This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/23/2019 at 08:15:31 (UTC).

INTERINSURANCE EXCHANGE OF THE AUTOMOBILE CLUB VS KINGSLEY C

Case Summary

On 03/11/2016 INTERINSURANCE EXCHANGE OF THE AUTOMOBILE CLUB filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against KINGSLEY C. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is JON R. TAKASUGI. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****3585

  • Filing Date:

    03/11/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

JON R. TAKASUGI

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

INTERINSURANCE EXCHANGE OF THE AUTOMOBILE

Defendants and Respondents

ONYEKWERE KINGSLEY C.

DOES 1 THROUGH 10

ONYEKWERE KINGSLEY C. DEFAULT JUDGMENT

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorneys

RICHARDSON FAIR & COHEN

MCCLAIN DEBORAH LORRAINE

Defendant Attorney

UDEOZOR BENARD CHIZORA

 

Court Documents

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT

12/5/2017: REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT

Minute Order

3/26/2018: Minute Order

DECLARATION N LIEU OF TESTIMONY OF CHP OFFICER C. DEHAVEN I.D.NO. 020140

6/26/2018: DECLARATION N LIEU OF TESTIMONY OF CHP OFFICER C. DEHAVEN I.D.NO. 020140

JUDGMENT/COURT AFT DEFAULT

6/26/2018: JUDGMENT/COURT AFT DEFAULT

Unknown

6/26/2018: Unknown

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

6/26/2018: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT

6/26/2018: REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT

PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL OF JUDGMENT ENTERED ON 06/26/2018

9/5/2018: PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL OF JUDGMENT ENTERED ON 06/26/2018

Motion to Set Aside/Vacate Dismissal

11/5/2018: Motion to Set Aside/Vacate Dismissal

Opposition

12/4/2018: Opposition

Notice

12/5/2018: Notice

Stipulation

12/5/2018: Stipulation

Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore

12/24/2018: Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore

Minute Order

12/24/2018: Minute Order

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

6/22/2016: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT

5/26/2017: REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT

Minute Order

8/25/2017: Minute Order

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

11/2/2017: PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

17 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/10/2019
  • Notice (Notice of Final Status Conference and Trial); Filed by Interinsurance Exchange of the Automobile (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2018
  • Answer; Filed by Kingsley C. (Default Judgment) Onyekwere (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/24/2018
  • at 1:30 PM in Department 3, Jon R. Takasugi, Presiding; Hearing on Motion to Set Aside/Vacate Default and Default Judgment (CCP 473.5) - Held - Motion Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/24/2018
  • Minute Order ((Hearing on Motion to Set Aside/Vacate Default and Default Jud...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/24/2018
  • Order (By the Court granting Motion for Reconsideration); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/24/2018
  • Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore ((Grace Chung #6246))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/24/2018
  • Order (By the Court granting Motion to Vacate Default and Default Judgment-Court sets dates); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2018
  • Stipulation - No Order (Setting Aside Default and Default Judgment); Filed by Interinsurance Exchange of the Automobile (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2018
  • Plaintiff's Notice of Non-Opposition to Defendant's Motion and Stipulation to Set Aside the Default and Default Judgment, Deem Answer Filed, and Request to Return Matter to Civil Active List; Filed by Interinsurance Exchange of the Automobile (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2018
  • Opposition (Plaintifff's Notice of Non-Opposition to Defendant's Motion and Stipulation to Set Aside the Default and Default Judgment, Deem Answer Filed, and Request to Return Matter to Civil Active List); Filed by Interinsurance Exchange of the Automobile (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
35 More Docket Entries
  • 08/25/2017
  • Minute order entered: 2017-08-25 00:00:00; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2017
  • First Amended Complaint; Filed by Interinsurance Exchange of the Automobile (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2017
  • 1S AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR SUBROGATION RECOVERY (DEMAND S45,814.40)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2017
  • Default Entered; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2017
  • REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2016
  • Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by Interinsurance Exchange of the Automobile (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2016
  • PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2016
  • COMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2016
  • Complaint; Filed by Interinsurance Exchange of the Automobile (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2016
  • SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: BC613585    Hearing Date: January 21, 2020    Dept: 31

SUPERIOR COURT OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA

FOR THE COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES - CENTRAL DISTRICT

INTERINSURANCE EXCHANGE OF THE AUTO CLUB,

Plaintiff(s),

vs.

KINGSLEY C. ONYEKWERE, et al.,

Defendant(s).

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

Case No.: BC613585

[TENTATIVE] ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL

Dept. 3

1:30 p.m.

January 21, 2020

Defendant’s attorney of record, Benard C. Udeozor, seeks to be relieved as counsel, contending the attorney-client relationship has broken down such that further representation is not possible. Counsel declares he served the moving papers on his client via mail at a confirmed address. Counsel has filed proof of service on his client and on all other parties who have appeared in the action.

The motion is unopposed and granted; the ruling is effective upon filing proof of service of the final order. The Court notes that trial is not scheduled until 3/24/20 and therefore there will be no prejudice to Plaintiff as a result of the granting of this motion.

Counsel is ordered to give notice.

Parties who intend to submit on this tentative must send an email to the court at sscdept3@lacourt.org indicating intention to submit on the tentative as directed by the instructions provided on the court website at www.lacourt.org.  If the department does not receive an email indicating the parties are submitting on the tentative and there are no appearances at the hearing, the motion may be placed off calendar. If a party submits on the tentative, the party’s email must include the case number and must identify the party submitting on the tentative.