This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/03/2019 at 00:02:17 (UTC).

ILFAH KARIM EDDIN ET AL VS PATRICIA GONZALEZ ET AL

Case Summary

On 08/11/2016 ILFAH KARIM EDDIN filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against PATRICIA GONZALEZ. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****0184

  • Filing Date:

    08/11/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Petitioners

ALGHABRA SOUMAYA

EDDIN ILFAH KARIM

Defendants and Respondents

GLENDALE POLICE DEPARTMENT

GONZALEZ PATRICIA

GLENDALE CITY OF

DEPARTMENT GLENDALE POLICE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

AVAZIAN AND AVAZIAN

Defendant Attorney

GARCIA MICHAEL J.

 

Court Documents

SUMMONS

8/11/2016: SUMMONS

COMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES)

8/11/2016: COMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES)

FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT - PERSONAL INJURY, PROPERTY DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH

9/8/2016: FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT - PERSONAL INJURY, PROPERTY DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET

9/8/2016: CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET

SUMMONS

9/8/2016: SUMMONS

ANSWER TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

9/30/2016: ANSWER TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

7/21/2017: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/21/2017
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2017
  • Request for Dismissal; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2016
  • PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2016
  • PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2016
  • Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by Ilfah Karim Eddin (Plaintiff); Soumaya Alghabra (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2016
  • Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by Ilfah Karim Eddin (Plaintiff); Soumaya Alghabra (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2016
  • Answer to First Amended Complaint; Filed by Patricia Gonzalez (Defendant); Glendale, City of (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2016
  • ANSWER TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2016
  • SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2016
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2016
  • Summons Issued; Filed by Ilfah Karim Eddin (Plaintiff); Soumaya Alghabra (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2016
  • FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT - PERSONAL INJURY, PROPERTY DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2016
  • First Amended Complaint; Filed by Ilfah Karim Eddin (Plaintiff); Soumaya Alghabra (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2016
  • COMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2016
  • Complaint; Filed by Ilfah Karim Eddin (Plaintiff); Soumaya Alghabra (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2016
  • SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where DEPARTMENT GLENDALE POLICE is a litigant

Latest cases where Glendale Police Department is a litigant

Latest cases where GLENDALE CITY OF is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer GARCIA MICHAEL J.