Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/23/2019 at 09:59:51 (UTC).

IN THE MATTER OF 716 VENTURA STREET, ALTADENA, CA 91001

Case Summary

On 05/15/2015 IN THE MATTER OF 716 VENTURA STREET, ALTADENA, CA 91001 was filed as an Other lawsuit. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Burbank Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are WILLIAM D. STEWART and DONNA FIELDS GOLDSTEIN. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****9308

  • Filing Date:

    05/15/2015

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Burbank Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

WILLIAM D. STEWART

DONNA FIELDS GOLDSTEIN

 

Party Details

Petitioner

716 VENTURA STREET ALTADENA CA 91001

Defendants

WILLIAMS THERESA

WILLIAMS HORACE III

Respondent

WILLIAMS HORACE JR.

Not Classified By Court

SUTHERLAND HORTENCE

SUTHERLUND THOMAS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

ZIEVE LES LAW OFFICES OF

Defendant and Respondent Attorney

JOSEPH L. DE CLUE ATTY.

Other Attorneys

LAW OFFICES OF THOMAS E. THAXTER

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/15/2015
  • Order; Filed by Hortence Sutherland (Legacy Party); Thomas Sutherlund (Legacy Party)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2015
  • Notice; Filed by Hortence Sutherland (Legacy Party); Thomas Sutherlund (Legacy Party)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2015
  • at 08:30 AM in Department B; Unknown Event Type - Held - Motion Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2015
  • Opposition; Filed by Horace Jr. Williams (Respondent); Horace III Williams (Defendant); Theresa Williams (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2015
  • Notice of Related Case; Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2015
  • at 08:30 AM in Department A; Court Order - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2015
  • at 08:30 AM in Department A; Non-Appearance Case Review (Non-Appearance (Case Review); Matter Placed Off Calendar) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2015
  • Notice; Filed by Hortence Sutherland (Legacy Party)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2015
  • Notice; Filed by Thomas Sutherlund (Legacy Party)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2015
  • at 08:30 AM in Department A; Court Order - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2015
  • Order; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2015
  • Petition; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: ES019308    Hearing Date: November 25, 2020    Dept: A

The Superior Court is open under “Here for You | Safe for You” Conditions and Orders

Counsel are urged to use remote appearance technology LACourtConnect

If it is indispensable for counsel to be present in court, face masks (without a valve) are mandated (unless a court orders otherwise) and social distancing rules are in force.

Dept. A Burbank protocol for LACourtConnect Appearances.

Video Appearances: Since these are the functional equivalent of a personal appearance in court, no special protocols are in place at this time.

Audio Only Appearances.

  1. Argument is limited to three minutes, unless the court grants a request for additional time.

  2. The reading of argument is feckless and nugatory.

  3. State your name at the beginning of all statements.

  4. Do not speak directly to other counsel without permission of court.

  5. Do not interrupt or attempt to speak over another speaker.

  6. Do not announce your presence until called by your name or case name.

  7. Take a deep breath frequently so that the court may interrupt your presentation, if necessary. (The system does not default to the court unless you are placed on mute by the court or go silent or mute on you own.)

  8. Maintain silence in your surroundings – no keyboarding, dogs barking, children crying, etc.

716Ventura Street

Motion for Related Cases

Calendar:

14

Case No.:

ES019308

Hearing Date:

November 25, 2020

Action Filed:

May 15, 2015

Trial Date:

No Trial

MP:

Respondent Theresa Williams

RP:

N/A

ALLEGATIONS:

716 Ventura Street, Altadena, CA 91001 ("Petitioner") filed a Petition and Declaration Regarding Unresolved Claims and Deposit of Undistributed Surplus Proceeds of Trustee's SAle on May 15, 2015 as to Horace III Williams ("Horace") and Theresa Williams ("Theresa", and together, "Respondents").

PRESENTATION:

The Court received the instant motion on November 02, 2020.

RELIEF REQUESTED:

Theresa appears to move to relate the instant case, Case No. 14P09983, and Case No. EC063856 pursuant to CRC, Rule 3.300(h)(1).

ANALYSIS:

Proof of Service – The Court cannot locate a proof of service attached to the instant motion, and Theresa submits no explanation or declaration as to the lack of service. As written notice to interested parties is required pursuant to CCP § 1005, the Court will either deny the instant motion or continue it for proof of service to be effectuated and filed.

---

RULING:

In the event the parties submit on this tentative ruling, or a party requests a signed order or the court in its discretion elects to sign a formal order, the following form will be either electronically signed or signed in hard copy and entered into the court’s records.

ORDER

Respondent Theresa Williams' Motion for Related Cases came on regularly for hearing on November 25, 2020, with appearances/submissions as noted in the minute order for said hearing, and the court, being fully advised in the premises, did then and there rule as follows:

THE MOTION IS DENIED OR CONTINUED.

DATE: _______________ _______________________________

JUDGE