Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/12/2020 at 21:52:57 (UTC).

IN RE THE WARREN AND ANNE ACKERMAN TRUST AND THE WARREN F. ACKERMAN TRUST

Case Summary

On 10/12/2016 IN RE THE WARREN AND ANNE ACKERMAN TRUST AND THE WARREN F ACKERMAN TRUST was filed as a Probate - Trust lawsuit. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are JOHNSON, BARBARA R. and COWAN, DAVID J.. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******5021

  • Filing Date:

    10/12/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Trust

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

JOHNSON, BARBARA R.

COWAN, DAVID J.

 

Party Details

Petitioner

HARTZHEIM CRAIG

Respondent

ACKERMAN LAURIE

Not Classified By Court

IN RE THE WARREN AND ANNE ACKERMAN TRUST AND THE WARREN F. ACKERMAN TRUST

Other

ACKERMAN RICHARD L.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorneys

KAYE OWEN DAVID

GIVNER BRUCE

Respondent Attorney

ACKERMAN LEE BARRY

Other Attorney

RUMMEL BLAKE ALEXANDRA

 

Court Documents

Petition - Trust/Pursuant Prob Code Sec 17200 (Initial) - Petition For Instructions Re Actions to be taken by Successor Trustee of the (i) marital trust established under The Warren and Anne Ackerman

10/12/2016: Petition - Trust/Pursuant Prob Code Sec 17200 (Initial) - Petition For Instructions Re Actions to be taken by Successor Trustee of the (i) marital trust established under The Warren and Anne Ackerman

PR_General Probate - NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT - CENTRAL PROBATE

10/12/2016: PR_General Probate - NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT - CENTRAL PROBATE

Notice - Hearing

10/13/2016: Notice - Hearing

Minute Order

12/21/2016: Minute Order

Declaration - Of Richard L. Ackerman In Response To Petition For Instructions Re Actions To Be Taken By Successor Trustee, Etc...

1/17/2017: Declaration - Of Richard L. Ackerman In Response To Petition For Instructions Re Actions To Be Taken By Successor Trustee, Etc...

Objection - Trust Petition

1/26/2017: Objection - Trust Petition

Probate Minute Order - Probate Master Minute Order

2/1/2017: Probate Minute Order - Probate Master Minute Order

Substitution of Attorney

2/7/2017: Substitution of Attorney

Minute Order

4/5/2017: Minute Order

Minute Order

4/26/2017: Minute Order

Petition - Trust/Pursuant Prob Code Sec 17200 (Subsequent) - For Approval Of Settlement

5/2/2017: Petition - Trust/Pursuant Prob Code Sec 17200 (Subsequent) - For Approval Of Settlement

Notice - Hearing

5/2/2017: Notice - Hearing

Supplement - To Petition For Approval Of Settlement

5/8/2017: Supplement - To Petition For Approval Of Settlement

Minute Order

6/1/2017: Minute Order

Minute Order

6/1/2017: Minute Order

Order - Order After Hearing - To Approve Settlement Agreement

6/23/2017: Order - Order After Hearing - To Approve Settlement Agreement

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/23/2017
  • DocketOrder (Order After Hearing - To Approve Settlement Agreement )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2017
  • Docketin Probate Department 79, Cowan, David J., Presiding; Trust 17200 Hearing - Held - Motion Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2017
  • Docketin Probate Department 79, Cowan, David J., Presiding; Trust 17200 Hearing - Held - Motion Denied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2017
  • DocketDISP: Denied-Initial Petition-After Crt Hrg/Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2017
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2017
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2017
  • DocketSupplement (To Petition For Approval Of Settlement ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2017
  • DocketPetition - Trust/Pursuant Prob Code Sec 17200 (Subsequent) (For Approval Of Settlement ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2017
  • DocketNotice - Hearing; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2017
  • Docketin Probate Department 79, Johnson, Barbara R., Presiding; Trust 17200 Hearing - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 02/07/2017
  • DocketSubstitution of Attorney; Filed by Attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2017
  • Docketin Probate Department 79, Cowan, David J., Presiding; Trust 17200 Hearing - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2017
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2017
  • DocketObjection - Trust Petition; Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2017
  • DocketDeclaration (Of Richard L. Ackerman In Response To Petition For Instructions Re Actions To Be Taken By Successor Trustee, Etc... ); Filed by Beneficiary

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2016
  • Docketin Probate Department 79, Cowan, David J., Presiding; Trust 17200 Hearing - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2016
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2016
  • DocketNotice - Hearing; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2016
  • DocketPetition - Trust/Pursuant Prob Code Sec 17200 (Initial) (Petition For Instructions Re Actions to be taken by Successor Trustee of the (i) marital trust established under The Warren and Anne Ackerman Trust and the (ii) Warren F. Ackerman Trust ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2016
  • DocketCover Sheet - Initial (PRO 010)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer RUMMEL BLAKE ALEXANDRA