This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/22/2016 05:11:35

Get the Latest Court Record Available:

Case Summary

On 03/07/2011 a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce case was filed by Jackson Michael Lynch against Amy Lauren Landecker in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California.

Case Details

  • Case Number XXXX0710
  • Filing Date 03/07/2011
  • Case Status Disposed - Judgment Entered
  • Case Type Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce
  • Jurisdiction Los Angeles County Superior Courts
  • Courthouse Stanley Mosk Courthouse
  • County Los Angeles
  • State California

Party Details

  • Respondent Landecker Amy
  • Represented By
    • Self Represented
  • Petitioner Lynch Jackson Michael
  • Represented By
    • Takesh Fahimeh
  • Respondent Landecker Amy Lauren
  • Represented By
    • Jamra Grace A.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

Docket Entries

  • 09/11/2014
  • Notice-Withdrawal of Attorney Filed by Respondent
  • 09/02/2014
  • Notice-Withdrawal of Attorney Filed by Respondent
  • 03/25/2014
  • Proof of Service (f/b 730 expert )
  • 03/12/2014
  • Order-Qualified Dom. Relat (QDRO) (PLACED CERTIFIED COPY IN ATTY SER PICK UP BOX ON 03/13/14 C/O ALSSI )
  • 03/12/2014
  • Order-Qualified Dom. Relat (QDRO) (PLACE CERTIFIED COPY IN ATTY SER P ICK UP BOX ON 03/13/2014 C/O ALSS I )
  • 02/19/2014
  • Receipt
  • 11/22/2013
  • Notice-Entry-Judgment
  • 11/22/2013
  • Judgment
  • 11/22/2013
  • Declaration-Default
  • 08/20/2013
  • Judgment-Package Received-STIP
  • 08/15/2013
  • Stipulation, Appearance & Waivers
  • 06/26/2013
  • Judgment-Package Received-STIP
  • 06/26/2013
  • Receipt
  • 04/08/2013
  • Declaration-Serv Pre Dec Dis Inc Filed by Respondent
  • 02/07/2013
  • Declaration-Serv Pre Dec Dis Inc Filed by Petitioner
  • 06/13/2012
  • Notice-Appear & Resp-Emp Pen Ben P (filed by Morgan Stanley Smith Barn ey LLC )
  • 04/18/2012
  • Request-Join Empl Ben Plan & Order
  • 04/18/2012
  • Joinder-Pleading
  • 05/25/2011
  • Notice-Acknowledgement of Receipt Filed by Petitioner
  • 04/13/2011
  • Declaration-Uniform Custody Minor' Filed by Petitioner

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.