This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 12/29/2020 at 04:05:06 (UTC).

IMAN GIBSON ET AL VS USC MEDICAL HOSPITAL ET AL

Case Summary

On 12/21/2011 IMAN GIBSON filed a Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice lawsuit against USC MEDICAL HOSPITAL. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are ANN I. JONES, YVETTE M. PALAZUELOS, REX HEESEMAN and MARK V. MOONEY. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****5682

  • Filing Date:

    12/21/2011

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

ANN I. JONES

YVETTE M. PALAZUELOS

REX HEESEMAN

MARK V. MOONEY

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

GIBSON CODY

GIBSON IMAN

Defendants and Respondents

AAA AUTOCLUB

AMMARI RAZAN

AMMARI SUZAN

ARCHERS TOW

AUTOMOBILE CLUB OF SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA

BAER PETER

BURBANK CITY OF

CA.CREDIT UNION

CAREY PATRICK

CARPENTER RUTH

CHAUNG DEANA

COHEN REBECCA

COMERICA

DMV

DOE

DOE (MAIL WOMAN)

DOE (RAZAN'S INSURANCE ON HER HOUSE)

DOES 1 THROUGH 15

106 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant and Respondent Attorneys

BARNES CAROLYN A.

OVERTON SARAH L.

CUMMINGS MCCLOREY DAVIS ACHO & ASSOCIA

BRADY VORWERCK & RYDER

TRUTANICH CARMEN A. CITY ATTORNEY

WILNER ALAN D. A PROF. CORP.

SHARDLOW PAUL J. ESQ.

DOMINGUEZ MANUEL

FRANDZEL ROBINS BLOOM & CSATA L.C.

ROBINS III THOMAS M. ESQ.

HAGER DOWLING LIM & SLACK

HERTZ JOHN F.

JOHN F. HERTZ

GARCIA MICHAEL- CITY ATTORNEY

SHIM TINA DEPUTY CITY ATTORNEY

DOYLE MOORE & SCHAFER LLP

PETERSON-BRADFORD-BURKWITZ

LEVENTHAL ANDREW

COHEN HARRIS L. A PROF CORP.

EASTON CELESTE

20 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

DEFENDANT GATEWAYS HOSPITAL AND MENTAL HEALTH CENTER?S NOTICE MOTION AND MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF PLAINTIFFS? COMPLAINT; MEMORANDUM AND POINTS AND AUTHORITIES

3/2/2012: DEFENDANT GATEWAYS HOSPITAL AND MENTAL HEALTH CENTER?S NOTICE MOTION AND MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF PLAINTIFFS? COMPLAINT; MEMORANDUM AND POINTS AND AUTHORITIES

NOTICE OF HEARING ON DEMURRER AND DEMURRER BY DEFENDANT COMERICA BANK TO PLAINTIFFS? COMPLAINT; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES

3/5/2012: NOTICE OF HEARING ON DEMURRER AND DEMURRER BY DEFENDANT COMERICA BANK TO PLAINTIFFS? COMPLAINT; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

3/6/2012: PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

3/6/2012: PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -

3/6/2012: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -

3/6/2012: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -

3/6/2012: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -

3/6/2012: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -

AFFIDAVIT OF PREJUDICE PEREMPTORY CHALLENGE TO JUDICIAL OFFICER (CODE CIV. PROC.. 17O.6

3/9/2012: AFFIDAVIT OF PREJUDICE PEREMPTORY CHALLENGE TO JUDICIAL OFFICER (CODE CIV. PROC.. 17O.6

NOTICE OF CASE [4ANAGE1VLEN?T CONFERENCE

4/2/2012: NOTICE OF CASE [4ANAGE1VLEN?T CONFERENCE

NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO QUASH SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT BY AUTOMOBILE CLUB OF SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA

4/4/2012: NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO QUASH SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT BY AUTOMOBILE CLUB OF SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA

