This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/09/2019 at 22:51:43 (UTC).

JAHANGIR S JANFAZA VS DEVON ASHLEY MALDONADO ET AL

Case Summary

On 09/09/2015 JAHANGIR S JANFAZA filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against DEVON ASHLEY MALDONADO. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is GEORGINA T. RIZK. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****3931

  • Filing Date:

    09/09/2015

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

GEORGINA T. RIZK

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

JANFAZA JAHANGIR S.

Defendants and Respondents

DOES 1 TO 50

MALDONADO DEVON ASHLEY

MOHNEY CHERYL

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorneys

LAW OFFICES OF ELDAD M. YOUNESSI

SHAKER DAVID ESQ.

Defendant Attorneys

OPFELL CHRISTOPHER KAJ ESQ.

GILDNER JAMES D. ESQ.

 

Court Documents

SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY

12/21/2017: SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY

DEFENDANTS' EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL; ETC.

3/6/2018: DEFENDANTS' EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL; ETC.

Notice of Ruling

3/8/2018: Notice of Ruling

Minute Order

9/20/2018: Minute Order

Legacy Document

9/20/2018: Legacy Document

Motion to Compel

3/7/2019: Motion to Compel

Motion to Compel

3/21/2019: Motion to Compel

Motion to Compel

3/21/2019: Motion to Compel

Informal Discovery Conference Form for Personal Injury Courts

3/26/2019: Informal Discovery Conference Form for Personal Injury Courts

Notice

4/4/2019: Notice

Ex Parte Application

4/9/2019: Ex Parte Application

Notice of Ruling

4/18/2019: Notice of Ruling

COMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES)

9/9/2015: COMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES)

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

2/21/2017: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

Minute Order

2/22/2017: Minute Order

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS

4/20/2017: NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS

NOTICE OF RULING

4/20/2017: NOTICE OF RULING

CIVIL DEPOSIT

6/5/2017: CIVIL DEPOSIT

17 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/14/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 2, Georgina T. Rizk, Presiding; Trial - Not Held - Continued - Party's Motion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2019
  • at 11:00 AM in Department 2, Georgina T. Rizk, Presiding; Informal Discovery Conference (IDC) - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Party

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2019
  • at 10:00 AM in Department 2, Georgina T. Rizk, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Continued - Party's Motion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2019
  • at 1:30 PM in Department 2, Georgina T. Rizk, Presiding; Hearing on Motion - Other (To Compel Nonparty Armani Chiropractic to Comply with Deposition Subpoena) - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Party

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2019
  • Notice of Ruling; Filed by Devon Ashley Maldonado (Defendant); Cheryl Mohney (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2019
  • at 1:30 PM in Department 2, Georgina T. Rizk, Presiding; Hearing on Motion to Compel Discovery (not "Further Discovery") (Response to Request for Production of Documents (Set No. Four); Request for Monetary Sanctions/Attorneys Fees Against Plaintiff and His Arrorney;) - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Party

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2019
  • at 1:30 PM in Department 2, Georgina T. Rizk, Presiding; Hearing on Motion to Compel (Answers to Speical Interrogatories Set Three; Request for Monetary Sanctions/Atorneys Fees Against Plaintiff and His Attorney;) - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Party

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2019
  • at 1:30 PM in Department 2, Georgina T. Rizk, Presiding; Hearing on Motion to Compel Deposition (Plaintiff's Attendance At Deposition;) - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Party

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 2, Georgina T. Rizk, Presiding; Hearing on Ex Parte Application (to Continue Trial Via Stipulation or, in the Alternative, Specially Set for Hearing of Motion) - Held - Motion Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2019
  • Ex Parte Application (to Continue Trial Via Stipulation or, in the Alternative, Specially Set for Hearing of Motion); Filed by Devon Ashley Maldonado (Defendant); Cheryl Mohney (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
48 More Docket Entries
  • 02/22/2017
  • at 10:00 AM in Department 91; Final Status Conference (Final Status Conference; Court makes order) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2017
  • Minute order entered: 2017-02-22 00:00:00; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2017
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2017
  • Proof-Service/Summons; Filed by Jahangir S. Janfaza (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2017
  • PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2017
  • Proof-Service/Summons; Filed by Jahangir S. Janfaza (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2017
  • PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2015
  • SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2015
  • COMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2015
  • Complaint; Filed by Jahangir S. Janfaza (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: BC593931    Hearing Date: October 28, 2019    Dept: 2

AFTER REVIEW OF THE COURT FILE, THE COURT MAKES THE FOLLOWING ORDER:

Department 2 of the Personal Injury Court has determined that the above-entitled action is complicated based upon the number of pretrial hearings and/or the complexity of the issues presented.

AT THE DIRECTION OF DEPARTMENT 1:

This case is hereby transferred and reassigned to the following Independent Calendar Court in the West District, Santa Monica, JUDGE E. W. MANDEL presiding in Department P for all purposes except trial. Department 1 hereby delegates to the Independent Calendar Court the authority to assign the cause for trial to that Independent Calendar Court.

The Order is signed and filed this date, and incorporated herein by reference. Any pending motions or hearings, including trial and status conferences, will be reset, continued or vacated at the direction of the newly assigned Independent Calendar court.

Upon receipt of this notice, counsel for Plaintiff shall give notice to all parties of record.