Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/09/2021 at 08:27:06 (UTC).

JACKSON, MICHAEL JOSEPH - DECEDENT

Case Summary

On 06/29/2009 JACKSON, MICHAEL JOSEPH - DECEDENT was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are MURPHY, DANIEL S., KUHL, CAROLYN, GREEN, LESLEY C., BECKLOFF, MITCHELL L., STRATTON, MARIA E., PENNY, BRENDA, GOETZ, REVA, MITCHELL L. BECKLOFF, CUNNINGHAM, DAVID S., BRAZILE, KEVIN C., LEVANAS, MICHAEL I., BUCKLEY, DANIEL J., DEBRE K. WEINTRAUB, PAUL, ROY L. and PENNY, BRENDA J.. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****7321

  • Filing Date:

    06/29/2009

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

MURPHY, DANIEL S.

KUHL, CAROLYN

GREEN, LESLEY C.

BECKLOFF, MITCHELL L.

STRATTON, MARIA E.

PENNY, BRENDA

GOETZ, REVA

MITCHELL L. BECKLOFF

CUNNINGHAM, DAVID S.

BRAZILE, KEVIN C.

LEVANAS, MICHAEL I.

BUCKLEY, DANIEL J.

DEBRE K. WEINTRAUB

PAUL, ROY L.

PENNY, BRENDA J.

 

Party Details

Petitioners and Appellants

JACKSON JOSEPH WALTER

JOHNSON CRAIG A.

THIRD PARTY CUSTODIANS OF RECORD

AEG LIVE LLC

DEWEY & LEBOEUG LLP

DEMANN ENTERTAINMENT INC.

ROWE DEBORAH J.

MCCLAIN JOHN

BUXER BRADLEY

THE MACHINE MANAGEMENT LLC

SIGNAL HILL CAPITAL GROUP LLC

Claimants

PARRISH LYNDA L.

BACHUS JURGEN

ALEXANDER VAN

IGLESIAS ANER

JACKSON PRINCE MICHAEL MALACHI JET

AYSCOUGH & MARAR

Others

JACKSON ALEJANDRA

JACKSON GENEVIEVE

JACKSON RANDY JR

96 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

STATE OF CALIF. DEPART. OF JUSTICE

Other Attorneys

HOFFMAN SABBAN & WATENMAKER

HOWARD WEITZMAN ESQ.

RIBERA SANDRA LYNN

WANDER PERRY C. ESQ

HORNBERGER NICHOLAS W. ESQ

BYRNE JOHN M. ESQ

SHAPIRO SAMUEL D. ESQ

CUTROW ALLAN B. ESQ

WOLF KENNETH S. ATTORNEY AT LAW

MOORE KEVIN J. ESQ

LEVITCH BURT ATTORNEY AT LAW

JOHNSON DANIEL ALBERT

ABRAMS MICHAEL L. ESQ

GRIVAKES CHRISTOPHER ESQ

PAPIANO NEIL ESQ

MILLER-GINSBURG CATHY S. ESQ

BROWN FLETCHER

HANSELL DEAN ESQ

PRICE DYLAN J.

65 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

Accounting - Decedent's Estate - Eighth Account Current and Report of Status, etc.

10/30/2020: Accounting - Decedent's Estate - Eighth Account Current and Report of Status, etc.

Accounting - Decedent's Estate - Seventh Account Current and Report

9/13/2019: Accounting - Decedent's Estate - Seventh Account Current and Report

OTHER - CLAIMANT JAMES SAFECHUCK'S NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO FILE UNDER SEAL; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES AND DECLARATION OF MARYANN R. MARZANO IN SUPPORT THEREOF

5/9/2014: OTHER - CLAIMANT JAMES SAFECHUCK'S NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO FILE UNDER SEAL; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES AND DECLARATION OF MARYANN R. MARZANO IN SUPPORT THEREOF

OTHER - AMENDED NOTICE OF CLAIMANT JAMES SAFECHUCK'S MOTION TO FILE UNDER SEAL

5/15/2014: OTHER - AMENDED NOTICE OF CLAIMANT JAMES SAFECHUCK'S MOTION TO FILE UNDER SEAL

Supplement - First Supplement to Fourt Account Current and Report of Status of Administration and Petition for Settlement Thereof; ect..

2/26/2016: Supplement - First Supplement to Fourt Account Current and Report of Status of Administration and Petition for Settlement Thereof; ect..

