Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/21/2019 at 08:03:07 (UTC).

IN RE MELINDA KIMSEY TO ESTABLISH STANDING OF THE GATEWAY GU

Case Summary

On 11/17/2015 IN RE MELINDA KIMSEY TO ESTABLISH STANDING OF THE GATEWAY GU was filed as an Other lawsuit. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is TERESA SANCHEZ-GORDON. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****9353

  • Filing Date:

    11/17/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

TERESA SANCHEZ-GORDON

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

KIMSEY MELINDA

Not Classified By Court

BRIAN HEWS

HEWS BRIAN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

TREMAINE DAVIS WRIGHT LLP

Not Classified By Court Attorney

REID & HELLYER

 

Court Documents

DECLARATION OF MELINDA KIMSEY IN SUPPORT OF VERIFIED PETITION TO ASCERTAIN AND ESTABLISH THE GATEWAY GUARDIAN AS A NEWSPAPER OF GENERAL CIRCULATION FOR THE COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES, STATE OF CALIFORNIA

11/17/2015: DECLARATION OF MELINDA KIMSEY IN SUPPORT OF VERIFIED PETITION TO ASCERTAIN AND ESTABLISH THE GATEWAY GUARDIAN AS A NEWSPAPER OF GENERAL CIRCULATION FOR THE COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES, STATE OF CALIFORNIA

NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY OF COUNSEL

11/17/2015: NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY OF COUNSEL

NOTICE OF INTENTION TO APPLY FOR AN ORDER DECLARING AND ADJUDGING THE GATEWAY GUARDIAN AS A NEWSPAPER OF GENERAL CIRCULATION

11/17/2015: NOTICE OF INTENTION TO APPLY FOR AN ORDER DECLARING AND ADJUDGING THE GATEWAY GUARDIAN AS A NEWSPAPER OF GENERAL CIRCULATION

NOTICE OF STATUS CONFERENCE AND ORDER

11/18/2015: NOTICE OF STATUS CONFERENCE AND ORDER

NOTICE OF INTENTION TO APPLY FOR AN ORDER DECLARING AND ADJUDGING THE GATEWAY GUARDIAN AS A NEWSPAPER OF GENERAL CIRCULATION

11/19/2015: NOTICE OF INTENTION TO APPLY FOR AN ORDER DECLARING AND ADJUDGING THE GATEWAY GUARDIAN AS A NEWSPAPER OF GENERAL CIRCULATION

Minute Order

1/14/2016: Minute Order

NOTICE OF STATUS CONFERENCE

2/19/2016: NOTICE OF STATUS CONFERENCE

Minute Order

3/3/2016: Minute Order

CONTESTANT'S NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO COMPEL RESPONSES TO REQUESTS FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS UPON FAILURE TO PERMIT INSPECTION, ALTERNATIVE REQUEST FOR FURTHER RESPONSES, REQUEST FOR SANCTIONS

4/11/2016: CONTESTANT'S NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO COMPEL RESPONSES TO REQUESTS FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS UPON FAILURE TO PERMIT INSPECTION, ALTERNATIVE REQUEST FOR FURTHER RESPONSES, REQUEST FOR SANCTIONS

PETITIONER?S NOTICE OF EXPARTE APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER: 1. ADVANCING AND RESCHEDULING HEARING ON PETITIONER?S MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER; AND 2. CONTINUING HEARING ON VERIFIED PETITION TO ASCERTAIN

4/19/2016: PETITIONER?S NOTICE OF EXPARTE APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER: 1. ADVANCING AND RESCHEDULING HEARING ON PETITIONER?S MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER; AND 2. CONTINUING HEARING ON VERIFIED PETITION TO ASCERTAIN

SUPPLEMENTAL DECLARATION OF MELINDA KIMSEY IN SUPPORT OF VERIFIED PETITION TO ASCERTAIN AND ESTABLISH THE GATEWAY GUARDIAN AS A NEWSPAPER OF GENERAL CIRCULATION FOR THE COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES, STATE OF

5/6/2016: SUPPLEMENTAL DECLARATION OF MELINDA KIMSEY IN SUPPORT OF VERIFIED PETITION TO ASCERTAIN AND ESTABLISH THE GATEWAY GUARDIAN AS A NEWSPAPER OF GENERAL CIRCULATION FOR THE COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES, STATE OF

OBJECTIONS TO DECLARATION OF BRIAN HEWS AND EXHIBITS 3-5

5/6/2016: OBJECTIONS TO DECLARATION OF BRIAN HEWS AND EXHIBITS 3-5

CONTESTANT'S SEPARATE STATEMENT OF REQUESTS AND RESPONSES IN DISPUTE IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR ORDER TO COMPEL RESPONSES TO REQUESTS FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS, SET NO. ONE, SERVED ON RESPONDENT, MELI

5/13/2016: CONTESTANT'S SEPARATE STATEMENT OF REQUESTS AND RESPONSES IN DISPUTE IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR ORDER TO COMPEL RESPONSES TO REQUESTS FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS, SET NO. ONE, SERVED ON RESPONDENT, MELI

