Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/29/2021 at 10:30:57 (UTC).

IVAN TORRES ET AL VS LOY PHAM M D ET AL

Case Summary

On 10/29/2013 IVAN TORRES filed a Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice lawsuit against LOY PHAM M D. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Norwalk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are GREGORY KEOSIAN and ROGER ITO. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****6032

  • Filing Date:

    10/29/2013

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Norwalk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

GREGORY KEOSIAN

ROGER ITO

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs, Petitioners and Guardian Ad Litems

LOPEZ VERONICA

VERONICA LOPEZ

IVAN TORRES INDIVIDUALLY

IVAN TORRES A MINOR BY AND THROUGH

Defendants and Respondents

DOES 1 TO 100

DOWNEY REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER

DRS. MISHAL BENDER AND OBGYN ASSOCIATES

LA FAMILIA & WOMEN'S MEDICAL CLINIC

PHAM LOY M.D.

LOY PHAM M.D.

DOWNEY REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER-HOSPITAL

Minor

TORRES IVAN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff, Petitioner and Minor Attorneys

MCMAHAN CARL A. ESQ.

MCMAHAN LAW

LAW MCMAHAN

Defendant and Respondent Attorneys

HEIM KRISTEN J. ESQ.

SCHMID & VOILES

FRASER WATSON & CROUTCH LLP

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES) -

10/29/2013: COMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES) -

SUMMONS

12/20/2013: SUMMONS

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -

1/22/2014: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -

1/22/2014: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

1/27/2014: PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION OF DEFENDANT DOWNEY REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF PLAINTIFFS? COMPLAINT; ETC.

2/11/2014: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION OF DEFENDANT DOWNEY REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF PLAINTIFFS? COMPLAINT; ETC.

NU1ICL IHAL 1?HI HEAKINU ON IFIL MOTION OF DEFENDANT DOWNEY REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF PLAINTIFFS? COMPLAINT HAS BEEN CONTINUED

4/4/2014: NU1ICL IHAL 1?HI HEAKINU ON IFIL MOTION OF DEFENDANT DOWNEY REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF PLAINTIFFS? COMPLAINT HAS BEEN CONTINUED

PLAINTIFFS? OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT?S MOTION TO STRIKE

7/2/2014: PLAINTIFFS? OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT?S MOTION TO STRIKE

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS

7/15/2014: NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS

Minute Order -

7/16/2014: Minute Order -

NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION OF DEFENDANT DOWNEY REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER TO STAY THE SUPERIOR COURT ACTION PENDING THE OUTCOME OF THE ARBITRATION BETWEEN PLAINTIFFS AND CODEFENDANTS LOY PHAM, M.D., AND

7/17/2014: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION OF DEFENDANT DOWNEY REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER TO STAY THE SUPERIOR COURT ACTION PENDING THE OUTCOME OF THE ARBITRATION BETWEEN PLAINTIFFS AND CODEFENDANTS LOY PHAM, M.D., AND

RULING RE: MOTION TO STRIKE BY DEFENDANT, DOWNEY REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER

7/18/2014: RULING RE: MOTION TO STRIKE BY DEFENDANT, DOWNEY REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER

NOTICE OF RULING

7/22/2014: NOTICE OF RULING

CIVIL DEPOSIT -

8/4/2014: CIVIL DEPOSIT -

COMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES) -

8/15/2014: COMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES) -

NOTICE OF HEARING ON DEMURRER; DEMURRER OF DEFENDANT DOWNEY REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER TO PLAINTIFFS' FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES

9/16/2014: NOTICE OF HEARING ON DEMURRER; DEMURRER OF DEFENDANT DOWNEY REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER TO PLAINTIFFS' FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES

PLAINTIFFS? OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT?S MOTION TO STAY SUPERIOR COURT ACTION PENDING OUTCOME OF ARBITRATION AND REQUEST TO SEVER NON ARBITRABLE CLAIMS

10/3/2014: PLAINTIFFS? OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT?S MOTION TO STAY SUPERIOR COURT ACTION PENDING OUTCOME OF ARBITRATION AND REQUEST TO SEVER NON ARBITRABLE CLAIMS

REPLY OF DEFENDANT DOWNEY REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER TO PLAINTIFFS' OPPOSITION TO DEFENDAN'?S MOTION TO STAY THE SUPERIOR COURT ACTION PENDING THE OUTCOME OF THE ARBITRATION BETWEEN PLAINTIFFS AND CO-DEF

10/9/2014: REPLY OF DEFENDANT DOWNEY REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER TO PLAINTIFFS' OPPOSITION TO DEFENDAN'?S MOTION TO STAY THE SUPERIOR COURT ACTION PENDING THE OUTCOME OF THE ARBITRATION BETWEEN PLAINTIFFS AND CO-DEF

16 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/13/2017
  • DocketMiscellaneous-Other; Filed by IVAN TORRES, a minor by and through (Plaintiff); VERONICA LOPEZ (Plaintiff); individually IVAN TORRES (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2017
  • Docketat 09:00 AM in Department K; (OSC RE RECEIPT; OSC Discharged) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2017
  • DocketReceipt and Acknowledgment of Order for the Deposit of Money Into Blocked Account; Filed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2017
  • DocketReceipt and Acknowledgment of Order for the Deposit of Money Into Blocked Account; Filed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2017
  • DocketMiscellaneous-Other

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2017
  • DocketMiscellaneous-Other

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2017
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department F; Unknown Event Type - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2017
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department K; Hearing on Petition to Confirm Minor's Compromise (Minor's Compromise; Pet Granted/Order Signed & Filed) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2017
  • DocketOrd-Deposit Minor's Funds

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2017
  • DocketOrd-Approving Compromise

    Read MoreRead Less
108 More Docket Entries
  • 12/20/2013
  • DocketSummons Issued; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2013
  • DocketOrd Apptng Guardian Ad Litem; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2013
  • DocketOrd Apptng Guardian Ad Litem (FOR IVAN TORRES ); Filed by Attorney for Pltf/Petnr

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2013
  • DocketApplication-Miscellaneous (FOR IVAN TORRES, A MINOR GUARDIAN AD LITEM ); Filed by Attorney for Pltf/Petnr

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2013
  • DocketApplication ; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2013
  • DocketAPPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEMCIV1L EX PARTE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2013
  • DocketCOMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2013
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2013
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by IVAN TORRES, a minor by and through (Plaintiff); VERONICA LOPEZ (Plaintiff); individually IVAN TORRES (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2013
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by IVAN TORRES, a minor by and through (Plaintiff); VERONICA LOPEZ (Plaintiff); individually IVAN TORRES (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where DOWNEY REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER is a litigant

Latest cases where DOWNEY REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER-HOSPITAL is a litigant