Report (No Fee) - SIXTH ACCOUNT CURRENT AND REPORT OF STATUS OF ADMINISTRATION AND PETITION FOR SETTLEMENT THEREOF

12/5/2017: Report (No Fee) - SIXTH ACCOUNT CURRENT AND REPORT OF STATUS OF ADMINISTRATION AND PETITION FOR SETTLEMENT THEREOF

Notice - Lodging - Executors' Second Notice of Lodgment In Support of Petition for Order Allowing and Authorizing Payment

12/19/2017: Notice - Lodging - Executors' Second Notice of Lodgment In Support of Petition for Order Allowing and Authorizing Payment

Proof of Service - Proof of Service on Counsel

7/23/2020: Proof of Service - Proof of Service on Counsel

Minute Order

8/17/2009: Minute Order

OTHER - REQUEST FOR SPECIAL NOTICE

7/30/2010: OTHER - REQUEST FOR SPECIAL NOTICE

Inventory and Appraisement - - PARTIAL NO. 3

9/22/2010: Inventory and Appraisement - - PARTIAL NO. 3

Notice of Hearing (Probate)

3/15/2011: Notice of Hearing (Probate)

Notice of Hearing (Probate)

5/20/2011: Notice of Hearing (Probate)

OTHER - Declaration

8/5/2013: OTHER - Declaration

Substitution of Attorney

10/24/2013: Substitution of Attorney

Notice of Entry of Order

6/10/2014: Notice of Entry of Order

OTHER - SECOND SUPPLEMENT TO THIRD ACCOUNT CURRENT AND REPORT OF STATUS OF ADMINISTRATION AND PETITION FOR SETTLEMENT THEREOF, ETC.

8/7/2014: OTHER - SECOND SUPPLEMENT TO THIRD ACCOUNT CURRENT AND REPORT OF STATUS OF ADMINISTRATION AND PETITION FOR SETTLEMENT THEREOF, ETC.

Notice - Hearing

6/7/2016: Notice - Hearing

1,995 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/11/2021
  • Hearing06/11/2021 at 9:30 AM in Non Probate Department at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Petition Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2021
  • Hearing06/11/2021 at 9:30 AM in Non Probate Department at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Petition Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2021
  • DocketPetition - Compel; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2021
  • DocketPetition - Authority (Petition for Order Re Operation of the MJJ Business ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2021
  • DocketNotice (Notice of Withdrawal of (1) Creditor's Claim and (2) Related Request for Special Notice ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • DocketLACourtConnect-Fees Paid A; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • DocketLACourtConnect-Fees Paid A; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • DocketLACourtConnect-Fees Paid A; Filed by Minor

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • DocketLACourtConnect-Fees Paid V; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • Docketin Non Probate Department, Beckloff, Mitchell L., Presiding; Motion Hearing - Held - Motion Denied

    Read MoreRead Less
2,361 More Docket Entries
  • 07/01/2009
  • DocketPetition - Letters of Special Administration (Judgment by Court-Petition Granted Supervisory Order 1st Hearing Date: 07/06/2009 Repres By: Hoffman, Paul Gordon, Esq., Attorney for Petitioner Filed By: Branca, John, Petitioner Filed By: McClain, John, Petitioner Complaint Num: 4 )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2009
  • DocketOrder (ORDER RE: SAFEKEEPING OF WILL AND PETITIONS FOR PROBATE Filed By: SUPERIOR COURT, Court )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2009
  • DocketPetition - Probate of Will (Judgment by Court-Petition Granted After Trial - Contested REDACTED 1st Hearing Date: 08/03/2009 Repres By: Hoffman, Paul Gordon, Esq., Attorney for Petitioner Repres By: Cohen, Jeryll S., Esq., Attorney for Petitioner Filed By: Branca, John, Petitioner Filed By: McClain, John, Petitioner Complaint Num: 3 )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2009
  • DocketDeclaration (DECLARATION OF JERYLL S. COHEN RE NOTICE TO INTERESTED PARTIES Repres By: Cohen, Jeryll S., Esq., Attorney for Petitioner Filed By: Branca, John, Petitioner Filed By: McClain, John, Petitioner )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2009
  • DocketPetition - Letters of Special Administration (Judgment by Court-Petition Denied Supervisory Order ADMINISTRATION AS REGARDS TO PRO- PERTIES EXCLUDING MONEY IN THE BANKS 1st Hearing Date: 07/06/2009 Repres By: Levitch, Burt, Attorney at Law, Former Attorney for Pltf/Petn Filed By: Jackson, Katherine Esther, Petitioner Filed By: Jackson, Joseph Walter, Petitioner Complaint Num: 2 )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2009
  • DocketSupplement (TO ATTACHMENT 3F(3) OF PETITION FOR LETTERS OF SPECIAL ADMIN. Filed By: Levitch, Burt, Attorney at Law, Former Attorney for Pltf/Petn Repres By: Jackson, Katherine Esther, Petitioner )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2009
  • DocketOrder - Appointing Special Administrator (Temporary, expires 2009-07-06 BOND $500,000. Repres By: Levitch, Burt, Attorney at Law, Former Attorney for Pltf/Petn Filed By: Jackson, Katherine Esther, Petitioner )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2009
  • DocketPetition - Letters of Administration (1st Hearing Date: 08/03/2009 Repres By: Levitch, Burt, Attorney at Law, Former Attorney for Pltf/Petn Filed By: Jackson, Katherine Esther, Petitioner Complaint Num: 1 )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2001
  • DocketResponse (Filed by: Attorney for Claimant )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/1998
  • DocketFee waiver requested (Repres By: IN PRO PER, Attorney for Petitioner Filed By: Smith, Shellie D., Petitioner )

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: BP117321    Hearing Date: April 9, 2021    Dept: 86

In re the Estate of Michael Jackson

BP117321

Hearing Date: April 9, 2021

[Tentative] Order Denying Petition/Motion for Genetic Testing of Deceased Person

Petitioner, Bruce Watson, brings this petition/motion seeking genetic testing pursuant to Family Code section 7652 of decedent, Michael Jackson. The Estate opposes his motion.

