This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/12/2019 at 01:50:18 (UTC).

INTERINSURANCE EXCHANGE OF THE AUTOCLUB VS MARCEL SHERWOOD W

Case Summary

On 10/14/2016 INTERINSURANCE EXCHANGE OF THE AUTOCLUB filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against MARCEL SHERWOOD W. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are GEORGINA T. RIZK and PATRICIA D. NIETO. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****7100

  • Filing Date:

    10/14/2016

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

GEORGINA T. RIZK

PATRICIA D. NIETO

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

INTERINSURANCE EXCHANGE OF THE AUTO CLUB

Defendants and Respondents

DOES 1 TO 100

WISE MARCEL SHERWOOD

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

MENDELSON LEE M. ESQ.

 

Court Documents

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT

4/26/2018: REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT

1/26/2018: REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT

NOTICE RE: CONTINUANCE OF HEARING

3/6/2018: NOTICE RE: CONTINUANCE OF HEARING

Minute Order

4/3/2018: Minute Order

Minute Order

4/27/2018: Minute Order

Minute Order

8/2/2018: Minute Order

SUMMONS

10/14/2016: SUMMONS

COMPLAINT FOR MONEY 1. SUBROGATION CLAIM; ETC

10/14/2016: COMPLAINT FOR MONEY 1. SUBROGATION CLAIM; ETC

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

11/14/2016: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT

2/2/2017: REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT

FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR MONEY 1. SUBROGATION CLAIM 2. INDEBTEDNESS

8/2/2017: FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR MONEY 1. SUBROGATION CLAIM 2. INDEBTEDNESS

NOTICE RE: CONTINUANCE OF HEARING

10/12/2017: NOTICE RE: CONTINUANCE OF HEARING

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

10/19/2017: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/02/2018
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 2; (OSC-Failure to File Default Judg; Continued by Court) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2018
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2018
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 2; Jury Trial (Jury Trial; Court makes order) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2018
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2018
  • REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2018
  • Default Entered; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2018
  • at 10:00 AM in Department 91; Final Status Conference (Final Status Conference; Off Calendar) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2018
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2018
  • NOTICE RE: CONTINUANCE OF HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2018
  • Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 08/02/2017
  • First Amended Complaint; Filed by Interinsurance Exchange of the Auto Club (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2017
  • FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR MONEY 1. SUBROGATION CLAIM 2. INDEBTEDNESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2017
  • Default Entered; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2017
  • REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2016
  • PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2016
  • Proof-Service/Summons; Filed by Interinsurance Exchange of the Auto Club (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2016
  • Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2016
  • COMPLAINT FOR MONEY 1. SUBROGATION CLAIM; ETC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2016
  • SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2016
  • Complaint; Filed by Interinsurance Exchange of the Auto Club (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: BC637100    Hearing Date: February 03, 2020    Dept: 29

Interinsurance Exchange of the Autoclub v. Wise

Plaintiff’s Motion for Order Vacating Entry of Dismissal is GRANTED. The dismissal entered on 8/27/19 is vacated.

A motion for an order to vacate a dismissal must be filed within six months of the dismissal and show grounds of mistake, inadvertence, surprise, and excusable neglect. Cal Code Civil Procedure § 473(b).  Here, the motion is timely made and a sufficient showing of mistake has been presented and the Court thus grants the motion. Flores v. Board of Supervisors (1970) 13 Cal. App. 3d 480, 483.

Plaintiff is ordered to file its default judgment package by 3/2/2020. If the package if not submitted, the Court will set an OSC re dismissal for failure to prosecute for 3/20/2020.