This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 11/23/2018 at 20:48:16 (UTC).

ISAURA GARCIA, ET-AL VS. FORD MOTOR COMPANY, ET-AL

Case Summary

On 01/06/2011 ISAURA GARCIA, ET-AL filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against FORD MOTOR COMPANY, ET-AL. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Compton Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are RAFAEL A. ONGKEKO, GREGORY KEOSIAN, JOHN T. DOYLE, WILLIAM BARRY and LAURA C. ELLISON. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****4996

  • Filing Date:

    01/06/2011

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

RAFAEL A. ONGKEKO

GREGORY KEOSIAN

JOHN T. DOYLE

WILLIAM BARRY

LAURA C. ELLISON

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

GARCIA ISAURA

MARTIN ANTONIO

MORANDO CELIA

Defendants

CASA DE GONZALEZ

DOES 1 TO 100

FORD MOTOR COMPANY

GONZALES AUTOMOTIVE GROUP INC.

CASA DE GONZALES

GONZALES CASA DE

GONZALEZ CASA DE

Other

COMPTON SUPERIOR COURT

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

YU MICAHEL S. LAW OFFICES OF

YU MICHAEL S. LAW OFFICES OF

Defendant Attorneys

YUKEVICH CAVANAUGH

CAVANAUGH YUKEVICH

 

Court Documents

DECLARATION OF KENNETH TANJI, JR., RE: PLAINTIFFS? OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT?S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT, OR ALTERNATIVELY, SUMMARY ADJUDICATION

4/18/2013: DECLARATION OF KENNETH TANJI, JR., RE: PLAINTIFFS? OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT?S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT, OR ALTERNATIVELY, SUMMARY ADJUDICATION

DEFENDANT FORD MOTOR COMPANY?S REPLY TO PLAINTIFFS? OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT, OR ALTERNATIVELY, SUMMARY ADJUDICATION

4/26/2013: DEFENDANT FORD MOTOR COMPANY?S REPLY TO PLAINTIFFS? OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT, OR ALTERNATIVELY, SUMMARY ADJUDICATION

SUPPLEMENTAL DECLARATION OF VIJAY GUPTA RE: PLAINTIFFS? OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT?S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT, OR ALTERNATIVELY, SUMMARY ADJUDICATION

8/5/2013: SUPPLEMENTAL DECLARATION OF VIJAY GUPTA RE: PLAINTIFFS? OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT?S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT, OR ALTERNATIVELY, SUMMARY ADJUDICATION

DEFENDANT FORD MOTOR COMPANY?S MOTION IN LIMINE NO.3 TO PRECLUDE THE CONSUMER EXPECTIONS TEST; [PROPOSED] ORDER

8/9/2013: DEFENDANT FORD MOTOR COMPANY?S MOTION IN LIMINE NO.3 TO PRECLUDE THE CONSUMER EXPECTIONS TEST; [PROPOSED] ORDER

FORD MOTOR COMPANY?S MOTION IN LIM1NE NO. 6 TO LIMIT MEDICAL DAMAGES TO AMOUNTS ACTUALLY PAID; DECLARATION OF RAYMOND H HUA; (PROPOSED) ORDER

8/9/2013: FORD MOTOR COMPANY?S MOTION IN LIM1NE NO. 6 TO LIMIT MEDICAL DAMAGES TO AMOUNTS ACTUALLY PAID; DECLARATION OF RAYMOND H HUA; (PROPOSED) ORDER

DEFENDANT FORD MOTOR COMPANY?S MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 13 TO PRECLUDE EVIDENCE OF OR REFERENCE TO ANY DEFECT IN THE RIGHT REAR PASSENGER SEAT RESTRAINT SYSTEM OF THE SUBJECT VEHICLE; DECLARATION OF RAYMO

8/9/2013: DEFENDANT FORD MOTOR COMPANY?S MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 13 TO PRECLUDE EVIDENCE OF OR REFERENCE TO ANY DEFECT IN THE RIGHT REAR PASSENGER SEAT RESTRAINT SYSTEM OF THE SUBJECT VEHICLE; DECLARATION OF RAYMO

OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT?S MOTION TN LIMINE 1: RECALLS

8/21/2013: OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT?S MOTION TN LIMINE 1: RECALLS

OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT?S MOTION IN LIMINE 15: DR. VIJAY GUPTA DEFECT OPINIONS

8/21/2013: OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT?S MOTION IN LIMINE 15: DR. VIJAY GUPTA DEFECT OPINIONS

STIPULATION REGARDING DEFENDANT FORD MOTOR COMPANY?S MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 7 TO EXCLUDE EVIDENCE OF AND REFERENCE TO A FAILURE TO WARN; 44WF?9DI ORDER

8/21/2013: STIPULATION REGARDING DEFENDANT FORD MOTOR COMPANY?S MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 7 TO EXCLUDE EVIDENCE OF AND REFERENCE TO A FAILURE TO WARN; 44WF?9DI ORDER

OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT?S MOTION IN LIMINE 5: LAY OPINION TESTIMONY

8/21/2013: OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT?S MOTION IN LIMINE 5: LAY OPINION TESTIMONY

OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT?S MOTION IN LIMINE 11: PRETENSIONER

8/21/2013: OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT?S MOTION IN LIMINE 11: PRETENSIONER

REPLY BRIEF IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT FORD MOTOR COMPANY?S MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 3 TO PRECLUDE THE CONSUMER EXPECTATION TEST

8/27/2013: REPLY BRIEF IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT FORD MOTOR COMPANY?S MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 3 TO PRECLUDE THE CONSUMER EXPECTATION TEST

REPLY BRIEF IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT FORD MOTOR COMPANY?S MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 5 TO PRECLUDE IMPROPER LAY OPINION TESTIMONY

8/27/2013: REPLY BRIEF IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT FORD MOTOR COMPANY?S MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 5 TO PRECLUDE IMPROPER LAY OPINION TESTIMONY

REPLY BRIEF IN SUPPORT OF FORD MOTOR COMPANY?S MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 6 TO LIMIT MEDICAL DAMAGES TO AMOUNTS ACTUALLY PAID

8/27/2013: REPLY BRIEF IN SUPPORT OF FORD MOTOR COMPANY?S MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 6 TO LIMIT MEDICAL DAMAGES TO AMOUNTS ACTUALLY PAID

PARTIES? JOINT WITNESS LIST

8/30/2013: PARTIES? JOINT WITNESS LIST

Minute Order

9/4/2013: Minute Order

APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPEARANCE AND EXAMINATION

1/31/2014: APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPEARANCE AND EXAMINATION

Minute Order

3/7/2014: Minute Order

73 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/21/2014
  • Proof of Service (RE: APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPEARANCE AND EXAMINATION P/S: Isaura Garcia ); Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2014
  • Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2014
  • at 3:00 PM in Department A; Unknown Event Type - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2014
  • ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SATISFACTION OF JUDGEMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2014
  • Acknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment; Filed by Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2014
  • Acknowldgmt of Satisfaction of Jdg (FULL ); Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2014
  • Acknowldgmt of Satisfaction of Jdg ( FULL ); Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2014
  • Acknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment; Filed by Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2014
  • ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SATISFACTION OF JUDGEMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2014
  • ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SATISFACTION OF JUDGEMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
349 More Docket Entries
  • 01/11/2011
  • Proof-Service/Summons; Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2011
  • Proof-Service/Summons

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2011
  • Summons Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2011
  • Complaint; Filed by ISAURA GARCIA (Plaintiff); ANTONIO MARTIN (Plaintiff); CELIA MORANDO (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2011
  • Summons; Filed by null

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2011
  • Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2011
  • Notice-Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2011
  • Complaint Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/01/1900
  • at 08:32 AM in Department Legacy; Unknown event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/01/1900
  • at 08:32 AM in Department Legacy; Unknown event

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where GONZALES AUTOMOTIVE GROUP INC. DBA CASA DE GONZALES CHRYSLER JEEP is a litigant

Latest cases where Ford Motor Company is a litigant