This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/05/2021 at 17:19:15 (UTC).

INHALE SOLUTIONS, INC VS. KATHERINE BRYAN

Case Summary

On 10/01/2009 INHALE SOLUTIONS, INC filed an Other - Injunction lawsuit against KATHERINE BRYAN. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Governor George Deukmejian Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are PATRICK T. MADDEN, MICHAEL P. VICENCIA, ROSS KLEIN, JOSEPH E. DILORETO and MARK C. KIM. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****3600

  • Filing Date:

    10/01/2009

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Injunction

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Governor George Deukmejian Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

PATRICK T. MADDEN

MICHAEL P. VICENCIA

ROSS KLEIN

JOSEPH E. DILORETO

MARK C. KIM

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Cross Defendant

INHALE SOLUTIONS INC

Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

KATHERINE BRYAN

DOES 1 TO 10

KB2 CONSULTING LLC

KRISTIE BRYAN

BRYAN KATHERINE

DRACUP & PATTERSON A LAW CORP

BRYAN KRISTIE

Cross Defendants

MARY MEGAN WILLER

KAREN WILLER

INHALE SOLUTIONS INC

DOES 11 THORUGH 50

MATTHEW D WILLER

MEMCOM PERIPHERALS INC

WILLER KAREN

WILLER MARY MEGAN

WILLER MATTHEW D

Not Classified By Court

JOSEFSBERG HENRY J.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Cross Defendant and Plaintiff Attorneys

FERNANDEZ & FERNANDEZ ALP

GLENN R. LEWIS

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorney

DRACUP & PATTERSON A LAW CORP

 

Court Documents

Memorandum of Costs After Judgment, Acknowledgment of Credit, and Declaration of Accrued Interest

5/15/2020: Memorandum of Costs After Judgment, Acknowledgment of Credit, and Declaration of Accrued Interest

Motion to Tax Costs

5/19/2020: Motion to Tax Costs

Memorandum of Costs After Judgment, Acknowledgment of Credit, and Declaration of Accrued Interest - MEMORANDUM OF COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT, ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF CREDIT, AND DECLARATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST AM

6/2/2020: Memorandum of Costs After Judgment, Acknowledgment of Credit, and Declaration of Accrued Interest - MEMORANDUM OF COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT, ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF CREDIT, AND DECLARATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST AM

Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

6/30/2020: Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6)

7/16/2020: Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 07/17/2020

7/17/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 07/17/2020

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

7/17/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

9/3/2020: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Order - ORDER STRIKING STATEMENT OF DISQUALIFICATION; VERIFIED ANSWER

9/18/2020: Order - ORDER STRIKING STATEMENT OF DISQUALIFICATION; VERIFIED ANSWER

Request - REQUEST FOR DISQUALIFYING JUDGE

9/28/2020: Request - REQUEST FOR DISQUALIFYING JUDGE

Notice - NOTICE OF ORDER STRIKING STATEMENT

9/28/2020: Notice - NOTICE OF ORDER STRIKING STATEMENT

Order - ORDER STRIKING SECOND STATEMENT OF DISQUALIFICATION; VERIFIED ANSWER

9/29/2020: Order - ORDER STRIKING SECOND STATEMENT OF DISQUALIFICATION; VERIFIED ANSWER

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [ORDER STRIKING SECOND STATEMENT OF DISQUALIFICATION; VERIFIED ANSWER]

9/29/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [ORDER STRIKING SECOND STATEMENT OF DISQUALIFICATION; VERIFIED ANSWER]

