This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/11/2018 at 08:48:00 (UTC).

ISABEL CASTILLO VS SUNNYVIEW CONVALESCENT EMPLOYER INC ET AL

Case Summary

On 04/08/2016 ISABEL CASTILLO filed a Labor - Wrongful Termination lawsuit against SUNNYVIEW CONVALESCENT EMPLOYER INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are SUZANNE G. BRUGUERA, HOLLY E. KENDIG and SAMANTHA P. JESSNER. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****6499

  • Filing Date:

    04/08/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Wrongful Termination

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

SUZANNE G. BRUGUERA

HOLLY E. KENDIG

SAMANTHA P. JESSNER

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

CASTILLO ISABEL

Defendants and Respondents

LONGWOOD MANAGEMENT CORP.

DOES 1 THROUGH 100

SUNNYVIEW CARE CENTER

JETS CYNTHIA

LONGWOOD ENTERPRISES INC.

SUNNYVIEW CONVALESCENT EMPLOYER INC.

YATTES CYNTHIA

LONGWOOD MANAGEMENT CORP

LONGWOOD ENTERPRISES INC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

LAW OFFICES OF MARYANN P. GALLAGHER

Defendant and Respondent Attorneys

ERICKSON ERIC J. ESQ.

MURCHISON & CUMMING LLP

 

Court Documents

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

5/19/2016: PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT

6/1/2016: AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT

Unknown

7/27/2016: Unknown

DEFENDANTS TAG-3 MEDICAL INVESTMENT GROUP, LLC DBA SUNNY VIEW CARE CENTER AND CYNTHIA YATES' REPLY IN SUPPORT OF ITS DEMURRER

8/23/2016: DEFENDANTS TAG-3 MEDICAL INVESTMENT GROUP, LLC DBA SUNNY VIEW CARE CENTER AND CYNTHIA YATES' REPLY IN SUPPORT OF ITS DEMURRER

DECLARATION OF KAREN ECCLESTON IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

9/29/2016: DECLARATION OF KAREN ECCLESTON IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

DECLARATION OF AMBER GOODEN IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

9/29/2016: DECLARATION OF AMBER GOODEN IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

11/30/2016: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

11/30/2016: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

11/30/2016: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO STRIKE COSTS AND IMPROPER REQUEST FOR ATTORNEY FEES; OR IN THE ALTERNATVIE TO TAX COSTS AND TO STRIKE IMPROPER REQUEST FOR ATTORNEYS FEES MEMORANDUM OF POINT

1/17/2017: PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO STRIKE COSTS AND IMPROPER REQUEST FOR ATTORNEY FEES; OR IN THE ALTERNATVIE TO TAX COSTS AND TO STRIKE IMPROPER REQUEST FOR ATTORNEYS FEES MEMORANDUM OF POINT

DECLARATION OF DREW B. ARESCA IN SUPPORT OF DEFENIANTS' OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO STRIKE COSTS AND ETC

1/31/2017: DECLARATION OF DREW B. ARESCA IN SUPPORT OF DEFENIANTS' OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO STRIKE COSTS AND ETC

MEMORANDUM OF COSTS (SUMMARY)

2/12/2017: MEMORANDUM OF COSTS (SUMMARY)

ORDER APPOINTING COURT APPROVED REPORTER AS OFFICIAL REPORTER PRO TEMPORE

2/14/2017: ORDER APPOINTING COURT APPROVED REPORTER AS OFFICIAL REPORTER PRO TEMPORE

ORDER ON PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO STRIKE AND TAX DEFENDANTS SUNNYVIEW CONVALESCENT HOSPITAL, INC., LONGWOOD MANAGEMENT CORP., AND LONGWOOD ENTERPRISES, INC. MEMORANDUM OF COSTS

3/24/2017: ORDER ON PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO STRIKE AND TAX DEFENDANTS SUNNYVIEW CONVALESCENT HOSPITAL, INC., LONGWOOD MANAGEMENT CORP., AND LONGWOOD ENTERPRISES, INC. MEMORANDUM OF COSTS

Minute Order

4/7/2017: Minute Order

PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION TO DEFNEDANT'S MOTION FOR ATTORNEY'S FEES; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES; DECLARATION OF MARYANN P. GALLAGHER

4/13/2017: PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION TO DEFNEDANT'S MOTION FOR ATTORNEY'S FEES; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES; DECLARATION OF MARYANN P. GALLAGHER

SUR-REPLY OF PLAINTIFF IN SUPPORT OF OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR SANCTIONS PURSUANT TO CCP 128.5

8/1/2017: SUR-REPLY OF PLAINTIFF IN SUPPORT OF OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR SANCTIONS PURSUANT TO CCP 128.5

ORDER RE: DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR SANCTIONS PURSUANT TO CODE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE SECTION 128.5 AGAINST PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL IN THE AMOUNT OF $51,812.00

8/2/2017: ORDER RE: DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR SANCTIONS PURSUANT TO CODE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE SECTION 128.5 AGAINST PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL IN THE AMOUNT OF $51,812.00

62 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/14/2017
  • Notice of Ruling; Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2017
  • at 08:31 am in Department 31, Samantha P. Jessner, Presiding; Motion for Sanctions - Denied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2017
  • Order (RE DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR SANCTIONS PURSUANT TO CCP SECTION 128.5 AGAINST PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL IN THE AMOUNT OF $51,812.00 ); Filed by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2017
  • Ord-Appt Apprv Rptr as Rptr protem (KERI A. LOGAN CSR #12608 ); Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2017
  • Reply/Response (SUR ); Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2017
  • Reply to Motion; Filed by Attorney for Defendant/Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2017
  • Opposition Document; Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2017
  • Declaration; Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2017
  • Supplemental Declaration; Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2017
  • Motion for Sanctions; Filed by Attorney for Defendant/Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
43 More Docket Entries
  • 06/02/2016
  • Answer; Filed by Attorney for Defendant/Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2016
  • CCP 170.6 Application Filed; Filed by Attorney for Defendant/Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2016
  • Amendment to Complaint (AT TO CYNTHIA YATTES ); Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2016
  • Proof of Service; Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2016
  • Proof of Service; Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2016
  • Notice-Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2016
  • First Amended Complaint; Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2016
  • at 08:30 am in Department 42, Holly E. Kendig, Presiding; Affidavit of Prejudice - Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2016
  • Affidavit of Prejudice--Peremptory (170.6 ); Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2016
  • Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less