This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 03/19/2016 at 13:44:11 (UTC).

INTERGRADED SECURITY MANAGEMENT GROUP VS LENNOX UNIFIED

Case Summary

On 11/24/2014 INTERGRADED SECURITY MANAGEMENT GROUP filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against LENNOX UNIFIED. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Torrance Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is STUART M. RICE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****0247

  • Filing Date:

    11/24/2014

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Torrance Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

STUART M. RICE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

INTERGRADED SECURITY MANAGEMENT GROUP

Defendants

EMERGENCY PREPAREDNESS GROUP INC.

LENNOX UNIFIED SCHOOL DISTRICT

ORTEGA JOHN CEO

JOHN ORTEGA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

LESLIE L. WILXOC

INTERGRADED SECURITY MANAGEMENT GROUP

Defendant Attorneys

ATKINSON ANDELSON LOYA RUUD & ROMO

LAW OFFICES OF SERGIO A. WHITE

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/15/2015
  • Notice of Ruling Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2015
  • Statement-Case Management Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2015
  • Statement-Case Management Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2015
  • Notice of Change of Address Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2015
  • Proof of Service Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2015
  • Answer to First Amended Complaint Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2015
  • Answer to First Amended Complaint Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2015
  • First Amended Complaint Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2015
  • Notice of Ruling (RE DEMURRER AND CMC ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2015
  • Reply (IN SUPPORT OF DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 04/17/2015
  • Statement-Case Management Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2015
  • Notice of Hearing on Demurrer Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2014
  • Proof of Service (OF ANSWER ) Filed by Defendant, & Defendant in Pro Per

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2014
  • Answer to Complaint Filed Filed by Defendant, & Defendant in Pro Per

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2014
  • Rtn of Service of Summons & Compl (SUB-SERVED THEN MAILED 12/17/14 ) Filed by Plaintiff in Pro Per

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2014
  • Proof-Service/Summons (PTY SERVED; JOHN ORTEGA, CEO ) Filed by Plaintiff, & Plaintiff in Pro Per

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2014
  • Proof-Service/Summons (PTY SERVED: EMERGENCY PARPAREDNESS GROUP, INC. PERSON SERVED: JOHN ORTEGA, PERSON AUTH TO ACCEPT ) Filed by Plaintiff, & Plaintiff in Pro Per

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2014
  • Complaint Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2014
  • Notice-Case Management Conference Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2014
  • Summons Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Lennox Unified School District is a litigant