This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/07/2019 at 00:56:10 (UTC).

JACKELYN CASTILLO VS DEPT OF MOTOR VEHICLES STATE OF CALIFOR

Case Summary

On 05/02/2016 JACKELYN CASTILLO filed an Other - Writ Of Mandamus lawsuit against DEPT OF MOTOR VEHICLES STATE OF CALIFOR. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****1859

  • Filing Date:

    05/02/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Other - Writ Of Mandamus

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

CASTILLO JACKELYN

Defendant and Respondent

DEPARTMENT OF MOTOR VEHICLES STATE OF

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorneys

GORDON WALTER L. III

RODRIGUEZ ANTONIO H.

Defendant Attorney

BRUMBACH GABRIELLE H. DEPUTY ATTY. GEN.

 

Court Documents

PETITION FOR A WRIT OF MANDATE

5/2/2016: PETITION FOR A WRIT OF MANDATE

NOTICE OF TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE & ATTACHED ORDERS THEREON

6/1/2016: NOTICE OF TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE & ATTACHED ORDERS THEREON

NOTICE OF TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE & ATTACHED ORDERS THEREON

6/1/2016: NOTICE OF TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE & ATTACHED ORDERS THEREON

NOTICE OF HEARING

6/21/2016: NOTICE OF HEARING

Minute Order

8/25/2016: Minute Order

PETITIONER'S TRIAL BRIEF

9/1/2016: PETITIONER'S TRIAL BRIEF

RETURN BY WAY OF ANSWER TO PETITION FOR WRIT OF MANDAMUS; POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN OPPOSITION THERETO

9/27/2016: RETURN BY WAY OF ANSWER TO PETITION FOR WRIT OF MANDAMUS; POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN OPPOSITION THERETO

PETITIONER'S REPLY BRIEF

10/3/2016: PETITIONER'S REPLY BRIEF

Minute Order

10/27/2016: Minute Order

DECLARATION OF BRAD PARR REGARDING MEET AND CONFER REGARDING [PROPOSED] JUDGMENT DENYING WRIT OF MANDATE

11/9/2016: DECLARATION OF BRAD PARR REGARDING MEET AND CONFER REGARDING [PROPOSED] JUDGMENT DENYING WRIT OF MANDATE

JUDGMENT DENYING PETITION FOR WRIT OF MANDATE UNDER CCP ? 1085 AND VEHICLE CODE ? 13352 TO SET ASIDE SUSPENSION OF DRIVING PRIVILEGE AND AWARDING COSTS TO RESPONDENT

11/28/2016: JUDGMENT DENYING PETITION FOR WRIT OF MANDATE UNDER CCP ? 1085 AND VEHICLE CODE ? 13352 TO SET ASIDE SUSPENSION OF DRIVING PRIVILEGE AND AWARDING COSTS TO RESPONDENT

Minute Order

11/29/2016: Minute Order

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT

12/6/2016: NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/06/2016
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/06/2016
  • Notice of Entry of Judgment; Filed by Defendant/Respondent

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2016
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 82; Unknown Event Type - Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2016
  • Minute Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/28/2016
  • Judgment; Filed by Defendant/Respondent

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/28/2016
  • JUDGMENT DENYING PETITION FOR WRIT OF MANDATE UNDER CCP 1085 AND VEHICLE CODE 13352 TO SET ASIDE SUSPENSION OF DRIVING PRIVILEGE AND AWARDING COSTS TO RESPONDENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/09/2016
  • DECLARATION OF BRAD PARR REGARDING MEET AND CONFER REGARDING [PROPOSED] JUDGMENT DENYING WRIT OF MANDATE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/09/2016
  • Declaration; Filed by Defendant/Respondent

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/27/2016
  • at 1:30 PM in Department 82; Hearing on Petition for Writ of Mandate (Hearing--Writ of Mandate; Denied) -

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/27/2016
  • Minute Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 08/25/2016
  • at 1:30 PM in Department 82; Trial Setting Conference - Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/25/2016
  • Minute Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/21/2016
  • NOTICE OF HEARING

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/21/2016
  • Notice of Hearing; Filed by Jackelyn Castillo (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/01/2016
  • NOTICE OF TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE & ATTACHED ORDERS THEREON

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/01/2016
  • Notice of Trial Setting Conference and Attached Orders Thereon; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/01/2016
  • NOTICE OF TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE & ATTACHED ORDERS THEREON

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/01/2016
  • Notice of Trial Setting Conference and Attached Orders Thereon; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/02/2016
  • Petition; Filed by null

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/02/2016
  • PETITION FOR A WRIT OF MANDATE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less