Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/23/2019 at 07:56:40 (UTC).

J A K DESIGN CORP VS BLACK CAT FASHION INC

Case Summary

On 01/13/2016 J A K DESIGN CORP filed a Contract - Business lawsuit against BLACK CAT FASHION INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is DANIEL S. MURPHY. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****7160

  • Filing Date:

    01/13/2016

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Business

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

DANIEL S. MURPHY

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

J.A.K. DESIGN CORP.

Defendants and Respondents

DOES 1 THROUGH 100

VETAN DULCCI

BLACK CAT FASHION INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorneys

BINDER & ASSOCIATES

VAROZIAN ROUBEN

Defendant Attorneys

LAW OFFICES OF RANDALL M. AWAD APC

NADAR NARAGHI & WOODCOCK APLC

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO BE RELIEVED A5 COUNSEL CIVIL

8/10/2018: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO BE RELIEVED A5 COUNSEL CIVIL

Unknown

9/25/2018: Unknown

Minute Order

11/15/2018: Minute Order

Unknown

12/4/2018: Unknown

Unknown

12/5/2018: Unknown

SUMMONS

1/13/2016: SUMMONS

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

3/4/2016: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

Unknown

5/9/2016: Unknown

NOTICE OF RELATED CASE

5/13/2016: NOTICE OF RELATED CASE

PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF COURT'S RULING AT CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

5/18/2016: PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF COURT'S RULING AT CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

Minute Order

5/18/2016: Minute Order

CIVIL DEPOSIT

7/15/2016: CIVIL DEPOSIT

SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY

2/2/2017: SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY

Minute Order

3/30/2017: Minute Order

JOINT EXPARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE, TRIAL AND DISCOVERY; MEMORANDUM OF POINT AND ETC

3/31/2017: JOINT EXPARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE, TRIAL AND DISCOVERY; MEMORANDUM OF POINT AND ETC

NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION OF DEFENDANT BLACK CAT FASHION, INC. TO COMPEL COMPLIANCE WITH DEMAND FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS AND THINGS; REQUEST FOR ORDER AWARDING MONETARY SANCTIONS AGAINST PLAINTIF

9/8/2017: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION OF DEFENDANT BLACK CAT FASHION, INC. TO COMPEL COMPLIANCE WITH DEMAND FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS AND THINGS; REQUEST FOR ORDER AWARDING MONETARY SANCTIONS AGAINST PLAINTIF

ORDER RE: MOTION TO COMPEL COMPLIANCE WITH DEMAND FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS

10/2/2017: ORDER RE: MOTION TO COMPEL COMPLIANCE WITH DEMAND FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS

Minute Order

10/26/2017: Minute Order

48 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/05/2018
  • Notice of Entry of Judgment (or Order); Filed by J.A.K. Design Corp. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2018
  • at 08:37 AM in Department 32, Daniel S. Murphy, Presiding; Jury Trial - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2018
  • Judgment; Filed by J.A.K. Design Corp. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2018
  • Minute Order ((Jury Trial)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2018
  • Notice of Entry of Judgment / Dismissal / Other Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2018
  • Judgment; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2018
  • at 08:37 AM in Department 32, Daniel S. Murphy, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2018
  • Minute Order ((Final Status Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2018
  • Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by Black Cat Fashion, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2018
  • Proof of Service by 1st Class Mail

    Read MoreRead Less
103 More Docket Entries
  • 05/08/2016
  • Motion to Strike; Filed by Black Cat Fashion, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2016
  • NOTICE OF DEMURRER AND DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2016
  • NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF THE COMPLAINT; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2016
  • Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by J.A.K. Design Corp. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2016
  • PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2016
  • Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2016
  • NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2016
  • COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES 1. NEGLIGENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2016
  • SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2016
  • Complaint; Filed by J.A.K. Design Corp. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: BC607160    Hearing Date: November 18, 2020    Dept: 32

j.a.k. design corp.,

Plaintiff,

v.

BLACK CAT FASHION INC., et. al.

Defendants.

Case No.: BC607160

Hearing Date: November 18, 2020

[TENTATIVE] order RE:

motion to compel Black cat’s further responses to requests for production of documents, set one

Background

Plaintiff J.A.K. Design Corp. dba Planet USA (JAK) commenced this action against Defendants Black Cat Fashion, Inc. dba Dulcci Vetan (Black Cat) on January 13, 2016. The Complaint asserted a single cause of action for negligence.

On December 4, 2018, the Court presided over a default prove-up hearing. Judgment was entered for JAK and against Black Cat in the total amount of $1,217,586.71.

Discussion

JAK moves to compel Black Cat to provide further responses to its Requests for Production of Documents (RFP), Set One, Nos. 1-103. JAK also moves to compel Black Cat to comply with its written statements of compliance as to RFP Nos. 1-5, 41-43, 47-48, 51, 53-54, 56, 58, 61, 63, 76, 78, 81, 83, 86-89, and 101-103 by producing documents responsive to these requests.

This motion is moot. After JAK brought this motion, Black Cat served JAK with further responses to RFP, Set One, and produced responsive documents. (Opri Decl. ¶ 2(h), (j), Ex. N.)

This leaves the issue of sanctions. (CRC Rule 3.1348(a).) JAK requests monetary sanctions of $6,810 against Black Cat and its counsel of record because Black Cat’s defective discovery responses necessitated the bringing of this motion. Black Cat responds that JAK failed to meet and confer. Black Cat’s counsel avers that she did not receive the meet-and-confer letter sent by JAK’s counsel until Black Cat was served with the instant motion. (Opri Decl. ¶ 2(c).)

The Court finds Black Cat’s counsel’s averment to be credible because she is an officer of the court. The Court will not award JAK monetary sanctions because Black Cat did not receive JAK’s meet-and-confer letter and therefore did not have an opportunity to provide further responses in response to the arguments made my JAK in this motion. Moreover, given the number of discovery responses at issue in this motion, the Court concludes that JAK should have attempted further meet and confer efforts. (Obregon v. Superior Court (1998) 67 Cal.App.4th 424, 431 (“The level of effort at informal resolution which satisfies the ‘reasonable and good faith attempt’ standard depends upon the circumstances. In a larger, more complex discovery context, a greater effort at informal resolution may be warranted.”).)

Conclusion

JAK’s motion to compel Black Cat to provide further responses and to produce documents is moot. JAK’s and Black Cat’s requests for monetary sanctions are denied.

related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where BLACK CAT FASHION INC. DBA DULCCI VETAN is a litigant