This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 12/01/2020 at 22:28:28 (UTC).

IRMA LUJAN VS DR PEDRO GONZALEZ P A C ET AL

Case Summary

On 09/16/2008 IRMA LUJAN filed a Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice lawsuit against DR PEDRO GONZALEZ P A C. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****8282

  • Filing Date:

    09/16/2008

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LUJAN IRMA

Defendants

GONZALEZ PEDRO DR. A.P.C.

HOMEBOY INDUSTRIES

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

HEWITT & TRUSZKOWSKI

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

10/05/2009

Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 78; Jury Trial (Jury Trial; Vacated) -

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/22/2009

Docketat 09:30 AM in Department 78; Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/31/2009

DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Defendant/Respondent

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/31/2009

DocketREQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/14/2009

DocketNOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF HEARING ON MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/14/2009

DocketNotice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by Pedro, Dr. A.P.C. Gonzalez (Defendant)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/08/2009

Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 78; Post-Mediation Status Conference - Held

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/08/2009

DocketMinute Order

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/02/2009

DocketSTATEMENT OF AGREEMENT OR NONAGREEMENT

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/02/2009

DocketStatement-Non-Agreement; Filed by Mediator

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
28 More Docket Entries
11/17/2008

DocketMinute Order

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/22/2008

DocketMiscellaneous-Other; Filed by Defendant/Respondent

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/22/2008

DocketAnswer; Filed by Defendant/Respondent

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/22/2008

DocketDEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/22/2008

DocketANSWER TO COMPLAINT

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/18/2008

DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/18/2008

DocketOSC-Failure to File Proof of Serv; Filed by Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/16/2008

DocketComplaint; Filed by Irma Lujan (Plaintiff)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/16/2008

DocketSUMMONS

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/16/2008

DocketCOMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less