This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/02/2023 at 12:51:43 (UTC).

JAIME ALAMILLO VS FOUNDATION PILE INC ET AL

Case Summary

On 05/22/2015 JAIME ALAMILLO filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against FOUNDATION PILE INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****2749

  • Filing Date:

    05/22/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ALAMILLO JAIME

Defendants

FOUNDATION CONSTRUCTORS

FOUNDATION PILE DRIVING

FOUNDATION PILE INC.

SECURITY PAVING COMPANY INC. - DOE 1

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MAGANA CATHCART & MCCARTHY

Defendant Attorneys

SADYKHOVA SABINA

HUSTON ROBERT W. ESQ.

DIAZ R. SCOTT

 

Court Documents

CROSS-COMPLAINT FOR EXPRESS INDEMNITY, IMPLIED INDEMNITY, PARTIAL INDEMNITY, AND DECLARATORY RELIEF

7/22/2016: CROSS-COMPLAINT FOR EXPRESS INDEMNITY, IMPLIED INDEMNITY, PARTIAL INDEMNITY, AND DECLARATORY RELIEF

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT

7/22/2016: ANSWER TO COMPLAINT

FOUNDATION PILE, INC.'S ANSWER TO SECURITY PAVING COMPANY'S CROSS-COMPLAINT

8/30/2016: FOUNDATION PILE, INC.'S ANSWER TO SECURITY PAVING COMPANY'S CROSS-COMPLAINT

ORDER AND STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL, FSC [AND RELATED MOTION/DISCOVERY DATES] PERSONAL INJURY COURTS ONLY (CENTRAL DISTRICT)

9/15/2016: ORDER AND STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL, FSC [AND RELATED MOTION/DISCOVERY DATES] PERSONAL INJURY COURTS ONLY (CENTRAL DISTRICT)

PETITION FOR LEAVE TO INTERVENE; DECLARATION OF NICK J. MOSTERT; POINTS AND AUTHORITIES

12/29/2016: PETITION FOR LEAVE TO INTERVENE; DECLARATION OF NICK J. MOSTERT; POINTS AND AUTHORITIES

DEFENDANT AND CROSS-DEFENDANT FOUNDATION PILE, INC'S NOTICE OF AND MOTION TO CONTINUE TRIAL DATE

1/18/2017: DEFENDANT AND CROSS-DEFENDANT FOUNDATION PILE, INC'S NOTICE OF AND MOTION TO CONTINUE TRIAL DATE

DEFENDANT AND CROSS-DEFENDANT FOUNDATION PILE, INC.'S RE-NOTICE OF MOTION TO CONTINUE TRIAL DATE

1/18/2017: DEFENDANT AND CROSS-DEFENDANT FOUNDATION PILE, INC.'S RE-NOTICE OF MOTION TO CONTINUE TRIAL DATE

MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTUORITIES IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT AND CROSS-DEFENDANT FOUNDATION PILE, INC.'S MOTION TO CONTINUE THE TRIAL DATE

1/18/2017: MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTUORITIES IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT AND CROSS-DEFENDANT FOUNDATION PILE, INC.'S MOTION TO CONTINUE THE TRIAL DATE

DECLARATION OF PAUL VAILLANCOURT IN SUPPORT OF FOUNDATION PILE, INC.'S MOTION TO CONTINUE THE TRIAL DATE

1/18/2017: DECLARATION OF PAUL VAILLANCOURT IN SUPPORT OF FOUNDATION PILE, INC.'S MOTION TO CONTINUE THE TRIAL DATE

NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE CASE

1/31/2017: NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE CASE

 

Docket Entries

05/22/2018

DocketProceeding/Event:OSC RE Dismissal Holly J. Fujie 8:30 am

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/25/2017

DocketDocument:Notice of Entry of Dismissal & P/S Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/19/2017

DocketDocument:Partial Dismissal (with Prejudice) Filed by: Attorney for Cross-Complainant

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/17/2017

DocketCase Dispo/Manner:Dismissed - Other 696 Days

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/17/2017

DocketDocument:Request and Entry of Dismissal Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/22/2017

DocketProceeding/Event:Jury Trial Holly J. Fujie 8:30 am

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/13/2017

DocketDocument:Partial Dismissal (with Prejudice) Filed by: Attorney for Interveor

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/10/2017

DocketProceeding/Event:Final Status Conference Holly J. Fujie 10:00 am

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/08/2017

DocketDocument:Notice Filed by: Attorney for Defendant & X-Deft

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/08/2017

DocketDocument:Order Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10 More Docket Entries
07/22/2016

DocketDocument:Cross-complaint Filed by: ATTORNEY for Defendant and Cross-Compl

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/22/2016

DocketDocument:Answer to Complaint Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/17/2016

DocketDocument:Proof-Service/Summons Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/01/2016

DocketDocument:Amendment to Complaint Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/16/2016

DocketDocument:Notice of Lien Filed by: Attorney for Lien Claimant

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/05/2015

DocketDocument:Answer Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/05/2015

DocketDocument:Notice of Lien Filed by: Attorney for Lien Claimant

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/01/2015

DocketDocument:Proof of Service Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/22/2015

DocketDocument:Complaint Filed by: N/A

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/22/2015

DocketCase Filed/Opened:Other PI/PD/WD

[+] Read More [-] Read Less