2ND NOTICE OF AMENDED HEARING DATE

5/17/2012: 2ND NOTICE OF AMENDED HEARING DATE

DEFENDANT CITY OF GLENDALE?S NOTICE OF RESCHEDULING OF HEARING ON DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT

5/17/2012: DEFENDANT CITY OF GLENDALE?S NOTICE OF RESCHEDULING OF HEARING ON DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT

DEFENDANT, GATEWAYS HOSPITAL AND MENTAL HEALTH CENTER?S, MOTION TO COMPEL PLAINTIFF, IMAN GIBSON?S, RESPONSE TO FORM INTERROGATORIES, SET ONE; REQUEST FOR SANCTIONS; SEPARATE STATEMENT OF BRENT J. LEH

6/19/2012: DEFENDANT, GATEWAYS HOSPITAL AND MENTAL HEALTH CENTER?S, MOTION TO COMPEL PLAINTIFF, IMAN GIBSON?S, RESPONSE TO FORM INTERROGATORIES, SET ONE; REQUEST FOR SANCTIONS; SEPARATE STATEMENT OF BRENT J. LEH

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT -

7/17/2012: CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT -

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT -

7/24/2012: CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT -

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT -

8/2/2012: CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT -

NOTICE OF RULINC ON MOTION TO QUASH SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT BY AUTOMOBILE CLUB OF SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA

8/6/2012: NOTICE OF RULINC ON MOTION TO QUASH SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT BY AUTOMOBILE CLUB OF SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA

181 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/28/2017
  • DocketPaper file imaged and destroyed; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2015
  • DocketOrder-Court Fee Waiver; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2015
  • DocketRequest-Waive Court Fees; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2012
  • DocketMemorandum of Costs ($470.00 COSTS ENTERED 9/27/12 MEMO TO SCAN UNIT 9/27/12 NO COURT FILE (costs based on minute order dated 8/23/12) ); Filed by Attorney for Deft/Respnt

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2012
  • Docketat 08:32 am in Department 68, Mark V. Mooney, Presiding; Hearing on Demurrer (DEM OF DEFTS-OSC) - Off Calendar

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2012
  • DocketMotion for an Order; Filed by Attorney for Defendant/Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2012
  • DocketNotice (OF NEW CMC DATE ); Filed by Attorney for Deft/Respnt

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2012
  • DocketStatement-Case Management; Filed by Attorney for Deft/Respnt

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2012
  • Docketat 08:32 am in Department 68, Mark V. Mooney, Presiding; Hearing on Demurrer (DEM OF DEFTSCASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE) - Matter continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2012
  • DocketEx-Parte Application (pltf's exparte motion to dismiss ); Filed by Plaintiff & Plaintiff In Pro Per

    Read MoreRead Less
119 More Docket Entries
  • 02/27/2012
  • DocketNotice-Related Cases (filed by southern california gas company ); Filed by Attorney for Defendant/Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2012
  • DocketDemurrer (notice of demurrer and demurrer by defdt southern california gas company to pltffs complaint; memo of points and auth ); Filed by Attorney for Defendant/Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2012
  • DocketDemurrer (NOTICE OF DEMURRER AND DEMURRER OF DEFDTS TO PLTFFS COMPLAINT; MEMO OF POINTS AND AUTH ); Filed by Attorney for Defendant/Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2012
  • DocketDemurrer (to plaintiff's complaint ); Filed by Attorney for Defendant/Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2012
  • DocketNotice of Ruling; Filed by Attorney for Defendant/Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2012
  • Docketat 08:30 am in Department 86, Ann I. Jones, Presiding; Exparte proceeding - Denied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2012
  • DocketEx-parte Request for Order; Filed by Plaintiff & Plaintiff In Pro Per

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2011
  • DocketNotice-Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2011
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2011
  • DocketFirst Amended Complaint; Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where DMV is a litigant

Latest cases where BURBANK CITY OF is a litigant

Latest cases where Automobile Club of Southern California is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer DOMINGUEZ MANUEL