This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/30/2019 at 01:00:58 (UTC).

IRENE HANSON VS AL AGUIRRE

Case Summary

On 09/29/2016 IRENE HANSON filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against AL AGUIRRE. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Pomona Courthouse South located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is PETER A. HERNANDEZ. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****8764

  • Filing Date:

    09/29/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Pomona Courthouse South

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

PETER A. HERNANDEZ

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Appellant

HANSON IRENE

Defendants and Respondents

AGUIRRE AL

A.A. & ASSOCIATES INC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

BORENSTEIN PETER

BORENSTEIN PETER HILLER

 

Court Documents

Summons

9/29/2016: Summons

Civil Case Cover Sheet

9/29/2016: Civil Case Cover Sheet

General Denial

10/28/2016: General Denial

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

3/9/2017: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

3/23/2017: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Other -

6/29/2017: Other -

Minute Order

6/29/2017: Minute Order

Minute Order

12/14/2017: Minute Order

Unknown

12/21/2017: Unknown

Proof of Service by Mail

12/21/2017: Proof of Service by Mail

Unknown

1/26/2018: Unknown

Minute Order

4/4/2018: Minute Order

Proof of Service by Mail

1/10/2019: Proof of Service by Mail

Unknown

2/27/2019: Unknown

Minute Order

3/14/2019: Minute Order

Opposition

4/5/2019: Opposition

Declaration

4/5/2019: Declaration

Unknown

4/5/2019: Unknown

56 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/17/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department O, Peter A. Hernandez, Presiding; Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Party

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2019
  • at 09:00 AM in Department O, Peter A. Hernandez, Presiding; Ex-Parte Proceedings (Ex Parte Application for Stay of Trial Court Proceedings Pending Appeal (CCP 916)) - Held - Motion Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2019
  • Minute Order ( (Plaintiff's Ex Parte Application for Stay of Trial Court Proc...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2019
  • Order (Proposed Order Granting Plaintiff's Ex Parte Application); Filed by IRENE HANSON (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2019
  • Notice (of Non-Opposition to Ex Parte Application for Stay of Court Proceedings Pending Appeal); Filed by AL AGUIRRE (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2019
  • Ex Parte Application (Ex Parte Application for Stay of Trial Court Proceedings Pending Appeal (CCP 916)); Filed by IRENE HANSON (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2019
  • Appeal - Ntc Designating Record of Appeal APP-003/010/103; Filed by IRENE HANSON (Appellant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2019
  • Proof of Service by Mail; Filed by AL AGUIRRE (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2019
  • Separate Statement; Filed by AL AGUIRRE (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2019
  • Declaration (of Al Aguirre in Support of Opposition to Motion for Summary Judgment); Filed by AL AGUIRRE (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
69 More Docket Entries
  • 02/22/2017
  • at 08:30 AM in Department O; Case Management Conference (Conference-Case Management; Trial Set-No MSC) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2017
  • Minute Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2017
  • Case Management Statement; Filed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2016
  • General Denial; Filed by AL AGUIRRE (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2016
  • Rtn of Service of Summons & Compl

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2016
  • Rtn of Service of Summons & Compl

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2016
  • Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2016
  • Summons (on Complaint)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2016
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by IRENE HANSON (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2016
  • Complaint; Filed by IRENE HANSON (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: KC068764    Hearing Date: October 26, 2020    Dept: O

Plaintiff Irene Hanson’s Motion to Compel Responses to Special Interrogatories, Set Four, is GRANTED. Sanctions are awarded in the amount of $960.00.

Plaintiff Irene Hanson (“Plaintiff”) moves the court for an order requiring Defendant Al Aguirre (“Defendant”) to provide verified responses to the Special Interrogatories (set 4). Plaintiff also seeks monetary sanctions of $960.00.

Code of Civil Procedure section 2030.290(b) allows the propounding party to file a motion to compel responses to interrogatories if a response has not been received. If responses are untimely, responding party waives objections. (CCP § 2030.290(a).) Sections 2023.010(d) and 2030.290(c) authorize the court to impose sanctions for failure to respond to discovery without substantial justification.

On April 7, 2020, Plaintiff served her Special Interrogatories, Set Four, on Defendant. (Borenstein Decl., ¶¶ 2, Ex. A.) Neither Defendant nor his counsel have requested additional time in which to provide responses nor served Plaintiff with any responses to the subject discovery. (Id., ¶¶ 3-4.) The Court also did not receive an opposition from Defendant and, presumably, Plaintiff still has not received responses from Defendant.

This motion, then, is granted. Sanctions are awarded in the requested amount of $960.00.