This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 02/06/2016 at 00:55:34 (UTC).

JACQUELINE CORCORAN VS. BRUCE GOSS

Case Summary

On 09/11/2012 JACQUELINE CORCORAN filed an Other - Injunction lawsuit against BRUCE GOSS. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Burbank Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are WILLIAM D. STEWART and JAN A. PLUIM. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****0128

  • Filing Date:

    09/11/2012

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Injunction

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Burbank Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

WILLIAM D. STEWART

JAN A. PLUIM

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Cross Defendant

CORCORAN JACQUELINE

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff

GOSS BRUCE

Not Classified By Court

BROWN WILLIAM J.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Cross Defendant Attorneys

FREDERICK E. CHOL

FREDERICK E. CHOL ATTORNEY AT LAW

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorneys

BLACKBURN ALEXANDER C. LAW OFFICE OF

BLACKBURN & ASSOCIATES

Not Classified By Court Attorney

EDWARD G. MCLEE ESQ.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/26/2016
  • Notice of Continuance Filed by Atty for Defendant and Cross-Compl

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2015
  • Brief (OF JACQUELINE CORCORAN WITH RESPECT TO REIMBURSEMENTS UNDER THE GOOD FAITH IMPROVER CODE PROVISIONS ) Filed by Atty for Plaintiff and Cross-Deft

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2015
  • Request ((AMENDED) FOR STATEMENT OF DECIS- ION BY CROSS DEFENDANT, JACQUELINE CORCORAN ) Filed by Atty for Plaintiff and Cross-Deft

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2015
  • Brief (ON THE APPROPRIATE METHOD FOR CALCULATING REIMBURSEMENT ) Filed by Atty for Defendant and Cross-Compl

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2015
  • Declaration (OF BRUCE GOSS ) Filed by Atty for Defendant and Cross-Compl

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2015
  • Proof of Service (ON TRIAL BRIEF ) Filed by Atty for Defendant and Cross-Compl

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2015
  • Proof of Service (ON EXHIBIT LIST AND WITNESS LIST ) Filed by Atty for Defendant and Cross-Compl

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2015
  • Exhibit List Filed by Atty for Defendant and Cross-Compl

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2015
  • Brief Filed by Atty for Defendant and Cross-Compl

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2015
  • List of Witnesses Filed by Atty for Defendant and Cross-Compl

    Read MoreRead Less
42 More Docket Entries
  • 10/12/2012
  • Declaration (RE NOTICE OF EX PARTE HEARING ON APPLICATION OF PLAINTIFF TRO AND ORDER TO SHOE CAUSE RE PRELIMINARY INJUCTION ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2012
  • ExParte Application/Petition (AND SUPPORTING DECLARATION OF JAQUELINE CORCORAN FOR TRO AND ORDER TO SHOE CAUSE RE PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2012
  • Declaration (OF MIKE VACHANI ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2012
  • Declaration (OF BRUCE GOSS ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2012
  • Opposition (TO APPLICATION FOR TRO ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2012
  • Declaration (OF PLAINTIFF JACQUELINE CONCORAN AND POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF PRELIM INJUNCTION ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2012
  • Answer to Complaint Filed Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2012
  • Cross-Compl fld- No Summons Issued Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2012
  • Proof-Service/Summons Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2012
  • Complaint Filed

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: GC050128    Hearing Date: September 25, 2020    Dept: A

Motion re sale of property

Parties are requested to bring copies of public records showing any ordinances or regulations concerning the size of "footprint" permitted on the lot in question.