SALE OF DWELLING AND ISSUANCE OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE WHY ORDER FOR SALE OF DWELLING SHOULD NOT BE ISSUED

9/1/2016: APPLLICATION FOR ORDER FOR SALE OF DWELLING AND ISSUANCE OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE WHY ORDER FOR SALE OF DWELLING SHOULD NOT BE ISSUED

DECLARATION OF MIKE TURNER RE: APPRAISAL OF REAL PROPERTY AT 725 W 1ST STREET, #102, CLAREMONT, CALIFORNIA

9/1/2016: DECLARATION OF MIKE TURNER RE: APPRAISAL OF REAL PROPERTY AT 725 W 1ST STREET, #102, CLAREMONT, CALIFORNIA

Proof of Service -

10/11/2016: Proof of Service -

NOTICE OF HEARING ON ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE WHY ORDER FOR SALE OF DWELLING SHOULD NOT BE ISSUED

10/28/2016: NOTICE OF HEARING ON ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE WHY ORDER FOR SALE OF DWELLING SHOULD NOT BE ISSUED

Minute Order -

10/31/2016: Minute Order -

Minute Order -

12/5/2016: Minute Order -

ORDER FOR SALE OF DWELLING [C.C.P. SECTIONS 7O4.71O ? 704.850]

12/12/2016: ORDER FOR SALE OF DWELLING [C.C.P. SECTIONS 7O4.71O ? 704.850]

DECLARATION OF ARTURO E. MATTHEWS, JR. RE: ORDER FOR SALE OF DWELLING

12/15/2016: DECLARATION OF ARTURO E. MATTHEWS, JR. RE: ORDER FOR SALE OF DWELLING

ORDER FOR SALE OF DWELLING

1/3/2017: ORDER FOR SALE OF DWELLING

AMENDED ORDER FOR SALE OF DWELLING

3/23/2017: AMENDED ORDER FOR SALE OF DWELLING

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/23/2017
  • DocketAMENDED ORDER FOR SALE OF DWELLING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2017
  • DocketOrder; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2017
  • DocketOrder; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2017
  • DocketORDER FOR SALE OF DWELLING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2017
  • DocketOrder; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2016
  • DocketDECLARATION OF ARTURO E. MATTHEWS, JR. RE: ORDER FOR SALE OF DWELLING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2016
  • DocketORDER FOR SALE OF DWELLING [C.C.P. SECTIONS 7O4.71O 704.850]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2016
  • Docketat 09:15 AM in Department 44; (OSC-RE Other (Miscellaneous); Off Calendar) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2016
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2016
  • Docketat 09:15 AM in Department 44; (OSC-RE Other (Miscellaneous); Matter continued) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2016
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2016
  • DocketNOTICE OF HEARING ON ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE WHY ORDER FOR SALE OF DWELLING SHOULD NOT BE ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2016
  • DocketNotice of Hearing; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2016
  • DocketProof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2016
  • DocketProof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2016
  • DocketApplication ; Filed by null

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2016
  • DocketAPPLLICATION FOR ORDER FOR SALE OF DWELLING AND ISSUANCE OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE WHY ORDER FOR SALE OF DWELLING SHOULD NOT BE ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2016
  • DocketORDER TO SHOW CAUSE WHY ORDER FOR SALE OF DWELLING SHOULD NOT BE ISSUED [C.C.P. 7O4.71O 704.850]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2016
  • DocketDECLARATION OF MIKE TURNER RE: APPRAISAL OF REAL PROPERTY AT 725 W 1ST STREET, #102, CLAREMONT, CALIFORNIA

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where STUEVE BROTHERS FARMS LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MATTHEWS ARTURO E

Latest cases represented by Lawyer COHN RICHARD A.