Request for Judicial Notice

11/16/2020: Request for Judicial Notice

Other - - TENTATIVE RULING AND ORDER

12/1/2020: Other - - TENTATIVE RULING AND ORDER

Declaration -

7/16/2018: Declaration -

Other - - Supplemental Memorandum

7/16/2018: Other - - Supplemental Memorandum

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) -

7/16/2018: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) -

30 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/01/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department S27, Mark C. Kim, Presiding; Hearing on Motion to Tax Costs (of Cross Defendants Inhale Solutions, Inc. and Mattew Willer because Said Amounts Claimed for Items 1(a)(7) and 1(b) are Excessive as Item 1(a)(7) are Not Previously Allowed as to Item 1(b) and Prohibited by Statute) - Held - Motion Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2020
  • DocketOrder Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore ((Connie Silva, CSR: 11460)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Tax Costs of Cross Defendants Inhale Sol...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Hearing on Motion to Tax Costs of Cross Defendants Inhale Sol...) of 12/01/2020); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2020
  • DocketTentative Ruling and Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2020
  • DocketOpposition (motion to tax or strike costs); Filed by KATHERINE BRYAN (Legacy Party); KRISTIE BRYAN (Legacy Party)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2020
  • DocketRequest for Judicial Notice; Filed by KATHERINE BRYAN (Legacy Party); KRISTIE BRYAN (Legacy Party)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2020
  • DocketNotice (of lodgment of exhibits); Filed by KATHERINE BRYAN (Legacy Party); KRISTIE BRYAN (Legacy Party)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2020
  • DocketProof of Service by Mail; Filed by MATTHEW D WILLER (Cross-Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([Order Striking Second Statement of Disqualification; Verified Answer]); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
232 More Docket Entries
  • 10/06/2009
  • DocketDeclaration; Filed by INHALE SOLUTIONS, INC (Legacy Party)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2009
  • DocketMinute order entered: 2009-10-06 00:00:00; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2009
  • DocketDeclaration; Filed by INHALE SOLUTIONS, INC (Legacy Party)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2009
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department B; Ex-Parte Proceedings (Ex Parte Application; Matter is continued) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2009
  • DocketOrder

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2009
  • DocketMinute order entered: 2009-10-05 00:00:00; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2009
  • DocketDeclaration; Filed by INHALE SOLUTIONS, INC (Legacy Party)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2009
  • DocketEx-Parte Application; Filed by INHALE SOLUTIONS, INC (Legacy Party)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2009
  • DocketSummons; Filed by INHALE SOLUTIONS, INC (Legacy Party)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2009
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by null

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: NC053600    Hearing Date: December 01, 2020    Dept: S27

Cross-Complainants secured a judgment against Cross-Defendant in 2012. On 4/19/18, Cross-Complainants filed a memorandum of costs pursuant to which they sought to recover attorneys’ fees and costs in the amount of $87,045. The Court, on 9/19/18, found Cross-Complainants were entitled to recover attorneys’ fees incurred post-judgment, and found their attorneys’ claimed rates reasonable. The Court found many of the fees were unreasonable in nature and amount, and reduced the fees to $17,500.

On 5/15/20, Cross-Complainants filed a memorandum of costs after judgment, acknowledgment of credit, and declaration of accrued interest. The memorandum indicates prior allowed costs were in the amount of $187,034.50, and seeks an award of $77,533.35 in attorneys’ fees incurred between 3/02/16 and 4/14/18.

On 5/19/20, Cross-Defendant filed a motion to tax costs, correctly noting that (a) the Court did not previously award costs in the amount indicated on the memorandum, and (b) all of the attorneys’ fees claimed by way of the memorandum were the subject of the motion decided on 9/19/18.

On 6/02/20, in response to the motion, Cross-Complainants filed a corrected memorandum of costs. In their corrected memorandum, they indicate they are seeking to recover $35,331.02 in attorneys’ fees incurred between 10/2018 and 04/2020.

The motion to tax costs is directed at the 5/15/20 memorandum, and is granted. It is granted because Cross-Complainants concede the costs claimed in the memorandum are not proper.

The Court is making no ruling on the 6/02/20 memorandum of costs, as Cross-Defendant has not filed a motion to tax those costs. The Court’s JA will process the 6/02/20 memorandum per the Rules of Court.

Cross-Defendant is ordered to give notice.

Parties who intend to submit on this tentative must send an email to the court at gdcdepts27@lacourt.org indicating intention to submit on the tentative as directed by the instructions provided on the court website at www.lacourt.org.  If the department does not receive an email indicating the parties are submitting on the tentative and there are no appearances at the hearing, the motion may be placed off calendar. If a party submits on the tentative, the party’s email must include the case number and must identify the party submitting on the tentative. If the parties do not submit on the tentative, they should arrange to appear remotely.