This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 03/07/2016 at 14:08:19 (UTC).

IBARRA VS ZAMORA

Case Summary

On 02/26/2011 IBARRA filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against ZAMORA. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Governor George Deukmejian Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is JUDITH VANDER LANS. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****5744

  • Filing Date:

    02/26/2011

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

JUDITH VANDER LANS

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MARIA YOLANDA IBARRA

Defendants

BANK OF AMERICA

DOES 1-500

FUTURE INVESTMENTS ESCROW DIVISION

GUILLERMINA ZAMORA

JORGE ZAMORA

LIZ MARTINEZ

MERCEDES MONTANEZ

MERS (AS MORTGAGE ELECTRONIC REGISTRATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BAUGH GEORGE L. LAW OFFICES OF

Defendant Attorneys

MICHAEL S. GOERGEN LAW OFFICE OF

REED SMITH LLP

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/12/2011
  • DocketNotice (OF DISMISSAL ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2011
  • DocketNotice (OF OSC RE SANCTIONS ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2011
  • DocketSubstitution of Attorney Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2011
  • DocketNotice (OF OSC RE SANCTION ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2011
  • DocketStatement-Case Management Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2011
  • DocketStatement-Case Management Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2011
  • DocketOrder (OF DISMISSAL ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2011
  • DocketNotice of Ruling (RE DEMURRER ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2011
  • DocketReply (IN SUPPORT OF DEMURRER ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2011
  • DocketOpposition (TO DEMURRER ) Filed by Plaintiff, & Plaintiff in Pro Per

    Read MoreRead Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 04/04/2011
  • DocketNotice of Hearing on Demurrer Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2011
  • DocketRtn of Service of Summons & Compl (PTY SERVED: LIZ MARTINEZ BY SUB SSESRVICE: FRONT DESK TO SILVIA MOROTE ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2011
  • DocketRtn of Service of Summons & Compl (PTY SERVED: JORGE ZAMORA BY CERTIFIED MAIL/RETURN RECEIPT ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2011
  • DocketRtn of Service of Summons & Compl (PTY SERVED: MERCEDES MONTANEZ BY SUB SERVICE: FRONT DESK TO SILVIA MOROTE ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2011
  • DocketRtn of Service of Summons & Compl (PTY SERVED: MER (as MORTGAGE ELECTRONIC REGISTRATION SYSTEM) BY CERTIFIED MAIL - RETURN RECEIPT ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2011
  • DocketRtn of Service of Summons & Compl (PTY SERVED: GILLERMINA ZAMORE BY CERTIFIED MAIN/RETURN RECEIPT ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2011
  • DocketRtn of Service of Summons & Compl (PTY SERVED: FUTURE INVESTMENTS ESCROW DIVISION BY SUB SERVICE: FRONT DEST TO SILVIA MOROTE ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2011
  • DocketRtn of Service of Summons & Compl (PTY SERVED: BANK OF AMERICA BY CERTIFIED MAIL/RETURN RECEIPT ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2011
  • DocketSummons Filed Filed by Plaintiff, & Plaintiff in Pro Per

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2011
  • DocketComplaint Filed (SUMMONS ISSUED )

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where MERS is a litigant

Latest cases where Bank of America is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer REED SMITH (LORENZO GASPARETTI)