This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/08/2019 at 21:06:51 (UTC).

ISKANDER SABBAGH VS MOBIL OIL CO., ET AL

Case Summary

On 04/01/2015 ISKANDER SABBAGH filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against MOBIL OIL CO . This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Michael Antonovich Antelope Valley Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is RANDOLPH ROGERS. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****5361

  • Filing Date:

    04/01/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Michael Antonovich Antelope Valley Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

RANDOLPH ROGERS

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SABBAGH ISKANDER

Defendants

HAWATMEH HAYEL

MOBIL OIL CO.

DOES 1-25

HARRY'S MOBIL MINI MART

BEES LIGHTING

MART HARRY'S MOBIL MINI

LIGHTING BEES

Cross Defendant

SSTI GROUP

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

O REILLY STEVEN

O'REILLY STEVEN

Defendant Attorneys

HART JR. JAMES P.

FRIEDMAN WILLIAM L.

CARLSON VEATCH

Other Attorneys

SHAFRON SHELLY JAY

 

Court Documents

Declaration

3/28/2018: Declaration

OPPOSITION FOR SANCTIONS; MEMO OF POINTS AND AUTHORITES

4/4/2018: OPPOSITION FOR SANCTIONS; MEMO OF POINTS AND AUTHORITES

Reply

4/16/2018: Reply

MOTION IN LIMINE NO 5

4/17/2018: MOTION IN LIMINE NO 5

DECLARATION

4/17/2018: DECLARATION

ORDER APPOINTING COURT APPROVED REPORTER AS OFFICIAL PRO TEMPORE

4/25/2018: ORDER APPOINTING COURT APPROVED REPORTER AS OFFICIAL PRO TEMPORE

Exhibit List

6/5/2018: Exhibit List

Opposition

6/6/2018: Opposition

MOTION IN LIMINE NO.1 TO BAR THE TESTIMONY OF GERALD MOULIN

6/14/2018: MOTION IN LIMINE NO.1 TO BAR THE TESTIMONY OF GERALD MOULIN

Notice

6/21/2018: Notice

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

8/6/2015: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

SUMMONS

10/5/2015: SUMMONS

Minute Order

12/14/2015: Minute Order

EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL

8/28/2016: EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL

OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR SANCTIONS

1/19/2017: OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR SANCTIONS

PLAINTIFFS EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER SHORTENING TIME AND MOTION REQUESTING LEAVE OF COURT TO FILE A SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT

2/22/2017: PLAINTIFFS EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER SHORTENING TIME AND MOTION REQUESTING LEAVE OF COURT TO FILE A SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT

Opposition

9/8/2017: Opposition

Declaration

9/13/2017: Declaration

206 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/24/2018
  • at 08:30 AM in Department A15; Unknown Event Type - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2018
  • Request for Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2018
  • Request for Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2018
  • Request for Dismissal; Filed by ISKANDER SABBAGH (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2018
  • Request for Dismissal-Partial; Filed by MOBIL OIL CO. (Legacy Party); HAYEL HAWATMEH (Defendant); HARRY'S MOBIL MINI MART (Legacy Party)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2018
  • DECLARATION OF MACK A QUAN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2018
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2018
  • Request for Dismissal-Partial; Filed by ISKANDER SABBAGH (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2018
  • PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF PAYMENT OF WAIVED COURT FEES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2018
  • Notice of payment waived fees

    Read MoreRead Less
467 More Docket Entries
  • 04/01/2015
  • Notice of Case Assignment; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2015
  • Summons; Filed by ISKANDER SABBAGH (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2015
  • Complaint filed-Summons Issued; Filed by null

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2015
  • NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2015
  • NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2015
  • COMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2015
  • REQUEST TO WAIVE COURT FEES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2015
  • SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2015
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2015
  • ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER

    Read MoreRead Less

Complaint Information

TLED

JAMES P. HART, JR., ESQ. (Stags, B s SEROT SR AR LAW OFFICE OF CRAIG A. HOHEZm of Loy Angeley . []16 100 West Broadway, Suite 1150 : m 071 Glendale, California 91210 SEP 267016 harm it Carten: § soumivg ifioesClask Telephone: 818-539-2120 7 Lo

Facsimile: 877-613-3298 NORTHDBHSTRICT

Attorney for Attorney for Defendants and Cross-Complainants, HAYEL HAWATMEH dba HARRY'S MOBIL MINI MART; and MOBIL OIL CORPORATION, now known as ExxonMobil Oil Corporation (sued and served erroneously herein as Mobil Oil Co.)

SUPERIOR COURT OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA

COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES, NORTH DISTRICT — LANCASTER

[SKANDER SABBAGH, ) Case No.: MC025361 ) Assigned to: Hon. Randolph A. Rogers Plaintiff, ) Dept. “4-11" VS. )

)} [PROPOSED]| JUDGMENT ON

MOBIL OIL CO., HAYEL HAWATMEH dba ) OPERATIVE COMPLAINT OF HARRY’S MOBIL MINI MART, BEES ) PLAINTIFF IN FAVOR OF MOBIL OIL LIGHTING and DOES 1 TO 25, ) CORPORATION