OBJECTIONS OF MELINDA KIMSEY TO OVER-LONG REPLY BRIEF AND EVIDENCE SUBMITTED BY CONTESTANT CONCURRENTLY WITH OVER-LONG REPLY BRIEF

5/13/2016: OBJECTIONS OF MELINDA KIMSEY TO OVER-LONG REPLY BRIEF AND EVIDENCE SUBMITTED BY CONTESTANT CONCURRENTLY WITH OVER-LONG REPLY BRIEF

Minute Order

5/19/2016: Minute Order

ORDER APPOINTING COURT APPROVED REPORTER AS OFFICIAL REPORTER PRO TEMPORE

5/19/2016: ORDER APPOINTING COURT APPROVED REPORTER AS OFFICIAL REPORTER PRO TEMPORE

CONTESTANT'S REPLY TO OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO COMPEL RESPONSES TO REQUESTS FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS UPON FAILURE TO PERMIT INSPECTION, ALTERNATIVE REQUEST FOR FURTHER RESPONSES, REQUEST FOR SANCTIO

5/31/2016: CONTESTANT'S REPLY TO OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO COMPEL RESPONSES TO REQUESTS FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS UPON FAILURE TO PERMIT INSPECTION, ALTERNATIVE REQUEST FOR FURTHER RESPONSES, REQUEST FOR SANCTIO

OBJECTIONS OF MELINDA KIMSEY TO DECLARATION OF SCOTT TALKOV

6/3/2016: OBJECTIONS OF MELINDA KIMSEY TO DECLARATION OF SCOTT TALKOV

22 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/13/2016
  • ORDER GRANTING VERIFIED PETITION OF MELINDA KIMSEY TO ASCERTAIN AND ESTABLISH STANDING OF THE GATEWAY GUARDIANAS A NEWSPAPER OF GENERAL CIRCULATION FOR THE COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES, STATE OF CALIFORNIA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2016
  • Order; Filed by Melinda Kimsey (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2016
  • at 1:30 PM in Department 74; (Motion to Compel; Granted in Part) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2016
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2016
  • ORDER APPOINTING COURT APPROVED REPORTER AS OFFICIAL REPORTER PRO TEMPORE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2016
  • Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore; Filed by Certified Shorthand Reporter

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2016
  • OBJECTIONS OF MELINDA KIMSEY TO DECLARATION OF SCOTT TALKOV

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2016
  • Objection Document; Filed by Melinda Kimsey (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2016
  • at 1:30 PM in Department 74; (Motion to Compel; Continued by Court) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2016
  • CONTESTANT'S REPLY TO OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO COMPEL RESPONSES TO REQUESTS FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS UPON FAILURE TO PERMIT INSPECTION, ALTERNATIVE REQUEST FOR FURTHER RESPONSES, REQUEST FOR SANCTIONS [ETC.]; SUPPLEMENTAL DECLARATION OF SCOTT TALKOV [CO

    Read MoreRead Less
56 More Docket Entries
  • 01/07/2016
  • CONTEST TO PETITION OF MELINDA KIMSEY TO ASCERTAIN AND ESTABLISH STANDING OF THE GATEWAY GUARDIAN AS A NEWSPAPER OF GENERAL CIRCULATION FOR THE COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES, STATE OF CALIFORNIA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2015
  • NOTICE OF INTENTION TO APPLY FOR AN ORDER DECLARING AND ADJUDGING THE GATEWAY GUARDIAN AS A NEWSPAPER OF GENERAL CIRCULATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2015
  • Notice; Filed by Melinda Kimsey (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2015
  • NOTICE OF STATUS CONFERENCE AND ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2015
  • Notice of Status Conference filed; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2015
  • DECLARATION OF MELINDA KIMSEY IN SUPPORT OF VERIFIED PETITION TO ASCERTAIN AND ESTABLISH THE GATEWAY GUARDIAN AS A NEWSPAPER OF GENERAL CIRCULATION FOR THE COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES, STATE OF CALIFORNIA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2015
  • VERIFIED PETITION OF MELINDA KIMSEY TO ASCERTAIN AND ESTABLISH STANDING OF THE GATEWAY GUARDIAN AS A NEWSPAPER OF GENERAL CIRCULATION FOR THE COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES, STATE OF CALIFORNIA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2015
  • NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY OF COUNSEL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2015
  • NOTICE OF INTENTION TO APPLY FOR AN ORDER DECLARING AND ADJUDGING THE GATEWAY GUARDIAN AS A NEWSPAPER OF GENERAL CIRCULATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2015
  • Petition; Filed by null

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: BS159353    Hearing Date: December 01, 2020    Dept: 74

BS159353 IN RE MELINDA KIMSEY

Unopposed Petition to Vacate Adjudication of The Gateway Guardian as a Newspaper of General Circulation Based on Cessation of Publication in Violation of Government Code § 6000

TENTATIVE RULING: The motion is GRANTED and the order is vacated. The Gateway Guardian is not a newspaper of general circulation as it has not been published regularly in accordance to Gov. Code, §§ 6000 or 6008.