This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 03/17/2016 at 04:03:25 (UTC).

IN RE BULK CURRENCY $100,000 IN US CURRENCY AND SACHIN SHARM

Case Summary

On 02/13/2014 IN RE BULK CURRENCY 100,000 IN US CURRENCY AND SACHIN SHARM was filed as a Forfeiture - Other Forfeiture lawsuit. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is WILLIAM F. FAHEY. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****7279

  • Filing Date:

    02/13/2014

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Forfeiture - Other Forfeiture

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

WILLIAM F. FAHEY

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

SHARMA SACHIN

Respondent

NO NAMED RESPONDENT ON FILE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

BRAHMBHATT SUNIL A. ESQ.

 

Court Documents

CLAIM OPPOSING FORFEITURE

2/13/2014: CLAIM OPPOSING FORFEITURE

Proof of Service

2/18/2014: Proof of Service

ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING

2/20/2014: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING

NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

2/20/2014: NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

2/20/2014: NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

Minute Order

4/14/2014: Minute Order

Unknown

6/2/2014: Unknown

Minute Order

6/13/2014: Minute Order

Minute Order

7/24/2014: Minute Order

RESPONDENT?S NOTICE OF MOTION TO DISMISS CLAIM OPPOSNG FORFEITU FOR LACK OF JURISDICTION; ETC

9/18/2014: RESPONDENT?S NOTICE OF MOTION TO DISMISS CLAIM OPPOSNG FORFEITU FOR LACK OF JURISDICTION; ETC

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

10/2/2014: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

Minute Order

10/3/2014: Minute Order

Minute Order

10/3/2014: Minute Order

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/02/2014
  • Request and Entry of Dismissal (ENITRE ACTION WITH/ PREJ ) Filed by Attorney for Pltf/Petnr

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2014
  • Motion Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2014
  • Statement-Case Management Filed by Attorney for Deft/Respnt

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2014
  • OSC-Failure to File Proof of Serv Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2014
  • Notice-Case Management Conference Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2014
  • Proof of Service (PERSON SERVED: PENNY SCHNEIDER ) Filed by Attorney for Pltf/Petnr

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2014
  • Petition

    Read MoreRead Less