This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 12/22/2021 at 14:21:13 (UTC).

INTERSCOPE RECORDS VS BAHJA RODRIGUEZ ET AL

Case Summary

On 03/08/2012 INTERSCOPE RECORDS filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against BAHJA RODRIGUEZ. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are GORDON, SCOTT M and GORDON, SCOTT M.. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****0436

  • Filing Date:

    03/08/2012

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

GORDON, SCOTT M

GORDON, SCOTT M.

 

Party Details

Petitioner

INTERSCOPE RECORDS A DIV. OF UMG

Respondents

WOMACK BREAUNNA

RODRIGUEZ BAHJA

PULLINS ZONNIQUE

Guardian Ad Litems

GOUBIL REGIN

RODRIGUEZ SHAMRA

HARRIS TAMEKA COTTLE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

HILDERLEY SUSAN HEATHER

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/19/2012
  • Docketat 8:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Dept. - 2, Gordon, Scott M., Presiding; Non-Appearance Case Review - Held - Order Made

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2012
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2012
  • DocketStipulation and Order (STIPULATED ORDER SUBSTITUTING TRUS TEE, BEVERLY ADAMS, FOR SHAMRA ROD RIGUEZ, FOR A MINOR, BAHJA RODRIGU ES, FOR CONTRACT OF MINOR )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2012
  • Docketat 8:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Dept. - 2, Gordon, Scott M., Presiding; Non-Appearance Case Review - Held - Order Made

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2012
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2012
  • DocketStipulation and Order (Sitpulated Order Substituting Trus tee, Beverly Adams, for Shamra Rod riguez, for a minor, Bahja Rodrigu ez, for Contract of Minor - Denied on 2012-08-30 )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2012
  • Docketat 8:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Dept. - 2, Gordon, Scott M., Presiding; Minor's Contract Hearing - Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2012
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2012
  • DocketOrder - Approving Compromise of Claim

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2012
  • DocketPetition - Minor's Contract (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Interscope Records, A Div. of UMG ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where INTERSCOPE RECORDS A DIVISON OF UMG RECORDINGS INC AND TRAP ILLUSTRATED LLC is a litigant