The petition/motion is denied. The court finds Petitioner has not established good cause to require genetic testing with the decedent.

The Estate’s request for judicial notice is granted.

The Estate’s evidentiary objection to the exhibits attached to the petition is granted.

ANALYSIS

Family Code section 7652 provides: “If a person seeking genetic testing demonstrates good cause, the court may order genetic testing of a dead person.”

In his unverified[1] petition/motion, Petitioner alleges he is the eldest child of the decedent. He contends a fraud has been perpetrated on the probate court. He asserts the decedent’s mother, Katherine Jackson, and other family members (Tito Jackson, Taj Jackson, T.J. Jackson and Tarylle Jackson) are aware of his relationship to the decedent.

Petitioner submitted as evidence to support his petition/motion a death certificate for Billie Jean Smith evidencing a March 10, 2014 date of death for Ms. Smith. Ms. Smith was widowed and died in St. Louis, Missouri. Ms. Smith, according to the petition, was “the decedent’s care giver of I, Bruce Watson.”

Petitioner relates the decedent recorded two songs “speaking of Petitioner with care giver Billie Jean.” Petitioner contends the decedent’s brother, Tito Jackson, can verify the decedent placed Petitioner with Billie Jean Smith for care.

Petitioner also submits “a medical document” with the names of Petitioner and Dr. Conrad Murray on them. (The nature of the document is unclear. It displays Petitioner’s name under Patient Information.) Petitioner states the decedent hired Dr. Murray “to do a surgery of Petitioner” after Petitioner sustained an injury. Petitioner alleges the decedent paid for the surgery.

In addition, Petitioner requests the court “to view lunchable Parents.com and view a photo of Petitioner with other siblings of decedent’s children to prove a living relationship existed with decedent and decedent’s children with Petitioner.”

Petitioner explains he has been incarcerated since July 11, 2009 to explain his delay in contacting the court. He reports he had no way to challenge the legitimacy of the decedent’s will. He notes Wikipedia states the decedent’s brother, Tito Jackson, questioned the legitimacy of decedent’s will.

Petitioner desires to assert his “rights to the estate” but needs an order for genetic testing to establish those rights. Once Petitioner establishes his genetic relationship with the decedent, he intends to challenge the current personal representatives of the estate.

The Estate argues there is no legal basis to support an order for genetic testing, and Petitioner has not established good cause for such testing. The court agrees.

Even assuming a legal basis to order genetic testing existed here, the court finds Petitioner has not established good cause.

First, the court has sustained the Estate’s evidentiary objections to the documents attached to the petition.

Second, even if the court considered the exhibits, they do not establish good cause. Ms. Smith’s death certificate does not establish any connection between Petitioner and the decedent. That the decedent may have written two songs about “Billie Jean” does not establish any relationship between the decedent and Billie Jean Smith or the decedent and Petitioner. The purported medical record does not establish any relationship between Petitioner and the decedent. That Dr. Murray was involved in the decedent’s death and also may have treated Petitioner does not establish a connection between Petitioner and the decedent. Finally, websites on the internet (Biography.com and Parents.com) do not credibly establish any relationship between Petitioner and the decedent.

Petitioner also has not submitted any evidence from witnesses to support his petition/motion. While he claims many family members are aware of his relationship to the decedent—Katherine Jackson, Tito Jackson, T.J. Jackson, Tarylle Jackson—the court has no evidence from these witnesses. Other than Petitioner’s belief about what such witnesses can confirm, there is nothing to corroborate Petitioner’s beliefs.

Finally, it is not clear to the court why Petitioner has waited over 10 years since the decedent’s death to contact the court. The decedent died on June 25, 2009. Petitioner signed his petition/motion on October 8, 2020. Petitioner sent the petition/motion from the facility where he has been incarcerated since July 11, 2009—nothing suggests he did not have the ability to do the same in 2009. Ms. Smith died almost five years after the decedent. The purported medical record is dated June 2006, three years before the decedent’s death. While the delay may not preclude Petitioner’s request, the delay does inform on good cause. Without adequate explanation, one might wonder why Petitioner delayed asserting his rights for over a decade when he thought a fraud had been perpetrated on the probate court, and he had been deprived of his rights to a likely substantial inheritance.

CONCLUSION

Based on the foregoing, the motion is denied.

IT IS SO ORDERED.

April 9, 2021 ________________________________

Hon. Mitchell Beckloff

Judge of the Superior Court


[1] The verification is legally inadequate.

related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where AYSCOUGH & MARAR is a litigant

Latest cases where AEG LIVE LLC is a litigant