Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/09/2021 at 15:24:09 (UTC).

JADREY SIMBOL, ET-AL VS TENET HEALTHCARE CORPORATION, ET-AL

Case Summary

On 12/14/2012 JADREY SIMBOL, ET-AL filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against TENET HEALTHCARE CORPORATION, ET-AL. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Norwalk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are RAFAEL A. ONGKEKO, HIGA, ROBERT J., MARGARET M. BERNAL and SAMANTHA P. JESSNER. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****2490

  • Filing Date:

    12/14/2012

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Norwalk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

RAFAEL A. ONGKEKO

HIGA, ROBERT J.

MARGARET M. BERNAL

SAMANTHA P. JESSNER

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Others

SIMBOL JADREY

SIMBOL VICTORIA

SIMBOL JADREY AS SUCCESSOR IN INTEREST

Defendants

TOPACIO RUTH J. M.D.(ERRON SUED)

LAKEWOOD REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER

TENET HEALTHCARE CORPORATION

TOPACIO RUTH G. M.D.

TOPACIO RUTH J. M.D.ERRON SUED

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MICHELS & LEW

Defendant Attorneys

LAW BRANDMEYER + PACKER LLP

DUMMIT BUCHHOLZ & TRAPP

 

Court Documents

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT -

4/4/2013: CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT -

Minute Order -

4/18/2013: Minute Order -

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM NAME

6/11/2013: NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM NAME

REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR TRIAL SETTING PREFERENCE

6/12/2013: REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR TRIAL SETTING PREFERENCE

AMENDED ANSWER OF DEFENDANT RUTH G. TOPACIO, M.D. TO COMPLAINT AS TO THE FIRST AND THIRD CAUSES OF ACTION, ONLY

6/14/2013: AMENDED ANSWER OF DEFENDANT RUTH G. TOPACIO, M.D. TO COMPLAINT AS TO THE FIRST AND THIRD CAUSES OF ACTION, ONLY

DEFENDANTS, TENET HEALTHCARE CORPORATION AND LAKEWOOD REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER?S OPPOSITION TO PLAINTWFS? MOTION FOR PREFERENCE

6/27/2013: DEFENDANTS, TENET HEALTHCARE CORPORATION AND LAKEWOOD REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER?S OPPOSITION TO PLAINTWFS? MOTION FOR PREFERENCE

Minute Order -

7/12/2013: Minute Order -

DEFENDANT, LAKE WOOD REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER?S MOTION TO. CONTINUE TRIAL OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE,.TO SPECIALLY SET THE HEARING ON ITS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES;

10/15/2013: DEFENDANT, LAKE WOOD REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER?S MOTION TO. CONTINUE TRIAL OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE,.TO SPECIALLY SET THE HEARING ON ITS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES;

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM NAME

11/14/2013: NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM NAME

ORDER APPOINTING COURT APPROVED REPORTER AS OFFICIAL REPORTER PRO TEMPORE

11/15/2013: ORDER APPOINTING COURT APPROVED REPORTER AS OFFICIAL REPORTER PRO TEMPORE

DECLARATION OF RUTH G. TOPACIO, M.D. IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OF DEFENDANT RUTH G. TOPACIO, M.D.

12/6/2013: DECLARATION OF RUTH G. TOPACIO, M.D. IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OF DEFENDANT RUTH G. TOPACIO, M.D.

NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OF DEFENDANT RUTH G. TOPACIO, M.D.; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES; DECLARATION OF ANET BADALI, ESQ. IN SUPPORT THEREOF

12/6/2013: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OF DEFENDANT RUTH G. TOPACIO, M.D.; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES; DECLARATION OF ANET BADALI, ESQ. IN SUPPORT THEREOF

SEPARATE STATEMENT OF UNDISPUTED MATERIAL FACTS

12/9/2013: SEPARATE STATEMENT OF UNDISPUTED MATERIAL FACTS

NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT

1/2/2014: NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL -

1/8/2014: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL -

PLAINTIFFS? OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT TENET HEALTHCARE?S MSJ; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS & AUTHORITIES;

2/11/2014: PLAINTIFFS? OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT TENET HEALTHCARE?S MSJ; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS & AUTHORITIES;

DEFENDANTS' OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS' OBJECTIONS TO EVIDENCE RE DEFENDANTS? MSJ AND MSAI

2/21/2014: DEFENDANTS' OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS' OBJECTIONS TO EVIDENCE RE DEFENDANTS? MSJ AND MSAI

NOTICE OF ERRATA RE: PETITION TO APPROVE COMPROMISE OF PENDING ACTION OF MINOR

2/20/2015: NOTICE OF ERRATA RE: PETITION TO APPROVE COMPROMISE OF PENDING ACTION OF MINOR

29 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/20/2015
  • DocketNOTICE OF ERRATA RE: PETITION TO APPROVE COMPROMISE OF PENDING ACTION OF MINOR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2015
  • DocketNotice; Filed by JADREY SIMBOL (Legacy Party); JADREY, SIMBOL (Plaintiff); VICTORIA, SIMBOL (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2015
  • DocketNotice (RE: PETITION TO APPROVE COMPROMISE OF PENDING ACTION OF MINOR ); Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2014
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 91; Jury Trial - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2014
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department F; (Order to Show Cause; OSC Discharged) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2014
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal (WITH PREJUDICE; ENTIRE ACTION OF ALL PARTIES AND ALL CAUSES OF ACTION; ); Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2014
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by JADREY SIMBOL (Legacy Party); JADREY, SIMBOL (Plaintiff); VICTORIA, SIMBOL (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2014
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 91; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2014
  • DocketRequest for Correction (REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL PREPARED BY COUNSEL FOR THE PLAINTIFF REFLECTS DISMISSAL MAILED TO COUNSEL FOR PLAINTIFF WHO PREPARED SAME, NEEDS REFLECT OPPOSING COUNSEL ON PROOF OF SERVICE.); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2014
  • DocketRequest for Correction; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
193 More Docket Entries
  • 12/19/2012
  • DocketPetn & Ord Appointing GAL; Filed by JADREY SIMBOL (Legacy Party); JUSTIN SIMBOL (Legacy Party)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2012
  • DocketDeclaration (SUCCESSOR IN INTEREST ); Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2012
  • DocketPetn & Ord Appointng GAL (naming JADREY as Guardian Ad Litem for JARICK SIMBOL ); Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2012
  • DocketPetn & Ord Appointng GAL (naming JADREY SIMBOL as Guardian Ad Litem for JUSTIN SIMBOL ); Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2012
  • DocketPetn & Ord Appointing GAL; Filed by JADREY SIMBOL (Legacy Party); JARICK SIMBOL (Legacy Party)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2012
  • DocketDeclaration; Filed by JADREY SIMBOL (Legacy Party); JADREY, SIMBOL (Plaintiff); VICTORIA, SIMBOL (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2012
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2012
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by JADREY, SIMBOL (Plaintiff); VICTORIA, SIMBOL (Plaintiff); JADREY, as Successor in Interest SIMBOL (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2012
  • DocketComplaint Filed-No Summons Issued; Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2012
  • DocketNotice-Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where LAKEWOOD REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER is a litigant

Latest cases where Tenet Health Care Corporation is a litigant